Burt et al v. Forest River Inc et al
Plaintiff: Billy R. Burt, June Darlene Burt and Billy R Burt
Defendant: Forest River, Inc., Progressive Casualty Insurance Company, Bank of the West, Bayou Outdoors Supercenter, L.L.C., Progressive Casualty Insurance Co, Bayou Outdoors Supercenter L L C and Forest River Inc
Case Number: 5:2020cv01370
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Referring Judge: Donald E Walter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Forest River Inc. Forest River Inc waiver sent on 11/2/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Attorney Ryan E Johnson added to party Forest River Inc(pty:dft)) (aty,Johnson, Ryan)
October 26, 2020 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: The Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act confers federal question jurisdiction over breach of warranty claims where the amount in controversy exceeds $50,000, exclusive of interest, costs, and attorney fees. 15 U.S.C. 2310(d)(3); Scarlott v. Nissan North America, Inc., 771 F.3d 883, 887 (5th Cir. 2014). Accordingly, having reviewed the pleadings and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1331 and 15 U.S.C. 2310(d)(3). This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/26/2020. (crt,Rider, M)
October 23, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank of the West, Bayou Outdoors Supercenter L L C, Forest River Inc, Progressive Casualty Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 22, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Donald E Walter and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Miletello, A)
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Forest River Inc, Bayou Outdoor Supercenter L L C, Bank of the West, Progressive Casualty Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4433699) filed by Billy R. Burt, June Darlene Burt. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed summons/writ, #3 Proposed summons/writ, #4 Proposed summons/writ, #5 Proposed summons/writ)(Attorney Richard C Dalton added to party Billy R. Burt(pty:pla), Attorney Richard C Dalton added to party June Darlene Burt(pty:pla))(aty,Dalton, Richard) Modified on 10/23/2020 to modify docket text (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burt et al v. Forest River Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of the West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayou Outdoors Supercenter, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Casualty Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayou Outdoors Supercenter L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forest River Inc
Represented By: Ryan E Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy R. Burt
Represented By: Richard C Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: June Darlene Burt
Represented By: Richard C Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy R Burt
Represented By: Richard C Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?