P C L Civil Constructors Inc v. Netherthon et al
Plaintiff: PCL Civil Constructors, Inc. and P C L Civil Constructors Inc
Defendant: F.J. Burnell, Inc., Grover Netherthon, Netherthon Concrete, L.L.C., Netherthon Concrete L L C and F J Burnell Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01267
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 12/14/2020. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 11/23/2020. (crt,Crawford, A)
November 18, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Netherthon Concrete L L C (Attorney R Cody Mayo, Jr added to party Netherthon Concrete L L C(pty:dft)). (aty,Mayo, R)
November 18, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by F J Burnell Inc. (aty,Mayo, R)
November 18, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, by F J Burnell Inc, Grover Netherthon,.(Attorney R Cody Mayo, Jr added to party F J Burnell Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Mayo, R) Modified filers on 11/18/2020 (Bunting, M).
October 19, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by P C L Civil Constructors Inc. F J Burnell Inc served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. (aty,D'Arcy, Adrian)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by P C L Civil Constructors Inc. Netherthon Concrete L L C served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. (aty,D'Arcy, Adrian)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by P C L Civil Constructors Inc. Grover Netherthon served on 10/16/2020, answer due 11/6/2020. (aty,D'Arcy, Adrian)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to F J Burnell Inc, Grover Netherthon, Netherthon Concrete L L C. (crt,Crawford, A)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/2/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants filed by P C L Civil Constructors Inc.(aty,D'Arcy, Adrian) Modified docket text on 10/1/2020 (Bunting, M).
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER re #1 Complaint, filed by P C L Civil Constructors Inc. Plaintiff will be able to file an amended complaint without leave of court if it acts within the time allowed by Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 15, so it should act promptly to address this issue and ensure that the court has jurisdiction of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/30/2020. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by P C L Civil Constructors Inc. (aty,D'Arcy, Adrian)
September 28, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Terry A Doughty. Judge Elizabeth E Foote no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 9/28/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint, sent to Adrian A D'Arcy, Lloyd N Shields on behalf of P C L Civil Constructors Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 10/13/2020. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to F J Burnell Inc, Grover Netherthon, Netherthon Concrete L L C. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 25, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thomas, T)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Grover Netherthon, Netherthon Concrete L L C, F J Burnell Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4400627) filed by PCL Civil Constructors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Adrian A D'Arcy added to party PCL Civil Constructors, Inc.(pty:pla))(aty,D'Arcy, Adrian) Modified to edit docket text on 9/28/2020 (Thomas, T).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: P C L Civil Constructors Inc v. Netherthon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.J. Burnell, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grover Netherthon
Represented By: R Cody Mayo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netherthon Concrete, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netherthon Concrete L L C
Represented By: R Cody Mayo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F J Burnell Inc
Represented By: R Cody Mayo, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PCL Civil Constructors, Inc.
Represented By: Adrian A D'Arcy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P C L Civil Constructors Inc
Represented By: Adrian A D'Arcy
Represented By: Lloyd N Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?