Ford v. Goodwin
Plaintiff: Eddie Ray Ford
Defendant: Jerry Goodwin
Case Number: 5:2019cv01428
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Eddie Ray Ford in the amount of $5, receipt number 64635007967. (crt,Devillier, W)
December 2, 2019 NOTICE of Correction of Prisoner ID Number. Prisoner ID number corrected from 86167 to 88167. Clerk resent docs. 3 & #4 on 12/2/19. (crt,Haik, K)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Eddie Ray Ford, David Wade Correctional Center, re: #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis returned marked: return to sender, no inmate number. (crt,Haik, K)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Eddie Ray Ford, David Wade Correctional Center, re: 3 Jurisdictional Review Finding, returned marked: return to sender, no inmate number. (crt,Haik, K)
November 5, 2019 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Action taken: Incorrect order action selected and docket entry modified to properly reflect correct order action as "denying". (crt,Haik, K)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/5/2019. (crt,Williams, L) Modified to correct docket entry text on 12/2/2019 (Haik, K).
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes on 11/5/2019. (jud,Perez-Montes, Joseph)
November 1, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eddie Ray Ford. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2019: #2 Proposed order) (Thigpen, M).
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Eddie Ray Ford. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Miletello, A) Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct filing date (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford v. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Ray Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?