USA v. Engineering Design Technologies Inc et al
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Engineering Design Technologies Inc and Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2019cv00850
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by USA. Liberty Mutual Insurance Co waiver sent on 7/17/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (aty,Warner, Vicki)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/17/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Engineering Design Technologies Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co (crt,Crick, S)
July 2, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of USA for Use and Benefit of Mondello Scaffolding & Shoring, Inc. against Engineering Design Technologies Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3987764) filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Vicki C Warner added to party USA(pty:pla))(aty,Warner, Vicki) Modified on 7/3/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Engineering Design Technologies Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Engineering Design Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Vicki C Warner
Represented By: Elizabeth Patterson Grozinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?