Strange v. D E F Company
Plaintiff: Clinton Strange
Defendant: D E F Co
Case Number: 5:2019cv01429
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 REMARK: subpoena mailed to plaintiff 11/15/2019. (crt,Jones, P)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/13/2019. (crt,Jones, P)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Expedited Discovery by Clinton Strange. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - C, #2 Exhibit D - Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(crt,Whidden, C)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to D E F Co (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 1, 2019 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 1, 2019 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 2:19-cv-1429 from Lake Charles Division to Shreveport Division. New Case Number 5:19-cv-1429. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against D E F Company (Receipt number 24635002757, filing fee $400) filed by Clinton Strange. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil cover sheet, #3 Envelope, #4 Cover letter)(crt,Benoit, T) Modified on 11/7/2019 to correct date (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strange v. D E F Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D E F Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clinton Strange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?