McKissack v.Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA D MCKISSACK
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2021cv01971
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2021 Filing 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Reeves, T)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Appellant Brief due by 10/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Transcript)(Attorney Jerry Edwards added to party Commissioner of Social Security Administration(pty:dft))(aty,Edwards, Jerry) Modified to indicate manual attachment received on 8/26/2021 (Devillier, W).
August 26, 2021 MANUAL ATTACHMENT received from Jerry Edwards on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration regarding #5 Answer to Complaint,. Pursuant to LR 5.7.01, the electronic version of this manual attachment is considered the original. Paper version sent to SHREVEPORT division. (crt,Devillier, W)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed in Social Security Case by Christina D McKissack. All Defendants. Service made upon: U S Attorney;U S Attorney General;Commissioner of SSA. Answer due 10/18/21. (aty,Wallace, Lacey) Modified on 7/26/2021 to reflect answer due date. (Crick, S).
July 12, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to US Attorney, US Attorney General and Comm of Social Security. (crt,Leday, A)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/12/2021. (crt,Leday, A) Modified on 7/13/2021 to edit text (Leday, A).
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Christina D McKissack. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Pauper, #3 Proposed order)(Attorney Lacey P Wallace added to party Christina D McKissack.(pty:selreq))(aty,Wallace, Lacey) Modified on 7/9/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christin A McKissack. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image is contained within Attachment #2 to 1 Complaint. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/9/2021. (crt,Crick, S) Modified on 7/9/2021 to modify docket text. (Crick, S). Modified on 7/13/2021 to assign document number (Miletello, A).
July 9, 2021 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKissack v.Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA D MCKISSACK
Represented By: Lacey P Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Jerry Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?