WLP Capital Inc et al v. Tolliver
Plaintiff: W L P Capital Inc, Transfac L L C and Bridge Capital Lenders Inc
Defendant: Billy Joe Tolliver
Case Number: 5:2019cv01003
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen L Hayes
Referring Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 1:30 PM by phone before Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 9/25/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/2/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 10/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/6/2019. (crt,Leday, A)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 9/5/2019. (jud,Hayes, Karen)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Billy Joe Tolliver.(Attorney Alexander John Mijalis added to party Billy Joe Tolliver(pty:dft))(aty,Mijalis, Alexander)
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by W L P Capital Inc, Bridge Capital Lenders Inc. Billy Joe Tolliver served on 8/12/2019, answer due 9/3/2019. (aty,Briggett, Joseph)
August 9, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by W L P Capital Inc, Bridge Capital Lenders Inc, Transfac L L C as to Billy Joe Tolliver. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to accurately document pleading electronically filed as #3 Notice. Service of the complaint is not considered properly executed (service within the State of Louisiana cannot be effected through certified mail. (crt,Williams, L)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Bridge Capital Lenders Inc, Transfac L L C, W L P Capital Inc of Service of Petition Via Certified Mail per LA RS 13:4243 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(aty,Briggett, Joseph)
August 2, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Billy Joe Tolliver (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 2, 2019 Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes added. (crt,JonesSld, P)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Ex Parte Petition to Make Foreign Judgment Executory against Billy Joe Tolliver (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4014194) filed by W L P Capital Inc, Bridge Capital Lenders Inc, Transfac L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil cover sheet, #3 Affidavit)(Attorney Joseph Patrick Briggett added to party Bridge Capital Lenders Inc, Transfac LLC and WLP Capital Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,Briggett, Joseph) Modified on 8/2/2019 to edit text (JonesSld, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WLP Capital Inc et al v. Tolliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W L P Capital Inc
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Briggett
Represented By: Jay P Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transfac L L C
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Briggett
Represented By: Jay P Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridge Capital Lenders Inc
Represented By: Joseph Patrick Briggett
Represented By: Jay P Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Joe Tolliver
Represented By: Alexander John Mijalis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?