McCoy v. Whittington et al
Plaintiff: Robert Leroy McCoy
Defendant: Dee Barnett, Julian Whittington, Dillan Porter, Anthony Evans, E Downey, Capt Boyer and Craig Stokes
Case Number: 5:2019cv01066
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 RECEIVED Partial Filing Fee on behalf of Robert Leroy McCoy in the amount of $19.13, receipt number 54635062530. (crt,Reasor, M)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 11/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/1/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint, by Robert Leroy McCoy. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint/petition. Pro Se Response due by 10/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/18/2019. (crt,Williams, L)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Plaintiff to Court requesting service packet. Clerk sent service packet with the attached Clerk's letter re initial review to plaintiff on 9/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Clerk's letter re initial review) (crt,Haik, K)
September 5, 2019 RECEIVED Partial Filing Fee on behalf of Robert Leroy McCoy from Julian C Whittington Sheriff and Ex-Officio Tax Collector in the amount of $4.04, receipt number 54635062331. (crt,Reasor, M)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $23.17. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/19/2019. (crt,Haik, K)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 14, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Leroy McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dee Barnett, Boyer, E Downey, Anthony Evans, Dillan Porter, Craig Stokes, Julian Whittington with Jury Demand filed by Robert Leroy McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Table of Contents, #3 Exhibit, #4 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Whittington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Whittington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillan Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Leroy McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?