Longoria et al v. Mitchell et al
Plaintiff: Calvin Longoria and Dustin Crow
Defendant: Unknown Deputies, Aaron Mitchell and Berlion Sweet
Case Number: 5:2020cv01069
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Referring Judge: Donald E Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER: All requirements of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) are hereby waived in this case, including the conference of the parties and the report to the Court. The parties are directed to serve their initial disclosures within 30 days and promptly begin any necessary discovery and motion practice. A scheduling order will be issued by the Court setting the matter for trial in due course. Signed by Judge Donald E Walter on 9/9/2020. (crt,Bray, K)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Aaron Mitchell, Berlion Sweet.(Attorney John Chris Guillet added to party Aaron Mitchell(pty:dft), Attorney John Chris Guillet added to party Berlion Sweet(pty:dft))(aty,Guillet, John)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/25/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Aaron Mitchell on 8/19/2020, answer due 9/9/2020filed by Dustin Crow, Calvin Longoria. (aty,Beaird, Mary) (Main Document 3 replaced on 8/20/2020) (Bunting, M). Modified docket text and to add answer due date on 8/20/2020 (Bunting, M).
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aaron Mitchell, Berlion Sweet. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 18, 2020 Judge Donald E Walter and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby added. (crt,Bunting, M)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aaron Mitchell, Unknown Deputies and Berlion Sweet with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4360801) filed by Calvin Longoria, Dustin Crow. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Mary Katherine Beaird added to party Dustin Crow(pty:pla), Attorney Mary Katherine Beaird added to party Calvin Longoria(pty:pla))(aty,Beaird, Mary) Modified docket text on 8/18/2020 (Bunting, M).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longoria et al v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Deputies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Mitchell
Represented By: John Chris Guillet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berlion Sweet
Represented By: John Chris Guillet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Longoria
Represented By: Mary Katherine Beaird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Crow
Represented By: Mary Katherine Beaird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?