Smith et al v. 3 M Co et al
Plaintiff: Dionne Smith and Larry Smith
Defendant: 3M Company f//k/a Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company, Empire Abrasive Equipment and 3 M Co
Case Number: 5:2020cv00837
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. 3 M Co granted thirty day extension to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 8/12/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by 3 M Co. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order A - Proposed Order on Motion for Time)(Attorney Christina M Seanor added to party 3 M Co(pty:dft))(aty,Seanor, Christina)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dionne Smith, Larry Smith. (aty,Harrelson, Steven)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to 3 M Co, Empire Abrasive Equipment. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 30, 2020 Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes added. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dionne Smith, Larry Smith. (aty,Harrelson, Steven)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3 M Co and Empire Abrasive Equipment with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4309406) filed by Larry Smith, Dionne Smith.(Attorney Steven Pate Harrelson added to party Dionne Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Steven Pate Harrelson added to party Larry Smith(pty:pla))(aty,Harrelson, Steven) Modified docket text on 7/1/2020 (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. 3 M Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionne Smith
Represented By: Steven Pate Harrelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Smith
Represented By: Steven Pate Harrelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company f//k/a Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Empire Abrasive Equipment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 M Co
Represented By: Christina M Seanor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?