Hudson et al v. Chesapeake Operating L L C

Plaintiff: Rodney Hudson, James Garner, John Samuel Mayo, Jr., Judy Marie Thomas Dickson, Jessica Garner Cox and John Samuel Mayo, Jr
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C. and Chesapeake Operating L L C
Case Number: 5:2019cv00862
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Replies due by 9/6/2019. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 8/28/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 27, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim with consent. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Dauterive, C)
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim with consent by Chesapeake Operating L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Duarte, Nicole)
August 23, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim filed by Jessica Garner Cox, Judy Marie Thomas Dickson, James Garner, Rodney Hudson, John Samuel Mayo, Jr. (aty,Martin, Andrew)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Responses due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 7/23/2019. (crt,Reeves, T)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Corrected Proposed Order on Motion to Extend filed by Jessica Garner Cox, Judy Marie Thomas Dickson, James Garner, Rodney Hudson, John Samuel Mayo, Jr regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim with consent . (aty,Martin, Andrew)
July 18, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim with consent . Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Williams, L)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim with consent by Jessica Garner Cox, Judy Marie Thomas Dickson, James Garner, Rodney Hudson, John Samuel Mayo, Jr. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Martin, Andrew)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/10/2019. (crt,Keifer, K)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim by Chesapeake Operating L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief in Support of Chesapeake's Motion for Partial Dismissal)(aty,Donald, Michael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 5, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 5, 2019 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Chesapeake Operating L L C answer due 7/12/2019. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.. (aty,Duarte, Nicole)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal with 3.1 Statement from 42nd JDC DeSoto Parish, Case Number 80300-B with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3989760) filed by Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX. 1 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #2 Exhibit EX. 2 - State Court Filed Documents, #3 Exhibit EX. 3 - List of Parties, #4 Exhibit EX. 4 - List of Documents, #5 Exhibit EX. 5 - Certificate of Counsel, #6 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Nicole M Duarte added to party Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(aty,Duarte, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hudson et al v. Chesapeake Operating L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Hudson
Represented By: James Davis Powell
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Rogenes
Represented By: Owen Michael Courreges
Represented By: Grant E Summers
Represented By: Randall Stephen Davidson
Represented By: Michael G Stag
Represented By: Ashley M Liuzza
Represented By: Andrew David Martin
Represented By: Sally D Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Garner
Represented By: James Davis Powell
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Rogenes
Represented By: Owen Michael Courreges
Represented By: Grant E Summers
Represented By: Randall Stephen Davidson
Represented By: Michael G Stag
Represented By: Ashley M Liuzza
Represented By: Andrew David Martin
Represented By: Sally D Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Samuel Mayo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Marie Thomas Dickson
Represented By: James Davis Powell
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Rogenes
Represented By: Owen Michael Courreges
Represented By: Grant E Summers
Represented By: Randall Stephen Davidson
Represented By: Michael G Stag
Represented By: Ashley M Liuzza
Represented By: Andrew David Martin
Represented By: Sally D Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Garner Cox
Represented By: James Davis Powell
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Rogenes
Represented By: Owen Michael Courreges
Represented By: Grant E Summers
Represented By: Randall Stephen Davidson
Represented By: Michael G Stag
Represented By: Ashley M Liuzza
Represented By: Andrew David Martin
Represented By: Sally D Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Samuel Mayo, Jr
Represented By: James Davis Powell
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Rogenes
Represented By: Owen Michael Courreges
Represented By: Grant E Summers
Represented By: Randall Stephen Davidson
Represented By: Michael G Stag
Represented By: Ashley M Liuzza
Represented By: Andrew David Martin
Represented By: Sally D Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating, L.L.C.
Represented By: Nicole M Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Operating L L C
Represented By: Nicole M Duarte
Represented By: Michael B Donald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?