Woodford v. Educational Credit Management Corp et al
Plaintiff: Valley Woodford
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions,Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Educational Credit Management Corporation, Trans Union L L C, Experian Information Solutions Inc and Educational Credit Management Corp
Case Number: 5:2020cv00064
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(aty,Jones, Reid)
February 21, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trans Union L L C identifying Corporate Parent Transunion Intermediate Holdings Inc, Other Affiliate TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union L L C. (aty,Wilty, Reagan)
February 21, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Trans Union L L C.(Attorney Reagan Reynolds Wilty added to party Trans Union L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Wilty, Reagan)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. IT IS ORDERED that Experian's Motion be and is hereby GRANTED and that the deadline for Experian to file its responsive pleading be and is hereby extended to and including March 4, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/19/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
February 18, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Experian Information Solutions Inc identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source L L C, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange L L C, Other Affiliate New Management Services L L C, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions L L C, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services L L C for Experian Information Solutions Inc. (aty,Jones, Reid)
February 18, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Experian Information Solutions Inc. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Reid Allen Jones added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Jones, Reid) Modified on 2/18/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, Educational Credit Management Corp answer due 3/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/7/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT naming E C M C Group Inc as a corporate parnet by Educational Credit Management Corp. (aty,Alexis, Heather) Modified on 2/6/2020 to add corporate parent (Jones, P).
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, sent to Heather LaSalle Alexis, Amanda Strickland Stout on behalf of Educational Credit Management Corp. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/20/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by Educational Credit Management Corp. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Heather LaSalle Alexis added to party Educational Credit Management Corp(pty:dft))(aty,Alexis, Heather) Modified on 2/6/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valley Woodford. Trans Union L L C served on 1/31/2020, answer due 2/21/2020. (aty,Szwak, David)
February 2, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valley Woodford. Educational Credit Management Corp served on 1/30/2020, answer due 2/20/2020. (aty,Szwak, David)
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valley Woodford. Experian Information Solutions Inc served on 1/29/2020, answer due 2/19/2020. (aty,Szwak, David)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Plaintiff also invokes diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332, but the allegations of the citizenship of the parties do not comply with the rules for determining the citizenship of corporations and LLCs, See Haynes v. Northbridge Gen. Ins. Co., No. 19-CV-0624, 2019 WL 2296775 (W.D. La. May 28, 2019), so the court cannot find on the basis of the original complaint that diversity jurisdiction exists. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/16/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Educational Credit Management Corp, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Trans Union L L C (crt,Jones, P)
January 14, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Jones, P)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Educational Credit Management Corp, Experian Information Solutions Inc, Trans Union L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4154462) filed by Valley Woodford. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney David A Szwak added to party Valley Woodford(pty:pla))(aty,Szwak, David) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/15/2020) (Jones, P). (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/15/2020) (Jones, P). Modified on 1/15/2020 to edit parties and replace landscape documents with portrait (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodford v. Educational Credit Management Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions,Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Credit Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union L L C
Represented By: Reagan Reynolds Wilty
Represented By: George D Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Credit Management Corp
Represented By: Amanda Strickland Stout
Represented By: Heather LaSalle Alexis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Woodford
Represented By: David A Szwak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?