Sabre Industries Inc. v. McLaurin
Plaintiff: Sabre Industries, Inc. and Sabre Industries Inc
Defendant: Joseph McLaurin, Joe McLaurin and Module X Solutions
Case Number: 5:2019cv00934
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Module X Solutions (crt,Crick, S)
September 13, 2019 Filing 31 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joe McLaurin, Module X Solutions filed by Sabre Industries Inc.(crt,Crick, S)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/13/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
September 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Responses due by 9/13/2019 Replies due by 9/17/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Expedite consideration of #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Opposition reset to 9/13/2019; Reply Memorandum due 9/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/9/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 9, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Susan F Desmond on behalf of Sabre Industries Inc regarding #28 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended and Restated Complaint. Action taken: Terminated #28 Motion to Dismiss and edited text to indicate document filed in wrong case and resubmitted in correct case. (crt,Crick, S)
September 9, 2019 Filing 28 FILED IN ERROR AND RESUBMITTED IN CORRECT CASE. MOTION to Dismiss First Amended and Restated Complaint by Sabre Industries Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Desmond, Susan) Modified on 9/9/2019 to indicate document filed in wrong case. (Crick, S).
September 6, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Expedite consideration of #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint by Sabre Industries Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Desmond, Susan)
September 5, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings for Preliminary Injunction held on 8/15/2019 before Judge Terry A Doughty. Court Reporter: Debbie Lowery, Telephone number (318)361-0380. Total pages: 122. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter. Redaction Request due 9/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2019. (crt,Lowery, D)
September 4, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #24 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,JonesSld, P)
September 4, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend Complaint with opposition by Sabre Industries Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,Desmond, Susan) Modified on 9/4/2019 to capture more accurate event (JonesSld, P).
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. McLaurin is prohibited and enjoined from continuing his employment with MXS and prohibited and enjoined from soliciting Sabre employees for employment with MXS. To the extent Sabre seeks a preliminary injunction ordering McLaurin to return Sabre's confidential or proprietary information, the motion is Denied. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/19/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 19, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM RULING re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sabre Industries Inc. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/19/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 WITNESS LIST filed (restricted access). (crt,Crawford, A)
August 15, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Terry A Doughty: MOTION HEARING held on 8/15/2019 re #2 MOTION for Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction filed by Sabre Industries Inc. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Debbie Lowery) (crt,Crawford, A)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #18 Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Action taken: Document Replaced. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 13, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #2 MOTION for Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction filed by Sabre Industries Inc. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Reply to #2 Motion for Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 8/13/2019. (crt,Crawford, A) Modified on 8/13/2019 to correct text (Crawford, A). (Main Document 18 replaced on 8/13/2019) (Crawford, A).
August 12, 2019 Motions Transferred regarding #17 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Pre-trial Memorandum. Motions referred to Judge Terry A Doughty. (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 12, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant's Pre-trial Memorandum by Sabre Industries Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed pleading, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Desmond, Susan) Modified on 8/13/2019 to edit text(JonesSld, P).
August 8, 2019 Filing 16 EXHIBIT LIST by Sabre Industries Inc. (aty,Desmond, Susan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 WITNESS LIST filed (restricted access) by Sabre Industries Inc. (aty,Desmond, Susan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 PRETRIAL Memorandum by Sabre Industries Inc. (aty,Desmond, Susan)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 WITNESS LIST filed (restricted access) and Exhibit List by Joseph McLaurin. (aty,Jones, Pamela) Modified on 8/8/2019 to indicate Exhibit List included (JonesSld, P).
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #2 Motion for Restraining Order by Joseph McLaurin. (aty,Jones, Pamela) Modified on 8/8/2019 to capture more accurate event and edict text (JonesSld, P).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Enroll Pamela R Jones as Counsel for Joe McLaurin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/29/2019. (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTES for proceedings held before Judge Terry A Doughty: Status Conference held re #2 MOTION for Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction filed by Sabre Industries Inc. A hearing on #2 MOTION for Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction will be held on 8/15/2019 at 9:00 AM in Monroe, 2nd floor before Judge Terry A Doughty. Pretrial memorandums, witness lists and exhibit lists shall be filed by 8/8/19. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/26/2019. (crt,Stephens, M)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pamela R. Jones to Enroll as Counsel by Joseph McLaurin. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Pamela R Jones added to party Joseph McLaurin(pty:dft))(aty,Jones, Pamela) Modified on 7/26/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Joseph McLaurin filed by Sabre Industries Inc.(aty,Desmond, Susan)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER. In order to establish diversity, Plaintiff will need to file an amended complaint to allege McLaurin's state of domicile. The deadline for the filing of the amended complaint is August 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/22/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ENTRY: A telephone conference re #2 MOTION for Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction is set for 7/26/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Terry A Doughty. Call in information will be provided separately. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/22/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion for TRO The request for a preliminary and/or permanent injunction will be considered separately. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 7/19/2019. (crt,Crawford, A)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joseph McLaurin (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 19, 2019 Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby added. (crt,JonesSld, P)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary and/or MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Sabre Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A)(aty,Desmond, Susan). Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Permanent Injunction on 7/19/2019 (JonesSld, P).
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joseph McLaurin (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4002221) filed by Sabre Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons - McLaurin)(Attorney Susan F Desmond added to party Sabre Industries, Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Desmond, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sabre Industries Inc. v. McLaurin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph McLaurin
Represented By: Pamela R Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe McLaurin
Represented By: Pamela R Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Module X Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabre Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Susan F Desmond
Represented By: Amanda Wingfield Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabre Industries Inc
Represented By: Susan F Desmond
Represented By: Amanda Wingfield Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?