Richardson v. Unnamed Defendants
Plaintiff: Jerome Richardson
Defendant: Unnamed Defendants
Case Number: 5:2020cv01475
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit documents on approved forms. Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 12/23/2020). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 1983 form, #2 ifp form)(crt,Haik, K)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/20/2020. (crt,Devillier, W)
November 16, 2020 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Devillier, W)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 DEFICIENT COMPLAINT against Unnamed Defendants filed by Jerome Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Chavis, J). Complaint not on approved form.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Unnamed Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unnamed Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?