East West Bank et al v. Joseph J Blake & Associates Inc et al
Plaintiff: East West Bank, EWB-I, LLC and E W B - I L L C
Defendant: Arturo Singer, Robert R. Tipton, Joseph J. Blake and Associates, Inc., Joseph J Blake & Associates Inc and Robert R Tipton
Case Number: 5:2020cv01094
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Joseph J Blake & Associates Inc, Arturo Singer, Robert R Tipton . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(aty,Ghantous, Mina)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/24/2020. (crt,Jones, P)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/24/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/21/2020. (crt,Crick, S)
August 20, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 623890-C with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4364286) filed by Arturo Singer, Joseph J Blake & Associates Inc, Robert R Tipton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Petition, #2 Exhibit State Petition, #3 Exhibit Citations, #4 Exhibit State Court record, #5 Civil cover sheet, #6 Corporate Disclosure, #7 Proof of Service)(Attorney Mina Rosette Ghantous added to party Joseph J Blake & Associates Inc(pty:dft), Arturo Singer(pty:dft), Robert R Tipton (pty:dft))(aty,Ghantous, Mina) Modified on 8/21/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East West Bank et al v. Joseph J Blake & Associates Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East West Bank
Represented By: John T Balhoff, II
Represented By: Josie Nicole Serigne
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: Jacob A Airey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EWB-I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E W B - I L L C
Represented By: John T Balhoff, II
Represented By: Josie Nicole Serigne
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: Jacob A Airey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Singer
Represented By: Mina Rosette Ghantous
Represented By: Beverly Aloisio DeLaune
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R. Tipton
Represented By: Mina Rosette Ghantous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J. Blake and Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Mina Rosette Ghantous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph J Blake & Associates Inc
Represented By: Beverly Aloisio DeLaune
Represented By: Mina Rosette Ghantous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R Tipton
Represented By: Beverly Aloisio DeLaune
Represented By: Mina Rosette Ghantous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?