Ashley v. Caddo Correctional Center et al
Plaintiff: Billy Terry Ashley
Defendant: Dep May, Deputy Sheen, Deputy Gray, Caddo Correctional Center and David Yanell
Case Number: 5:2021cv00639
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Caddo Correctional Center, David Yanell filed by Billy Terry Ashley. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Due to a clerical error, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. (crt,Whidden, C)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Directing plaintiff to amend complaint, within 30 days of the filing of this Order, to cure deficiencies outlined. Plaintiff shall dismiss any claims that he is unable to cure through amendment. Plaintiff shall also notify the Court of any change in his address. Pro Se Response due by 4/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/31/2021. (crt,Leday, A)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $29.20. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/24/2021. (crt,Taylor, L)
March 22, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/22/2021. (crt,Dunford, T)
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Accounts Officer Page filed by Billy Terry Ashley regarding #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff submitted an IFP application not completed by an authorized Accounts Officer. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 4/19/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP pg6)(crt,Leday, A)
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/16/2021. (crt,Devillier, W)
March 10, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Devillier, W)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Billy Terry Ashley. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/10/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Adams, K). Need prison account certification. Modified to remove deficient status on 3/23/2021 (Thomas, T). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/23/2021: #2 Proposed order) (Thomas, T).
March 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caddo Correctional Center, Gray, May, Sheen filed by Billy Terry Ashley. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Envelope)(crt,Adams, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley v. Caddo Correctional Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Terry Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sheen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caddo Correctional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Yanell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?