Robinson v. Marel Inc et al
Plaintiff: Christy Robinson
Defendant: Marel Inc., Unknown Defendants, Marel Inc and X Y Z Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2020cv00251
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Referring Judge: Donald E Walter
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM ORDER: All requirements of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) are hereby waived in this case, including the conference of the parties and the report to the Court. The parties are directed to serve their initial disclosures within 30 days and promptly begin any necessary discovery and motion practice. A scheduling order will be issued by the Court setting the matter for trial in due course. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 3/11/2020. (crt,Bray, K)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: The scheduling conference set for April 22, 2020 is cancelled. The parties may disregard the deadlines set in Doc. #8 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/9/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2020 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 4/8/2020. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 4/15/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 4/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/4/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Marel Inc.(aty,Rosenzweig, Ira)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/27/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/27/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marel Inc identifying Corporate Parent Marel U S A Holding Inc for Marel Inc. (aty,Rosenzweig, Ira) Modified on 2/26/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Ira J Rosenzweig on behalf of Marel Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/11/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 25, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Donald E Walter and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 25, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Marel Inc answer due 3/3/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #2 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 2nd JDC Bienville Parish, Case Number 45-394 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4192236) filed by Marel Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Petition for Damages, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Record, #3 Exhibit C-State Court Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D-Westlaw PeopleMap-Plaintiff, #5 Exhibit E-Kansas Business Entity Search, #6 Exhibit F-Zurich Detail Entity, #7 Exhibit G-Declaration, #8 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Ira J Rosenzweig added to party Marel Inc.(pty:dft))(aty,Rosenzweig, Ira) (Attachment 8 replaced on 2/26/2020) (Thigpen, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Marel Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marel Inc.
Represented By: Ira J Rosenzweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marel Inc
Represented By: Ira J Rosenzweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Robinson
Represented By: P Nelson Smith, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?