Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP v. Army
Plaintiff: Johnson Controls Fire Protection L P
Defendant: U S Dept of Army
Case Number: 5:2019cv01279
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by U S Dept of Army. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Text of proposed order, #3 Exhibit)(aty,Frederick, Jennifer)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by U S Dept of Army . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aty,Frederick, Jennifer)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER, Plaintiff is advised that service must be made within 90 days of the filing of the notice of removal, which is December 31, 2019.( Compliance Deadline set for 12/31/2019.)Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/4/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/3/2019. (crt,Bunting, M)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/3/2019. (crt,Rider, M)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 2, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Bossier Parish, Case Number C-160452 (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by U S Dept of Army. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Citation & State Court Petition, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jennifer B Frederick added to party U S Dept of Army(pty:dft))(aty,Frederick, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson Controls Fire Protection LP v. Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnson Controls Fire Protection L P
Represented By: David L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Dept of Army
Represented By: Jennifer B Frederick
Represented By: David C Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?