Netro et al v. Amerifield Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Netro and Ana Marlene Figueroa-Santos
Defendant: Amerifield Inc, Trisura Specialty Insurance Co and David Payne
Case Number: 5:2020cv01082
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel. Added as counsel Brandon Trey Morris, Elizabeth Ann Hancock, Joseph Chancellor Nerren, John Allen Davis, Joshua Lynn Powell for Ana Marlene Figueroa-Santos and Jesus Netro. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/31/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trisura Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Trisua Group Ltd. for Trisura Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Aucoin, Ralph)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/31/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for B.Trey Morris, Elizabeth A Hancock, J Chancellor Nerren, John Davis, Josh Powell to Enroll as Counsel by Ana Marlene Figueroa-Santos, Jesus Netro. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Dewett, Justin)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/20/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/19/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Ralph J Aucoin, Jr on behalf of Trisura Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/2/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
August 19, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
August 19, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Trisura Specialty Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachment # 13 to document #1 Notice of Removal.(crt,Crick, S)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC, Caddo Parish, Case Number 623893-C with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4362668) filed by Trisura Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Certificate of Filing, #3 Verification, #4 Exhibit A-Petition, #5 Exhibit B-Corr to Dewett re Stipulation, #6 Exhibit C-Corr to Dewett with Answer-RFN-JO and discovery, #7 List of Parties, #8 List of Pleadings, #9 State court petition Exhibit 1-List of Pldgs, #10 Exhibit 2-Citation_List of Pldgs, #11 Exhibit 3-Dilatory Exception_List of Pldgs, #12 Exhibit 4-Rule to Show Cause_List of Pldgs, #13 Exhibit 5-Answer-RFN-Jury Order_List of Pldgs)(Attorney Ralph J Aucoin, Jr added to party Trisura Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Aucoin, Ralph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Netro et al v. Amerifield Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerifield Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisura Specialty Insurance Co
Represented By: Kristopher Michael Gould
Represented By: Guy D Perrier
Represented By: Ralph J Aucoin, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Netro
Represented By: Justin Carey Dewett
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Hancock
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Powell
Represented By: John Allen Davis
Represented By: Brandon Trey Morris
Represented By: Joseph Chancellor Nerren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Marlene Figueroa-Santos
Represented By: Justin Carey Dewett
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Hancock
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Powell
Represented By: John Allen Davis
Represented By: Brandon Trey Morris
Represented By: Joseph Chancellor Nerren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?