Plater v. Bossier Parish Sheriff Medium Facility et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Latravis Plater
Defendant: Bossier Parish Sheriff Medium Facility and Emily Hamm
Case Number: 5:2020cv01093
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 LETTER from Plaintiff to Court re case. (Filed as a "Motion to Reopen" in civil actions 19-171 and 14-3308.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (crt,Haik, K)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Voluntary Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/23/2020. (crt,Haik, K)
September 22, 2020 NOTICE of Change of Address by Joshua Latravis Plater. Clerk updated plaintiff's address to Caddo Correctional Center per doc. #7 . (crt,Haik, K)
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Joshua Latravis Plater. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(crt,Haik, K)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST from Joshua L Plater for update on cases. Clerk mailed copy work letter on 09/17/2020. (Public entry, but no electronic notice.) (Attachments: #1 Copy Work Letter, #2 Envelope) (crt,Chavis, J)
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Joshua Latravis Plater, Bossier Medium Correctional Center, re: #4 Sec P - Deficiency Order, returned marked: return to sender. released to Caddo CC. Action taken: Clerk resent to plaintiff at Caddo CC. (crt,Haik, K)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms.Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 9/21/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Rights form, #2 In forma pauperis form)(crt,Taylor, L)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/21/2020. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT: Unredacted Complaint by Joshua Latravis Plater re #1 Complaint,. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 19, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Devillier, W)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Bossier Parish Sheriff Medium Facility, Emily Hamm filed by Joshua Latravis Plater. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Adams, K). Complaint not on approved form. (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/21/2020) (Devillier, W).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plater v. Bossier Parish Sheriff Medium Facility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bossier Parish Sheriff Medium Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Hamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Latravis Plater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?