O'Neal v. Depuy Synthes Sales Inc et al
Plaintiff: Carolyn O'Neal
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd., Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. d/b/a Depuy Synthes Joint Reconstruction, Medical Device Business Services, Inc., Depuy International Limited, Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Depuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson International, Depuy Ireland Unlimited Company, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Depuy Synthes Products, Inc., Depuy Synthes, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, DePuy International Ltd, DePuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc, Medical Device Business Services Inc, DePuy Synthes Products Inc, DePuy Ireland Unlimited Co and DePuy Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv01328
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Carolyn O'Neal (aty,Gallagher, Michael)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael T Gallagher for Carolyn O'Neal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/15/2019. (crt,Crick, S)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Michael T. Gallagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4105978) by Carolyn O'Neal. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(aty,Gallagher, Michael) Modified on 11/14/2019 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding #6 Amended Complaint filed by Attorney Michael T Gallagher on behalf of Carolyn O'Neal. Reason: The document was signed by an attorney not admitted to practice before this court. (crt,Dauterive, C)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 DEFICIENT ? AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Carolyn O'Neal.(aty,Gallagher, Michael) Modified on 11/5/2019 to reflect deficient status (Dauterive, C).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Carolyn O'Neal. The deadline for Plaintiff to file the amended complaint with respect to her own citizenship and the proper venue for the case is November 4, 2019. (Compliance Deadline set for 11/4/2019.) Once counsel for Plaintiff has had an opportunity to confer with counsel for Defendants, Plaintiff will need to file an amended complaint that properly alleges the form and citizenship of the two Irish companies. Alternatively, Defendants may include that information in their answer. Ultimately, it is Plaintiff's burden to ensure the required jurisdictional facts are in the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/28/2019. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to DePuy Inc, DePuy International Ltd, DePuy Ireland Unlimited Co, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Inc, DePuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd, DePuy Synthes Products Inc, DePuy Synthes Sales Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson International, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc and Medical Device Business Services Inc. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Complaint filed by Carolyn O'Neal regarding #1 Complaint,, Corrected. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(aty,Gallagher, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Deficiency to Michael T Gallagher on behalf of Carolyn O'Neal regarding #1 Complaint. Reason: The document was signed by an attorney not admitted to practice before this court. If eligible, and your admission cannot be accomplished within ten days, you may provide a new signature page signed by a member of the bar of this court. See Fed.R.Civ.P.11 and LR11.1. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 9, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Dauterive, C)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DePuy Synthes Sales Inc, DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy International Ltd, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services Inc, Johnson & Johnson International, DePuy Synthes Inc, Medical Device Business Services Inc, DePuy Inc, DePuy Synthes Products Inc, DePuy Ireland Unlimited Co and DePuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-4071000) filed by Carolyn O'Neal. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Michael T Gallagher added to party Carolyn O'Neal(pty:pla))(aty,Gallagher, Michael) Modified on 10/10/2019 to edit text and reflect deficient status (Dauterive, C). Modified on 10/22/2019 to remove deficient status; see Corrected Complaint filed as document #3 (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Neal v. Depuy Synthes Sales Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc. d/b/a Depuy Synthes Joint Reconstruction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Ireland Unlimited Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Depuy Synthes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Johnson & Johnson Ireland Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Sales Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Device Business Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Ireland Unlimited Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn O'Neal
Represented By: Michael T Gallagher
Represented By: Jennifer Jon Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?