Johnson v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Dennis Johnson
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv01045
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Dennis Johnson. U S Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/27/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT re #1 Complaint by Dennis Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Dennis Johnson (Plaintiff), who is self-represented, filed a complaint to appeal a decision by the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration to deny disability benefits. This order is issued to explain to Plaintiff the obligations that must be met to obtain a decision from the court. Plaintiff will first need to serve the complaint within 90 days of the filing of the complaint, which is November 10, 2019. Once Plaintiff files evidence of service, the Clerk of Court will issue a Scheduling Order and a Deadlines Worksheet. Plaintiff must keep the court informed of a current address. If Plaintiff should have a change in address, Plaintiff must notify the Clerk of Court in writing. If at any time Plaintiff does not wish to pursue this case, Plaintiff may communicate that to the court in writing, and the case will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/14/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,ThomasSld, T) Modified to correct file date on 8/14/2019 (ThomasSld, T).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/13/2019. (crt,ThomasSld, T)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 12, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dennis Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(crt,Miletello, A)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Commissioner of Social Security filed by Dennis Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Cristina Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?