Nelson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Renee Nelson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 5:2021cv00429
Filed: February 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. Transcript due 6/9/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Elizabeth Renee Nelson. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/11/2021, answer due 6/9/2021. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. (aty,Wicklund, Edward)
February 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Edward A Wicklund for Elizabeth Renee Nelson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/23/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/23/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Edward A. Wicklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4579401) by Elizabeth Renee Nelson. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Elizabeth Renee Nelson. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 In Forma Pauperis, #2 Text of proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin)
February 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Elizabeth Renee Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Attorney Benjamin M Misko added to party Elizabeth Renee Nelson(pty:pla))(aty,Misko, Benjamin)
February 22, 2021 Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby added. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Bunting, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Renee Nelson
Represented By: Benjamin M Misko
Represented By: Edward A Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?