Pouncy v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Valerie Nicole Pouncy
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2021cv00404
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Karen L Hayes
2 Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Miletello, A)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Valerie Nicole Pouncy. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/1/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Wicklund, Edward)
February 23, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes no longer assigned to case. Any pending motions and deadlines or hearings previously set before Magistrate Judge Hayes are hereby reset before Magistrate Judge McClusky. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 2/23/2021. (crt,Reeves, T)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 2/19/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Edward A Wicklund for Valerie Nicole Pouncy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes on 2/18/2021. (crt,Crawford, A)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Edward A. Wicklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4576588) by Valerie Nicole Pouncy. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin) Modified on 2/18/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
February 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Valerie Nicole Pouncy. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 In Forma Pauperis, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin) Modified on 2/18/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
February 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Valerie Nicole Pouncy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Attorney Benjamin M Misko added to party Valerie Nicole Pouncy(pty:pla))(aty,Misko, Benjamin) Modified on 2/18/2021 to edit text (Jones, P).
February 18, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L Hayes. (crt,Jones, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pouncy v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Nicole Pouncy
Represented By: Benjamin M Misko
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?