James et al v. P M G O P C O - Washington L L C et al
Plaintiff: Tola Mae James, Johnetta Coleman and Angela Jackson
Defendant: PMG OPCO-Washington, LLC, Kourtney Brownlee and P M G O P C O - Washington L L C doing business as Booker T Washington Skilled Nursing & Rehabilitation
Case Number: 5:2021cv02407
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Johnetta Coleman, Angela Jackson, Tola Mae James re #10 MOTION to Remand (aty,Salim, Robert)
September 22, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand filed by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. (aty,Raney, Ronald)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Teresa Pike Tomlinson for P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 9/20/2021. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 17, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Teresa Pike Tomlinson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4823291) by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Raney, Ronald)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C . (aty,Raney, Ronald)
September 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #10 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Bunting, M)
September 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Johnetta Coleman, Angela Jackson, Tola Mae James. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Salim, Robert)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC ORDER: This case was removed based on an assertion of federal question under the PREP Act, and the defendant filed a motion to dismiss. Plaintiff intends to file a motion to remand that challenges subject matter jurisdiction. The court must resolve jurisdictional issues before it addresses the merits. Accordingly, and with the consent of counsel, the deadline to file opposition to any pending motion to dismiss is extended until 21 days after the district judge enters a decision on subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/17/2021. (crt,Rider, M)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer MOTION to Transfer Case. Motions referred to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. (crt,Crick, S)
August 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jursidction, or Alternatively, Motion to Transfer by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Raney, Ronald) Added MOTION to Transfer Case and modified motion event on 8/17/2021 (Crick, S).
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by P M G O P C O - Washington L L C identifying Corporate Parent SDB Holdings, LLC for P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. (aty,Raney, Ronald)
August 10, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED Notice of Removal by Kourtney Brownlee, P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,, Supplement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E)(aty,Raney, Ronald) Modified docket text on 8/10/2021 (Bunting, M).
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/10/2021. (crt,Keller, J)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/10/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Ronald E Raney on behalf of P M G O P C O - Washington L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/24/2021. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 9, 2021 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed in the 1st JDC, Parish of Caddo. Kourtney Brownlee answer due 8/16/2021; P M G O P C O - Washington L L C answer due 8/16/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #3 (Exhibit B) to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 9, 2021 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Mitchell, P)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 630514-B (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4769115) filed by PMG OPCO-Washington, LLC, Kourtney Brownlee. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit Citations of Service, #4 Exhibit Jurisprudential Authority, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Kourtney Brownlee)(Attorney Ronald E Raney added to party Kourtney Brownlee(pty:dft), Attorney Ronald E Raney added to party PMG OPCO-Washington, LLC(pty:dft))(aty,Raney, Ronald) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/10/2021) (Mitchell, P). Modified on 8/10/2021 to replace Civil Cover sheet that was not converted correctly to PDF. (Mitchell, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James et al v. P M G O P C O - Washington L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tola Mae James
Represented By: Ronald J Miciotto
Represented By: Robert E Piper, Jr
Represented By: Robert L Salim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnetta Coleman
Represented By: Ronald J Miciotto
Represented By: Robert E Piper, Jr
Represented By: Robert L Salim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Jackson
Represented By: Ronald J Miciotto
Represented By: Robert E Piper, Jr
Represented By: Robert L Salim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PMG OPCO-Washington, LLC
Represented By: Ronald E Raney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kourtney Brownlee
Represented By: Ronald E Raney
Represented By: Teresa Pike Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P M G O P C O - Washington L L C doing business as Booker T Washington Skilled Nursing & Rehabilitation
Represented By: Ronald E Raney
Represented By: Teresa Pike Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?