Ceasar v. Bercier Dentistry et al
Plaintiff: **Sanctioned/Barred* R Ceasar
Defendant: Bercier Dentistry and Owner of Bercier Dentistry
Case Number: 5:2020cv00930
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fees and costs as ordered by this Court in #3 Memorandum Order. ORDERED that the #1 Complaint be and is hereby stricken from the record and this case closed. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 8/31/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint, #3 Memorandum Order, Referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/28/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Ordered that Plaintiff pay fees and costs owed in 6:04-CV-00391 totaling $14,498.62 as well as the filing fees of $400.00 in this case within 30 days. Failure to pay the fees and costs will result in the complaint being stricken and this case closed. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 7/27/2020. (crt,McDonnell, D)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Complaint Referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/27/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
July 23, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bercier Dentistry, Owner of Bercier Dentistry with Jury Demand filed by R Ceasar. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ceasar v. Bercier Dentistry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bercier Dentistry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owner of Bercier Dentistry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: **Sanctioned/Barred* R Ceasar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?