B H P Billiton Petroleum Properties N A L P et al v. Turner et al
Plaintiff: B H P Billiton Petroleum Properties (N A) L P and B H P Billiton Petroleum (TxLa Operating) Co
Defendant: Cohort Energy Co, Alternate Fuel Systems Inc, Lyndsey C Turner, Jay Petroleum L L C, City of Shreveport, State of Louisiana, Dutton Family L L C, Chesapeake Louisiana L P, Susan A C Bantle, Sheri Lynn Cowley Soulie, Tyler Ryan Turner, P X P Louisiana L L C, Dorothy C Leblanc, B & K Exploration Investments L L C, J J S Working Interests L L C, Ernest Turner, III, Argent Trust, S C Soulie & Sons L L C, Sklarco L L C and J W Operating Co
Case Number: 5:2021cv00259
Filed: February 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Referral to Bankruptcy Court. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to Local Rule 83.4.1, this matter be and is hereby REFERRED to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the Western District of Louisiana, Shreveport Division. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/10/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 9, 2021 Filing 18 FILED IN ERROR - MOTION to Reassign Case "Motion for Referral to Bankruptcy Court" by Chesapeake Louisiana L P. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Hayden, Jan) Modified on 2/9/2021 to indicate filed in wrong case and will be refiled in correct case (Jones, P).
February 9, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Referral to Bankruptcy Court by Chesapeake Louisiana L P. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Hayden, Jan) Modified event and docket text on 2/9/2021 (Bunting, M). Modified motion text on 2/10/2021 (Dunford, T).
February 9, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #17 MOTION for Referral to Bankruptcy Court. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel C A Martin, III for J W Operating Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/5/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
February 4, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Enroll additional Counsel by J W Operating Co. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney C A Martin, III added to party J W Operating Co(pty:dft))(aty,Martin, C) Modified event to more accurately describe document filed on 2/4/2021 (Bunting, M).
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/3/2021. (crt,Keller, J)
February 3, 2021 Filing 13 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/3/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Kenneth M Klemm on behalf of Chesapeake Louisiana L P. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/17/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 2, 2021 Filing 11 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Chesapeake Louisiana L P by Chesapeake Louisiana L P. (26th JDC, Parish of Bossier, #145648, filed 7/20/2020 - PDF of this document filed with #1 Notice of Removal, attachment 2) (crt,Bunting, M)
February 2, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Sklarco L L C. (26th JDC, Parish of Bossier, #145648, filed 3/5/2020 - PDF of this document filed with #1 Notice of Removal, attachment 2)(Attorney Malcolm S Murchison added to party Sklarco L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Christopher Fortson added to party Sklarco L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew R Lee added to party Sklarco L L C(pty:dft))(crt,Bunting, M)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by J J S Working Interests L L C. (26th JDC, Parish of Bossier, #145648, filed 3/5/20 - PDF of this document filed with #1 Notice of Removal, attachment 2)(Attorney Malcolm S Murchison added to party J J S Working Interests L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Christopher Fortson added to party J J S Working Interests L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew R Lee added to party J J S Working Interests L L C(pty:dft))(crt,Bunting, M)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 STATE COURT ORDER substituting counsel Robert L Salim, Taylor Townsend and Frank Elliot in the place of Richard M John for B & K Exploration Investments L L C. (26th JDC, Parish of Bossier, #145648, filed 2/28/2020 - PDF of this document filed with #1 Notice of Removal, attachment 2) (crt,Bunting, M)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Susan A C Bantle, Dorothy C Leblanc, S C Soulie & Sons L L C, Sheri Lynn Cowley Soulie, Argent Trust, Ernest Turner, III, Lyndsey C Turner, Tyler Ryan Turner. (26th JDC, Parish of Bossier, #145648, filed 12/15/2014 - PDF of this document filed with #1 Notice of Removal, attachment 2)(Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Susan A C Bantle(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey W Weiss added to party Susan A C Bantle(pty:dft), Attorney Reid Allen Jones added to party Susan A C Bantle(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Dorothy C Leblanc(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey W Weiss added to party Dorothy C Leblanc(pty:dft), Attorney Reid Allen Jones added to party Dorothy C Leblanc(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party S C Soulie & Sons L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey W Weiss added to party S C Soulie & Sons L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Reid Allen Jones added to party S C Soulie & Sons L L C(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Sheri Lynn Cowley Soulie(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey W Weiss added to party Sheri Lynn Cowley Soulie(pty:dft), Attorney Reid Allen Jones added to party Sheri Lynn Cowley Soulie(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Argent Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey W Weiss added to party Argent Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Reid Allen Jones added to party Argent Trust(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Ernest Turner, III(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey W Weiss added to party Ernest Turner, III(pty:dft), Attorney Reid Allen Jones added to party Ernest Turner, III(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Lyndsey C Turner(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey W Weiss added to party Lyndsey C Turner(pty:dft), Attorney Reid Allen Jones added to party Lyndsey C Turner(pty:dft), Attorney Franklin H Spruiell, Jr added to party Tyler Ryan Turner(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey W Weiss added to party Tyler Ryan Turner(pty:dft), Attorney Reid Allen Jones added to party Tyler Ryan Turner(pty:dft))(crt,Bunting, M)
February 2, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by B & K Exploration Investments L L C. (26th JDC, Parish of Bossier, #145648, filed 12/9/2014 - PDF of this document filed with #1 Notice of Removal, attachment 2)(Attorney Richard M John added to party B & K Exploration Investments L L C(pty:dft))(crt,Bunting, M)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by J W Operating Co. (26th JDC, Parish of Bossier, #145648, filed 4/8/2015 - PDF of this document filed with #1 Notice of Removal, attachment 2)(Attorney George M Wear, Jr added to party J W Operating Co(pty:dft))(crt,Bunting, M)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Chesapeake Louisiana L P, P X P Louisiana L L C. (26th JDC, Parish of Bossier, #145648, filed 1/12/2015 - PDF of this document filed with #1 Notice of Removal, attachment 2)(Attorney Sarah Katherine Casey added to party P X P Louisiana L L C(pty:dft))(crt,Bunting, M)
February 2, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Dutton Family L L C. (26th JDC, Parish of Bossier, #145648, filed 1/7/2015 - PDF of this document filed with #1 Notice of Removal, attachment 2)(Attorney Robert G Pugh, Jr added to party Dutton Family L L C(pty:dft))(crt,Bunting, M)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by State of Louisiana. (26th JDC, Parish of Bossier, #145648, filed 12/18/2014 - PDF of this document filed with #1 Notice of Removal, attachment 2)(Attorney Candice L Rodgers added to party State of Louisiana(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan Michael Seidemann added to party State of Louisiana(pty:dft))(crt,Bunting, M)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 26th JDC Bossier Parish, Case Number 145648 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4557842) filed by Chesapeake Louisiana L P. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Record, #3 Exhibit Bankruptcy Court Order, #4 Exhibit State Court Notice)(Attorney Sarah Katherine Casey added to party Chesapeake Louisiana L P(pty:dft))(aty,Casey, Sarah) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/2/2021) (Bunting, M).
February 2, 2021 Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby added. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 2, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. City of Shreveport answer due 2/9/2021; Jay Petroleum L L C answer due 2/9/2021; P X P Louisiana L L C answer due 2/9/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY - PDF of these documents filed with #1 Notice of Removal, attachment 2. (crt,Bunting, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: B H P Billiton Petroleum Properties N A L P et al v. Turner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cohort Energy Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alternate Fuel Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndsey C Turner
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey W Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Petroleum L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Shreveport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Louisiana
Represented By: Candice L Rodgers
Represented By: Ryan Michael Seidemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dutton Family L L C
Represented By: Robert G Pugh, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Louisiana L P
Represented By: Jan M Hayden
Represented By: Sarah Katherine Casey
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan A C Bantle
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey W Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheri Lynn Cowley Soulie
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey W Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Ryan Turner
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey W Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P X P Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Sarah Katherine Casey
Represented By: Kenneth M Klemm
Represented By: Tyler L Weidlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy C Leblanc
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey W Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & K Exploration Investments L L C
Represented By: Robert L Salim
Represented By: Richard M John
Represented By: Norval Frank Elliot, III
Represented By: Thomas Taylor Townsend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J J S Working Interests L L C
Represented By: Malcolm S Murchison
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Fortson
Represented By: Matthew R Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest Turner, III
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey W Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Argent Trust
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey W Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S C Soulie & Sons L L C
Represented By: Reid Allen Jones
Represented By: Franklin H Spruiell, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey W Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sklarco L L C
Represented By: Malcolm S Murchison
Represented By: Stephen Christopher Fortson
Represented By: Matthew R Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J W Operating Co
Represented By: George M Wear, Jr
Represented By: C A Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B H P Billiton Petroleum Properties (N A) L P
Represented By: Jamie D Rhymes
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: April Leigh Rolen-Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B H P Billiton Petroleum (TxLa Operating) Co
Represented By: Jamie D Rhymes
Represented By: Brittan Jackson Bush
Represented By: April Leigh Rolen-Ogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?