B P X Properties (N A) L P et al v. Hosier Properties L L C et al
Plaintiff: BHP Billiton Petroleum (TxLa Operating) Company, BHP Billiton Petroleum Properties (N.A.), L.P., B P X Properties (N A) L P, B P X Operating Co, B H P Billiton Petroleum Properties (N A) L P and B H P Billiton Petroleum (TxLa Operating) Co
Defendant: Mary Lucille Martin Barnes, Ilios Exploration L L C, Robert L Brown, Wendy Benscotter, Lee Corcoran Degges, Amie M. Martin, Miles Minerals, L.L.C., Pamela Jeter Comegys, TLC Investments, L.L.C., FCX Oil & Gas, Inc., David G. Benscotter, Ninock Land Company, L.L.C., Robert E. O'Brien, Jr., Gena L. Matthews, Eswick, Inc., Franto, L.L.C., Chesapeake Louisiana L P, Arkoma Louisiana L L C, REOB, L.L.C., Rosa M. Byers, Cynthia Fry Peironnet Family, L.L.C., Hosier Properties, L.L.C., Jimmy Ray Martin, Jr., Cheryl Thibodeaux, State of Louisiana, Eleanor Baugniers de St. Marceaux, EnCana Oil & Gas (U S A) Inc, Small Fry, L.L.C., Spring Branch Land & Minerals, L.L.C., Ellen Degges, Riptide Minerals, L.L.C., Deborah Bailey, Bobby D. Matthews, Amie M Martin, Ninock Land Co L L C, Jimmy Ray Martin, Jr, Small Fry L L C, Eleanor Baugniers de St Marceaux, Spring Branch Land & Minerals L L C, Cheryl Ann Crosslin Thibodeaux, David G Benscotter, T L C Investments L L C, Bobby D Matthews, Eswick Inc, Shirley H Martin, R E O B L L C, Deborah Lynn Crosslin Bailey, Cynthia Fry Peironnet Family L L C, Hosier Properties L L C, Gena L Matthews, Riptide Minerals L L C, Rosa M Byers, Franto L L C, F C X Oil & Gas Inc, Robert E O'Brien, Jr and Miles Minerals L L C
Not Classified By Court: Shirley Martin
Case Number: 5:2021cv00183
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 17 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable: Mail sent to Elizabeth A Rutledge, 6969 Gen Diaz St; New Orleans, LA 70124, re: #12 Removal Order, #14 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and #16 Order on Motion for Referral to Bankruptcy Court, returned marked: Attempted-Not Known Unable to Forward. (Main Document: Returned Document #12) (Attachments: #1 Returned Document #14, #2 Returned Document #16) (crt,Dauterive, C)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Referral to Bankruptcy Court. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to Local Rule 83.4.1, this matter be and is hereby REFERRED to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Louisiana, Shreveport Division. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 2/2/2021. (crt,Keifer, K)
January 28, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #15 MOTION for Referral to Bankruptcy Court. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 28, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Referral to Bankruptcy Court (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/28/2021.) by Chesapeake Louisiana L P. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Casey, Sarah) Modified on 2/1/2021 to remove additional motion event selected in error. (Dauterive, C).
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Michael Steven Heier and Harry James Vorhoff terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 1/28/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
January 27, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Withdraw Harry J. Vorhoff and Michael S. Heier as Attorney by State of Louisiana. Motions referred to Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E-mails from withdrawing counsel, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Seidemann, Ryan)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 1/27/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
January 26, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/26/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/26/2021) (Dauterive, C).
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: Notice of Corporate Name Change and MOTION to Amend Case Caption, #1 Notice of Removal sent to April Leigh Rolen-Ogden on behalf of B P X Operating Co and B P X Properties (N A) L P. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/9/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: Answer to Complaint sent to Kevin W Hammond on behalf of T L C Investments L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/9/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 26, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: Answer to Complaint sent to Grant E Summers on behalf of Cynthia Fry Peironnet Family L L C, Ninock Land Co L L C and Small Fry L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/9/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: Answer to Complaint sent to Franklin H Spruiell, Jr on behalf of Arkoma Louisiana L L C, Eswick Inc, Franto L L C, Ilios Exploration L L C, Miles Minerals L L C, R E O B L L C, Riptide Minerals L L C and Spring Branch Land & Minerals L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/9/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: Answer to Complaint sent to John Tucker Kalmbach on behalf of EnCana Oil & Gas (U S A) Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/9/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 26, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Kenneth M Klemm on behalf of Chesapeake Louisiana L P, F C X Oil & Gas Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/9/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: Answer to Complaint sent to William M Street on behalf of Hosier Properties L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/9/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 26, 2021 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: Answer to Complaint sent to John Tucker Kalmbach on behalf of EnCana Oil & Gas (U S A) Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/9/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C) Modified on 1/26/2021 to reflect "Filed in Error", did not generate pdf form. Refiled as document #6 (Dauterive, C).
January 26, 2021 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Kenneth M Klemm on behalf of Chesapeake Louisiana L P and F C X Oil & Gas Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/9/2021. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Dauterive, C). Modified on 1/26/2021 to reflect "Filed in Error", did not generate pdf form. Refiled as document #5 (Dauterive, C).
January 22, 2021 NOTICE of Corporate Name Change and MOTION to Amend Case Caption by B P X Operating Co and B P X Properties (N A) L P with Signed Order granting Motion. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf documents, Attachment #7 - State Court Record Part 6, pages 74-76 of 114 pages. Clerk has amended the case caption accordingly pursuant to the order filed 10/21/2019 in the State Court proceedings. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 22, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Hosier Properties L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #4 to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attorney William M Street added to party Hosier Properties L L C(pty:dft))(crt,Dauterive, C)
January 22, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by EnCana Oil & Gas (U S A) Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #4 to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attorney John Tucker Kalmbach added to party EnCana Oil & Gas (U S A) Inc(pty:dft))(crt,Dauterive, C)
January 22, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Rosa M Byers. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #3 to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attorney Billy R Pesnell added to party Rosa M Byers(pty:dft), Attorney John Whitney Pesnell added to party Rosa M Byers(pty:dft), Attorney William Alan Pesnell added to party Rosa M Byers(pty:dft))(crt,Dauterive, C)
January 22, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Dauterive, C)
January 22, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by State of Louisiana. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #4 to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attorney Michael Steven Heier added to party State of Louisiana(pty:dft), Attorney Harry James Vorhoff added to party State of Louisiana(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Michael Seidemann added to party State of Louisiana(pty:dft))(crt,Dauterive, C)
January 22, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Cynthia Fry Peironnet Family L L C, Ninock Land Co L L C, Small Fry L L C, Eleanor Baugniers de St Marceaux. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #5 to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attorney Grant E Summers added to party Cynthia Fry Peironnet Family L L C(pty:dft), Attorney William Lake Hearne, Jr added to party Cynthia Fry Peironnet Family L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Grant E Summers added to party Ninock Land Co L L C(pty:dft), Attorney William Lake Hearne, Jr added to party Ninock Land Co L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Grant E Summers added to party Small Fry L L C(pty:dft), Attorney William Lake Hearne, Jr added to party Small Fry L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Grant E Summers added to party Eleanor Baugniers de St Marceaux(pty:dft), Attorney William Lake Hearne, Jr added to party Eleanor Baugniers de St Marceaux(pty:dft))(crt,Dauterive, C)
January 22, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Chesapeake Louisiana L P, F C X Oil & Gas Inc. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #5 to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attorney Elizabeth A Rutledge added to party Chesapeake Louisiana L P(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth M Klemm added to party F C X Oil & Gas Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Jan M Hayden added to party F C X Oil & Gas Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth A Rutledge added to party F C X Oil & Gas Inc(pty:dft))(crt,Dauterive, C)
January 22, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Pamela Jeter Comegys. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #5 to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Pamela Jeter Comegys(pty:dft))(crt,Dauterive, C)
January 22, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Arkoma Louisiana L L C, David G Benscotter, Wendy Benscotter, Ellen Degges, Lee Corcoran Degges, Eswick Inc, Franto L L C, Ilios Exploration L L C, Bobby D Matthews, Gena L Matthews, Miles Minerals L L C, Robert E O'Brien, Jr, R E O B L L C, Riptide Minerals L L C, Spring Branch Land & Minerals L L C. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY; see pdf document, Attachment #5 to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Arkoma Louisiana L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party David G Benscotter(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Wendy Benscotter(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Ellen Degges(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Lee Corcoran Degges(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Eswick Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Franto L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Ilios Exploration L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Bobby D Matthews(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Gena L Matthews(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Miles Minerals L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Robert E O'Brien, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party R E O B L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Riptide Minerals L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Spring Branch Land & Minerals L L C(pty:dft))(crt,Dauterive, C)
January 22, 2021 ANSWER to Complaint by Deborah Lynn Crosslin Bailey, Mary Lucille Martin Barnes, Robert L Brown, Amie M Martin, Jimmy Ray Martin, Jr, Shirley H Martin, T L C Investments L L C, Cheryl Ann Crosslin Thibodeaux. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTYRY; see pdf document, Attachment #10 to #1 Notice of Removal. (Attorney Kevin W Hammond added to party Deborah Lynn Crosslin Bailey(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Hammond added to party Mary Lucille Martin Barnes(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Hammond added to party Robert L Brown(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Hammond added to party Amie M Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Hammond added to party Jimmy Ray Martin, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Hammond added to party Shirley H Martin(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Hammond added to party T L C Investments L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin W Hammond added to party Cheryl Ann Crosslin Thibodeaux(pty:dft))(crt,Dauterive, C)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 587,839 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4546577) filed by Chesapeake Louisiana L P. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Record Part 1, #3 Exhibit State Court Record Part 2, #4 Exhibit State Court Record Part 3, #5 Exhibit State Court Record Part 4, #6 Exhibit State Court Record Part 5, #7 Exhibit State Court Record Part 6, #8 Exhibit State Court Record Part 7, #9 Exhibit State Court Record Part 8, #10 Exhibit State Court Record Part 9, #11 Exhibit State Court Record Part 10, #12 Exhibit State Court Record Part 11, #13 Exhibit State Court Record Part 12, #14 Exhibit Stay Lift Order, #15 Exhibit Removal Deadline Order, #16 Exhibit State Court Notice)(Attorney Sarah Katherine Casey added to party Chesapeake Louisiana L P(pty:dft))(aty,Casey, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B P X Properties (N A) L P et al v. Hosier Properties L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Lucille Martin Barnes
Represented By: Kevin W Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilios Exploration L L C
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L Brown
Represented By: Kevin W Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Benscotter
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Corcoran Degges
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amie M. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles Minerals, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Jeter Comegys
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TLC Investments, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCX Oil & Gas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Benscotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninock Land Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. O'Brien, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gena L. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eswick, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franto, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Louisiana L P
Represented By: Sarah Katherine Casey
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Jan M Hayden
Represented By: Elizabeth A Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkoma Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REOB, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa M. Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Fry Peironnet Family, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hosier Properties, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Ray Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Thibodeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Michael Steven Heier
Represented By: Ryan Michael Seidemann
Represented By: Harry James Vorhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor Baugniers de St. Marceaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EnCana Oil & Gas (U S A) Inc
Represented By: John Tucker Kalmbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Fry, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Branch Land & Minerals, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Degges
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riptide Minerals, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby D. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amie M Martin
Represented By: Kevin W Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ninock Land Co L L C
Represented By: William Lake Hearne, Jr
Represented By: Grant E Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Ray Martin, Jr
Represented By: Kevin W Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Small Fry L L C
Represented By: William Lake Hearne, Jr
Represented By: Grant E Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eleanor Baugniers de St Marceaux
Represented By: William Lake Hearne, Jr
Represented By: Grant E Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Branch Land & Minerals L L C
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Ann Crosslin Thibodeaux
Represented By: Kevin W Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G Benscotter
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T L C Investments L L C
Represented By: Kevin W Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby D Matthews
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eswick Inc
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley H Martin
Represented By: Kevin W Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R E O B L L C
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Lynn Crosslin Bailey
Represented By: Kevin W Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Fry Peironnet Family L L C
Represented By: William Lake Hearne, Jr
Represented By: Grant E Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hosier Properties L L C
Represented By: William M Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gena L Matthews
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riptide Minerals L L C
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa M Byers
Represented By: John Whitney Pesnell
Represented By: Billy R Pesnell
Represented By: William Alan Pesnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franto L L C
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F C X Oil & Gas Inc
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Jan M Hayden
Represented By: Elizabeth A Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E O'Brien, Jr
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles Minerals L L C
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BHP Billiton Petroleum (TxLa Operating) Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BHP Billiton Petroleum Properties (N.A.), L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B P X Properties (N A) L P
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: Jamie D Rhymes
Represented By: April Leigh Rolen-Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B P X Operating Co
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: Jamie D Rhymes
Represented By: April Leigh Rolen-Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B H P Billiton Petroleum Properties (N A) L P
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: Jamie D Rhymes
Represented By: April Leigh Rolen-Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B H P Billiton Petroleum (TxLa Operating) Co
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: Jamie D Rhymes
Represented By: April Leigh Rolen-Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Shirley Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?