Demery v. Vannoy
Plaintiff: Andre Demery
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Case Number: 5:2019cv01469
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/11/2019. (crt,Thomas, T)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andre Demery. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Haik, K) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2019: #1 Proposed order) (Haik, K).
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 12/16/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(crt,Thomas, T)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 12, 2019 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Andre Demery. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Instruction Page, #3 Memorandum / Brief, #4 Table of Contents/Table of Authorities, #5 Exhibits)(crt,Thomas, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Demery v. Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrel Vannoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Demery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?