Yankie v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co et al
Plaintiff: Joan Yankie
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co, Hoosier Rapid Transport Inc, Jack Steliga, Scottsdale Insurance Co, Hoosier R V Transport Inc and Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co
Case Number: 5:2020cv01120
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2020 10:30 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 11/23/2020. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 11/30/2020. Rule 26 Report due by 11/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/21/2020. (crt,Reeves, T)
October 20, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by Hoosier R V Transport Inc, Hoosier Rapid Transport Inc, Scottsdale Insurance Co, Jack Steliga.(aty,Marquez, Sandra)
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hoosier R V Transport Inc, Hoosier Rapid Transport Inc.(aty,Marquez, Sandra)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER: All defendants except for Hoosier RV Transport, Inc and Hoosier Rapid Transport, Inc have filed answers. Once those two defendants file their answers, the case will proceed toward a scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/19/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/9/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
October 6, 2020 Filing 15 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE of Removal by Hoosier R V Transport Inc, Hoosier Rapid Transport Inc, Scottsdale Insurance Co, Jack Steliga. . (aty,Marquez, Sandra) Modified on 10/7/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM ORDER. The removing defendants will be allowed until October 9, 2020 to file a second amended notice of removal and attempt to set forth facts to show the citizenship of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. Counsel for Allstate are directed to assist counsel for the removing defendants in obtaining the required information. See Memorandum Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/24/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED Notice of Removal by Hoosier R V Transport Inc, Hoosier Rapid Transport Inc, Scottsdale Insurance Co, Jack Steliga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(aty,Marquez, Sandra) Modified on 9/23/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parents, Allstate Insurance Holdings L L C, Allstate Corp for Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co. (aty,Ducoing, Erica) Modified on 9/14/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hoosier R V Transport Inc, Hoosier Rapid Transport Inc, Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Marquez, Sandra) Modified on 9/14/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM ORDER: The removing defendants will be allowed until 9/23/2020 to file an amended notice of removal and attempt to set forth sufficient facts to show that there is complete diversity of citizenship and that the amount in controversy requirement is met. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/9/2020. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/1/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Brandon Trey Morris, Elizabeth Ann Hancock, Joshua Lynn Powell, Joseph Chancellor Nerren, John Allen Davis for Joan Yankie. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/1/2020. (crt,Keller, J)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for B. Trey Morris, Elzabeth A. Hancock, Josh Powell, J. Chancellor Nerren and John A. Davis to Enroll as Counsel by Joan Yankie. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Dewett, Justin)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Sandra Lynn Marquez on behalf of Hoosier R V Transport Inc, Hoosier Rapid Transport Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/14/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P) PLEASE NOTE: Corporate disclosure statement filed by this party Doc. #3 DID NOT meet the requirements of FRCP 7.1 requiring identification of corporate parents. Modified on 8/31/2020 to indicate previous filing did not meet requirements. (Mitchell, P)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/31/2020. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Sandra Lynn Marquez on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 9/14/2020. PLEASE NOTE: Corporate disclosure statement filed by this party DID NOT meet the requirements of FRCP 7.1 requiring identification of corporate parents. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 28, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER filed on July 21, 2020, in the 1st JDC, Parish of Caddo, re Motion for Extension of Time for Hoosier RV Transport, Inc., and Hoosier Rapid Transport, Inc., to file response to Plaintiff's First Supplemental and Amended Complaint. Extension of 30 days granted until August 21, 2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #6, page 163, to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 28, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Co, Jack Steliga. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #6 to Document #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 28, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #6 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 28, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint, by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #6 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal.(crt,Mitchell, P)
August 28, 2020 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co, Hoosier R V Transport Inc, Hoosier Rapid Transport Inc, Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co, Scottsdale Insurance Co, Jack Steliga filed by Joan Yankie. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal.(crt,Mitchell, P)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hoosier R V Transport Inc, Hoosier Rapid Transport Inc, Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Marquez, Sandra) Modified on 8/31/2020 (Mitchell, P). PLEASE NOTE: This statement did not meet the requirements of FRCP 7.1 requiring identification of corporate parents.
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co (Attorney Erica Marie Ducoing added to party Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co(pty:dft)). (aty,Ducoing, Erica)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 620439 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4371895) filed by Hoosier Rapid Transport, Inc., Jack Steliga, Scottsdale Insurance Co, Hoosier RV Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State court petition Exhibit A in globo, #2 Civil cover sheet, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Verification, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Filing of State Court Record, #6 Exhibit State Court Record, #7 State court notice of filing, #8 Exhibit List of Attorneys and Parties in State Action, #9 State court citation)(Attorney Sandra Lynn Marquez added to party Hoosier RV Transport, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Lynn Marquez added to party Hoosier Rapid Transport, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Lynn Marquez added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Lynn Marquez added to party Jack Steliga(pty:dft))(aty,Marquez, Sandra) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/31/2020) (Mitchell, P). Modified on 8/31/2020 to replace civil cover sheet with PDF buttons. (Mitchell, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yankie v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoosier Rapid Transport Inc
Represented By: Sandra Lynn Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Steliga
Represented By: Sandra Lynn Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scottsdale Insurance Co
Represented By: Sandra Lynn Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoosier R V Transport Inc
Represented By: Sandra Lynn Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire & Casualty Insurance Co
Represented By: Erica Marie Ducoing
Represented By: James Kristopher Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Yankie
Represented By: Justin Carey Dewett
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Hancock
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Powell
Represented By: John Allen Davis
Represented By: Brandon Trey Morris
Represented By: Joseph Chancellor Nerren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?