West v. North River Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Sherry West
Defendant: Threlkeld and Company Insurance Company, North River Insurance Co, Big Boy Ranch L L C, Terry Williams and Threlkeld & Co Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2020cv01064
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2020 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 10/26/2020. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 11/2/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 11/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/8/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/6/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 SECOND AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Big Boy Ranch L L C, North River Insurance Co, Terry Williams. Amendment to #11 Amended Document, #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jason Smith, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Defendant Insurance Dec Page, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff Diagnosis Record)(aty,Womack, Kenneth) Modified on 9/21/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
September 11, 2020 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Kenneth Stephen Womack on behalf of Big Boy Ranch L L C, North River Insurance Co and Terry Williams regarding #13 Notice of Service of Request of Admission to Plaintiff. Action taken: Modified docket entry to reflect "Filed in Error"; Counsel is reminded of Local Rule 26.5, FRCP5(d), and Standing Order 1.15; local and federal rules do not allow routine filing of discovery, including disclosures and subpoenas under Rule 26. No further action on part of counsel is required. (crt,Dauterive, C)
September 11, 2020 Filing 13 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Service of Request of Admission to Plaintiff by Big Boy Ranch L L C, North River Insurance Co, Terry Williams (aty,Womack, Kenneth) Modified on 9/14/2020 to reflect "Filed in Error" (Dauterive, C).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM ORDER: The removing defendants will be allowed until 9/21/2020 to file a second amended notice of removal that specifically alleges the citizenship of Big Boy Ranch, LLC and attempts to provide additional facts in support of its contention that the amount in controversy requirement is met. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/10/2020. (crt,Keifer, K)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Big Boy Ranch L L C, North River Insurance Co, Terry Williams. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal filed in response to #8 Memorandum Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Big Boy Ranch Texas SOS Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Threlkeld Texas SOS Documents)(aty,Womack, Kenneth) Modified text on 9/10/2020 (Reeves, T).
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Big Boy Ranch L L C; no corporate parents. (aty,Womack, Kenneth) Modified text on 8/28/2020 (Dunford, T).
August 28, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by North River Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent United States Fire Insurance Co, Corporate Parent Crum & Forster Holdings Corp, Corporate Parent F F H L Group Ltd, Corporate Parent Fairfax Financial Holdings Ltd, Corporate Parent Fairfax (U S) Inc for North River Insurance Co. (aty,Womack, Kenneth)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Before Court can make finding of subject matter jurisdiction, removing defendants need to amend notice of removal to provide more information about citizenship of Big Boy Ranch and amount in controversy. Compliance Deadline for removing defendants to file amended notice of removal set for 9/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/26/2020. (crt,Dunford, T)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss, dismissing Threlkeld & Co Insurance Co, without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 8/24/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Big Boy Ranch L L C, North River Insurance Co, Terry Williams.(aty,Womack, Kenneth)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Sherry West. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/21/2020. (aty,Prudhomme, Geya) Modified on 8/21/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/18/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/18/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Robert E Dille, Kenneth Stephen Womack on behalf of Big Boy Ranch L L C, North River Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/1/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
August 17, 2020 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. North River Insurance Co answer due 8/24/2020; Threlkeld and Company Insurance Company answer due 8/24/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: SEE PDF IMAGE ATTACHMENT #1 TO #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (crt,Jones, P)
August 17, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Jones, P)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 624,841 (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4359409) filed by Big Boy Ranch L L C, North River Insurance Co, Terry Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Caddo Parish Court Docket and Pleadings, #3 Exhibit B - Threlkeld Consent to Removal)(Attorney Kenneth Stephen Womack added to party Big Boy Ranch L L C, North River Insurance Co, Terry Williams(pty:dft))(aty,Womack, Kenneth) Modified on 8/18/2020 to edit text (Jones, P).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. North River Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry West
Represented By: Geya Dawn Prudhomme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Threlkeld and Company Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North River Insurance Co
Represented By: Robert E Dille
Represented By: Kenneth Stephen Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Boy Ranch L L C
Represented By: Robert E Dille
Represented By: Kenneth Stephen Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Williams
Represented By: Robert E Dille
Represented By: Kenneth Stephen Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Threlkeld & Co Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?