Culotta v. Holley et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Culotta
Defendant: Julian Whittington, Sgt Gates, Police Jury Bossier Parish, Vincent Lococo, Cindy Holley and Jason Porter
Case Number: 5:2021cv00567
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice #8 Motion for Injunction Relief. ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension to file an additional amendedcomplaint if believes it is necessary. (Pro Se Response due by 4/30/2021.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/13/2021. (crt,Reeves, T)
April 12, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time by Samuel Culotta. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, styled as Motion for Injunction Relief, by Samuel Culotta. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
April 12, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Police Jury Bossier Parish, Gates, Cindy Holley, Vincent Lococo, Jason Porter, Julian Whittington filed by Samuel Culotta. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
April 12, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Thomas, T)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Due to a clerical error, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. (crt,Whidden, C)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn L Langley on behalf of Gates, Jason Porter, Julian Whittington (Attorney Glenn L Langley added to party Gates(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn L Langley added to party Jason Porter(pty:dft), Attorney Glenn L Langley added to party Julian Whittington(pty:dft)) (aty,Langley, Glenn)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint, within 30 days of the filing of this Order, to cure the deficiencies outlined. Plaintiff shall dismiss any claims that he is unable to cure through amendment. Plaintiff shall also notify the Court of any change in his address. Pro Se Response due by 4/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/17/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee due. Further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/12/2021. (crt,Taylor, L)
March 4, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Devillier, W)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Samuel Culotta. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Chavis, J) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/11/2021: #2 Proposed order) (Devillier, W).
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Police Jury Bossier Parish, Gates, Cindy Holley, Vincent Lococo, Jason Porter, Julian Whittington filed by Samuel Culotta. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Chavis, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culotta v. Holley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julian Whittington
Represented By: Glenn L Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Gates
Represented By: Glenn L Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Jury Bossier Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Lococo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Holley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Porter
Represented By: Glenn L Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Culotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?