Phill v. Town of Blanchard et al
Plaintiff: Jammie D Phill
Defendant: Gary Presswood and Town of Blanchard
Case Number: 5:2019cv00863
Filed: July 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/8/2019 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 9/24/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/1/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 10/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/27/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Town of Blanchard, Gary Presswood.(Attorney Joseph B Stamey added to party Town of Blanchard(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph B Stamey added to party Gary Presswood(pty:dft))(aty,Stamey, Joseph)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jammie D Phill. Town of Blanchard waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (aty,Gilley, Patricia)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/19/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jammie D Phill. Gary Presswood waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (aty,Gilley, Patricia)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Town of Blanchard and Gary Presswood (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 6, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Dauterive, C)
July 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gary Presswood, Town of Blanchard with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3989821) filed by Jammie D Phill. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Patricia A Gilley added to party Jammie D Phill(pty:pla))(aty,Gilley, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phill v. Town of Blanchard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Presswood
Represented By: Joseph B Stamey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Blanchard
Represented By: Joseph B Stamey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jammie D Phill
Represented By: Patricia A Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?