Zadeck Succession et al v. Vandiver Treme et al
Plaintiff: Zadeck Interests, LLC, Succession of Donald Zadeck, Zadeck Energy Group, Inc., Zadeck Energy Group Inc, Donald Zadeck Succession and Zadeck Interests L L C
Defendant: Rebecca Lynn Vandiver and Crystal Jean Vandiver Treme
Case Number: 5:2021cv00323
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Donald Zadeck Succession, Zadeck Interests L L C, Zadeck Energy Group Inc.(aty,Wall, Guy)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Magistrate Judge Hayes are hereby reset before Magistrate Judge McClusky. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/23/2021. (crt,Reeves, T)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Zadeck Energy Group Inc, Zadeck Interests L L C, Donald Zadeck Succession. (aty,Wall, Guy)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Guy Earl Wall on behalf of Zadeck Energy Group Inc, Zadeck Interests L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/22/2021. (crt,Miletello, A)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rebecca Lynn Vandiver, Crystal Jean Vandiver Treme. (crt,Miletello, A)
February 5, 2021 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Miletello, A)
February 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against Crystal Jean Vandiver Treme, Rebecca Lynn Vandiver (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4564297) filed by Donald Zadeck Succession, Zadeck Interests L L C, Zadeck Energy Group Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Guy Earl Wall added to party Donald Zadeck Succession(pty:pla), Zadeck Energy Group Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Guy Earl Wall added to party Zadeck Interests L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Wall, Guy) (Attachment 1 replaced and modified docket text on 2/8/2021) (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zadeck Succession et al v. Vandiver Treme et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Lynn Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Jean Vandiver Treme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zadeck Interests, LLC
Represented By: Guy Earl Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Succession of Donald Zadeck
Represented By: Guy Earl Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zadeck Energy Group, Inc.
Represented By: Guy Earl Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zadeck Energy Group Inc
Represented By: Guy Earl Wall
Represented By: Sara M Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Zadeck Succession
Represented By: Guy Earl Wall
Represented By: Sara M Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zadeck Interests L L C
Represented By: Guy Earl Wall
Represented By: Sara M Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?