Ceasar v. Jenkins et al
Plaintiff: **Sanctioned/Barred* R Ceasar
Defendant: Matt Scruggins, Randy Wagley and Patrick Jenkins
Case Number: 5:2020cv00767
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fees and costs as ordered by this Court in #3 Order. Accordingly, ORDERED that #1 Complaint be stricken from the record and this case closed. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 7/23/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint Referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/22/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Ordered that Plaintiff pay fees and cost owed in 6:04-CV-00391 totaling $14,498.62 as well as the filing fees of $400.00 in this case within 30 days. Failure to pay the fees and costs will result in the complaint being stricken from the record and this case closed. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 6/22/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER re #1 Complaint Referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/19/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
June 18, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thigpen, M)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patrick Jenkins, Matt Scruggins, Randy Wagley filed by R Ceasar. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(crt,Bunting, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceasar v. Jenkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Scruggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Wagley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: **Sanctioned/Barred* R Ceasar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?