Egan et al v. P J Louisiana L L C
Plaintiff: Kristi Egan and Kaitlyn Rodman
Defendant: PJ Louisiana, LLC and P J Louisiana L L C
Case Number: 5:2021cv03681
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Referring Judge: Donald E Walter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Stay with Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by P J Louisiana L L C. (aty,Hancock, William)
December 3, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Stay with Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by Kristi Egan, Kaitlyn Rodman. (aty,Hamlet, Lydia)
November 23, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Lydia Hicks Hamlet on behalf of Kristi Egan, Kaitlyn Rodman (aty,Hamlet, Lydia)
November 23, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Rauls on behalf of Kristi Egan, Kaitlyn Rodman (Attorney Stephen Rauls added to party Kaitlyn Rodman(pty:pla)) (aty,Rauls, Stephen)
November 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #17 MOTION to Sever MOTION to Stay with Incorporated Memorandum in Support. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
November 22, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Stay with Incorporated Memorandum in Support by P J Louisiana L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed order)(aty,Stovall, Jerry). Added MOTION to Stay and modified docket text on 11/23/2021 (Crick, S).
November 11, 2021 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by P J Louisiana L L C. (aty,Stovall, Jerry)
November 11, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristi Egan. P J Louisiana L L C served on 11/1/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. (Attorney Stephen Rauls added to party Kristi Egan(pty:pla)) (aty,Rauls, Stephen)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of William K Hancock for P J Louisiana L L C. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/9/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice sent to Jerry L Stovall, Jr on behalf of P J Louisiana L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 11/23/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
November 8, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for William K. Hancock to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4887872) by P J Louisiana L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Stovall, Jerry)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry L Stovall, Jr on behalf of P J Louisiana L L C (Attorney Jerry L Stovall, Jr added to party P J Louisiana L L C(pty:dft)) (aty,Stovall, Jerry)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Lydia H Hamlet for Kristi Egan,Lydia H Hamlet for Kaitlyn Rodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/21/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Josh Sanford for Kristi Egan,Josh Sanford for Kaitlyn Rodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/21/2021. (crt,Crick, S)
October 21, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 10/21/2021. (crt,Rider, M)
October 20, 2021 Motions Transferred regarding #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/20/2021.) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
October 20, 2021 NOTICE of Corrective Action to Gerald Adam Savoie on behalf of Kristi Egan, Kaitlyn Rodman regarding #2 MOTION for Josh Sanford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4861711). Action taken: Terminated #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. #5 Corrected Motion submitted. (crt,Crick, S)
October 20, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Lydia H. Hamlet to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4864792) by Kristi Egan, Kaitlyn Rodman. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Affidavit Exhibit B - Affidavit)(aty,Savoie, Gerald)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT re #5 Corrective Document, by Kristi Egan, Kaitlyn Rodman. (aty,Savoie, Gerald)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristi Egan, Kaitlyn Rodman #2 MOTION for Josh Sanford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4861711) . (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(aty,Savoie, Gerald) Modified on 10/21/2021 to capture motion event and indicate #6 Affidavit submitted as separate document. (Crick, S).
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to P J Louisiana L L C. (crt,Crick, S)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency to Gerald Adam Savoie on behalf of Kristi Egan, Kaitlyn Rodman regarding #2 MOTION for Josh Sanford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4861711). Reason: Please re-submit this document on letter sized paper. (crt,Crick, S)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 DEFICIENT, MOTION for Josh Sanford to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4861711) by Kristi Egan, Kaitlyn Rodman. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Savoie, Gerald) Modified on 10/20/2021 to indicate deficient status. (Crick, S). Modified on 10/21/2021 to indicate #5 Corrected Motion submitted. (Crick, S).
October 19, 2021 REMARK: A duplicate charge was incurred during the filing of the #1 Complaint. A refund of the initial payment of $402.00, ALAWDC-4860894, has been processed in pay.gov this date. Counsel is advised to verify the refund on their statement. (crt,McInnis, S)
October 18, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Donald E Walter and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT of Collective Action against PJ Louisiana, LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4860901) filed by Kristi Egan, Kaitlyn Rodman. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of understanding Egan Consent to Join, #2 Affidavit of understanding Rodman Consent to Join, #3 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed summons/writ Civil Summons)(Attorney Gerald Adam Savoie added to party Kristi Egan(pty:pla), Attorney Gerald Adam Savoie added to party Kaitlyn Rodman(pty:pla))(aty,Savoie, Gerald) (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/20/2021) (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Egan et al v. P J Louisiana L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristi Egan
Represented By: Gerald Adam Savoie
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Lydia Hicks Hamlet
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaitlyn Rodman
Represented By: Gerald Adam Savoie
Represented By: Stephen Rauls
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Represented By: Lydia Hicks Hamlet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PJ Louisiana, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P J Louisiana L L C
Represented By: Jerry L Stovall, Jr
Represented By: William Kennedy Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?