Stephens v. Kichuk et al
Plaintiff: Jaymar Stephens
Defendant: United State Fire Insurance Company, Progressive Northern Insurance Company, All Freight Movers, LLC, Ivan Kichuk, Progressive Casualty Insurance Co, United States Fire Insurance Co, All Freight Movers L L C and Progressive Northern Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2020cv00680
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Joint RULE 26(f) Report by Jaymar Stephens, Progressive Northern Insurance Co, Ivan Kichuk, All Freight Movers L L C. (aty,Higgins, Scott) Modified on 7/17/2020 to add filers. (Crick, S).
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2020 at 11:00 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 7/28/2020. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 8/4/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/7/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 7/7/2020. (jud,Hayes, Karen)
June 9, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by All Freight Movers L L C, Progressive Northern Insurance Co, identifying Corporate Parent, Progressive Corp for Progressive Northern Insurance Co. (aty,MacDonald, Ian) Modified on 6/9/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 6/1/2020. (crt,Leday, A)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/29/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Ian A MacDonald on behalf of All Freight Movers L L C, Progressive Northern Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/12/2020. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 28, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Thigpen, M)
May 28, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Freight Movers L L C, Ivan Kichuk. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #6 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL)(crt,Thigpen, M)
May 28, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Northern Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: (THE PDF IMAGE CAN BE FOUND IN ATTACHMENT #6 OF DOCUMENT #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL).(crt,Thigpen, M)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 620619-B with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4276756) filed by Progressive Northern Insurance Company, Ivan Kichuk, All Freight Movers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "1" to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit List of Parties and Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil cover sheet, #6 State court petition)(Attorney Ian A MacDonald added to party All Freight Movers, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Ian A MacDonald added to party Ivan Kichuk(pty:dft), Attorney Ian A MacDonald added to party Progressive Northern Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,MacDonald, Ian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens v. Kichuk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United State Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Freight Movers, LLC
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivan Kichuk
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fire Insurance Co
Represented By: Mark A Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Freight Movers L L C
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Northern Insurance Co
Represented By: Ian A MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaymar Stephens
Represented By: Scott F Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?