Hankins v. Messick Many L L C et al
Plaintiff: Martha Hankins
Defendant: rory messick, messick management llc, messick-many llc, Messick Management L L C and Messick-Many L L C
Case Number: 5:2020cv00441
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Rory Messick, Messick Management L L C, Messick-Many L L C.(aty,Anseman, Norman)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Guy D Perrier, Jordan Michael Jeansonne added as attorney for Rory Messick, Messick Management L L C, Messick-Many L L C. Attorney Bryan E Lege' terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/27/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by Rory Messick, Messick Management L L C, Messick-Many L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Rory Messick, #2 Exhibit B-Declaration of Linda Messick, #3 Exhibit C-Messick Drivers Licenses)(aty,Anseman, Norman)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Guy D. Perrier; Jordan M. Jeansonne in place of Bryan E. Leg with consent by Rory Messick, Messick Management L L C, Messick-Many L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/26/2020. (aty,Anseman, Norman) Modified on 5/26/2020 to indicate proposed order within pdf (Miletello, A).
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #11 Motion to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery; Motion to File Supplemental Memoranda to Motion to Remand. IT IS ORDERED that parties are hereby GRANTED leave of Court to conduct jurisdictional discovery concerning the diversity of citizenship issues raised by the Court's #7 Memorandum Ruling. The Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Memoranda in Support of #7 Motion to Remand is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/12/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED Notice of Removal by Messick Management L L C, Messick-Many L L C, Rory Messick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(aty,Anseman, Norman) Modified on 5/12/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery, Motion to File Supplemental Memorandum to #9 Motion to Remand by Martha Hankins. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Townsend, Thomas). Added MOTION to Amend/Correct, modified docket text and created docket entry relationship on 5/12/2020 (Crick, S).
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #9 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Martha Hankins. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed order)(aty,Townsend, Thomas)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Messick Management L L C, Messick-Many L L C, Rory Messick . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(aty,Anseman, Norman) Modified on 5/1/2020 to modify docket text.(Crick, S).
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER. Defendants must file by May 12, 2020 an amended notice of removal that clarifies whether Messick-Many, LLC and Messick-Management, LLC are corporations or LLCs. If they are LLCs, their citizenship must be alleged in accordance with the rules outlined above. If Defendants contend that the entities are corporations, Defendants should explain the inclusion of LLC in their names and cite legal authority for including those letters in the name of a corporation formed under Texas law. See David v. Martinez, 2019 WL 2246789 (W.D. La. 2019) (addressing similar issue with Pennsylvania entity). The notice of removal alleges that defendant Rory Messick is a citizen of Texas rather than a citizen of Louisiana as Plaintiff alleged in her petition. If Plaintiff disagrees with that assertion, she should file, no later than May 12, 2020, a motion for leave to conduct limited discovery on the issue of Rory Messicks citizenship. If no such motion is filed, the court will deem Plaintiff to agree that Rory Messick is a citizen of Texas. See Memorandum Order for details. Compliance Deadline set for 5/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/21/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/9/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Messick Management L L C. (aty,Anseman, Norman)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Messick-Many L L C. (aty,Anseman, Norman)
April 8, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Rory Messick answer due 4/15/2020; Messick-Many L L C answer due 4/15/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as pleading filed within pdf of #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/8/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Bryan E Lege', Norman E Anseman, III on behalf of Messick management L L C, Messick-Many L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/22/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 8, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 8, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. messick management llc answer due 4/15/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #4 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL). (crt,Thigpen, M)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal by Defendants from 11th JDC Sabine, Case Number 70,295 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4230485) filed by rory messick, messick management llc, messick-many llc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Attorney Norman E Anseman, III added to party rory messick(pty:dft), Attorney Norman E Anseman, III added to party messick management llc(pty:dft), Attorney Norman E Anseman, III added to party messick-many llc(pty:dft))(aty,Anseman, Norman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hankins v. Messick Many L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Hankins
Represented By: Thomas Taylor Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rory messick
Represented By: Norman E Anseman, III
Represented By: Bryan E Lege'
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Represented By: Jordan Michael Jeansonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: messick management llc
Represented By: Norman E Anseman, III
Represented By: Bryan E Lege'
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: messick-many llc
Represented By: Norman E Anseman, III
Represented By: Bryan E Lege'
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Messick Management L L C
Represented By: Norman E Anseman, III
Represented By: Bryan E Lege'
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Represented By: Jordan Michael Jeansonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Messick-Many L L C
Represented By: Norman E Anseman, III
Represented By: Bryan E Lege'
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Represented By: Jordan Michael Jeansonne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?