Thomas v. Boyer et al
Plaintiff: DeAngelo Thomas
Defendant: Anthony McCarthy, Bossier Parish, Nurse Molley, Cindy Higgins, Capt Boyer, Jay Turner, Lt Porter and Parish of Bossier
Case Number: 5:2021cv01164
Filed: April 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE by DeAngelo Thomas re #7 MEMORANDUM ORDER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(crt,Taylor, L)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM ORDER: THE CLERK IS DIRECTED to serve by mail, a copy of this memorandum order upon Plaintiff who must then furnish to the Clerk of Court in Shreveport, Louisiana, within thirty (30) days after service of this order, the answers in numbered paragraphs corresponding to each question. The answers must be signed by Plaintiff in accordance with Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Pro Se Response due by 6/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/24/2021. (crt,Taylor, L)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Initial Partial Filing Fee due in the amount of $54.22. It is further ordered that plaintiff make payments of 20 percent of income for preceding month until $350.00 has been paid in full. Clerk did not manually noticed Prison Accounts Officer, as filing fee has been received in full. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/20/2021. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DeAngelo Thomas. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Resident Activity Statment, #2 Envelope)(crt,Thomas, T) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2021: #3 Proposed order) (Thomas, T).
May 7, 2021 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of DeAngelo Thomas in the amount of $350.00, receipt number 54635065758. (crt,Chavis, J)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. ( Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 6/7/2021). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/6/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(crt,Thomas, T)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM ORDER: Plaintiff failed to submit filing fee or a completed IFP application. Pro Se Deadline to comply with deficiency set for 6/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/5/2021. (Attachments: #1 Application to proceed IFP form)(crt,Reeves, T)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED MEMORANDUM ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/4/2021. (crt,Devillier, W)
April 29, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Devillier, W)
April 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bossier Parish, Boyer, Cindy Higgins, Anthony McCarthy, Molley, Porter, Jay Turner filed by DeAngelo Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Letter, #3 Envelope)(crt,Chavis, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Boyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bossier Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Molley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parish of Bossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeAngelo Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?