McCoy v. Steene et al
Plaintiff: James McCoy
Defendant: E A N Holdings L L C, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co, Merieux Nutrisciences Corp, Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co and Michelle Steene
Case Number: 5:2019cv01100
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Within 90 days, the parties shall submit to the Court a joint motion to dismiss or a stipulation of dismissal signed by all parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/18/2019. (crt,Keifer, K)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by E A N Holdings L L C (aty,Green, Donna)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 10/31/2019 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/17/2019. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 10/24/2019. Rule 26 Report due by 10/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/13/2019. (crt,Keller, J)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merieux Nutrisciences Corp identifying Corporate Parent Merieux Nutrisciences Corp for Merieux Nutrisciences Corp. (aty,Green, Donna)
September 4, 2019 Filing 10 FILED IN ERROR. AMENDED DOCUMENT by Merieux Nutrisciences Corp. Amendment to #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement , Revised. (aty,Green, Donna) Modified on 9/6/2019 to indicate #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement resubmitted in its entirety. (Crick, S).
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by E A N Holdings L L C, Merieux Nutrisciences Corp, Michelle Steene. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 1B, #3 Exhibit 1C, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14)(aty,Green, Donna) Modified on 9/5/2019 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER re jurisdiction/citizenship: Amended Notice of Removal due 9/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/26/2019. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/23/2019. (crt,Whidden, C)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Merieux Nutrisciences Corp - no corporate parent. (aty,Green, Donna) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (Dunford, T).
August 22, 2019 JUDGMENT granting motion to consolidate filed by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co, consolidating civil actions 609,006-A James McCoy v Michelle Steene et al with 616,782-B James McCoy v Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co, both actions in 1st Judicial District Court, Caddo Parish. Administrative entry: PDF of this document may be found as attachment #15 to document #1, Notice of Removal. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 22, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand by Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co. Administrative entry (PDF image of this document can be found as attachment #15 to document #1, Notice of Removal).(crt,Dunford, T) Modified on 8/26/2019 to include jury demand (Dunford, T).
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 22, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by E A N Holdings L L C identifying Corporate Parent EAN Holdings, LLC for E A N Holdings L L C. (aty,Green, Donna)
August 22, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #15 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(crt,Thigpen, M)
August 22, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint by E A N Holdings L L C, Merieux Nutrisciences Corp, Michelle Steene. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #15 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by E A N Holdings L L C, Merieux Nutrisciences Corp, Michelle Steene of Removal Verification (aty,Green, Donna)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by E A N Holdings L L C, Merieux Nutrisciences Corp, Michelle Steene of Removal Certification - no new filings (aty,Green, Donna) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (Dunford, T).
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 609,006 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4030616) filed by EAN Holdings, LLC, Merieux Nutrisciences Corporation, Michelle Steene. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 1C, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14)(Attorney Donna Powe Green added to party EAN Holdings, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Donna Powe Green added to party Merieux Nutrisciences Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Donna Powe Green added to party Michelle Steene(pty:dft))(aty,Green, Donna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Steene et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McCoy
Represented By: John Charles Milkovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E A N Holdings L L C
Represented By: Michael R Barnes
Represented By: Donna Powe Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Paloverde Insurance Co
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merieux Nutrisciences Corp
Represented By: Michael R Barnes
Represented By: Donna Powe Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentry Insurance A Mutual Co
Represented By: Andrew P Texada
Represented By: Russell L Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Steene
Represented By: Michael R Barnes
Represented By: Donna Powe Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?