U S Dept of Labor v. Sentinel Security Group Inc et al
Plaintiff: U S Dept of Labor
Defendant: Sentinel Security Group Inc, Sentinel Armed Services L L C, Sentinel Guard Services L L C and Sentinel Solutions L L C
Case Number: 5:2022cv00094
Filed: January 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Terry A Doughty
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 5/16/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
May 15, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Consent Judgment by U S Dept of Labor. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/15/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Consent Judgment)(aty,Eakins, Lacee)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 60 DAY ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 3/31/2023. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 31, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement by U S Dept of Labor, Sentinel Solutions L L C, Sentinel Security Group Inc, Sentinel Guard Services L L C, Sentinel Armed Services L L C (aty,Eakins, Lacee) Modified on 3/31/2023 to add filers (Miletello, A).
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension. The following deadlines are extended until February 15, 2023: Discovery deadline 2/15/2023. Compel discovery 2/15/2023. Expert Depositions due by 2/15/2023. Dispositive motion deadline is extended only to January 31, 2023. This is necessary to maintain the trial. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/6/2022. (crt,Keller, J)
December 2, 2022 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Deadlines with consent by Sentinel Armed Services L L C, Sentinel Guard Services L L C, Sentinel Security Group Inc, Sentinel Solutions L L C, U S Dept of Labor. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Jones, Allison) Modified on 12/5/2022 to add filer. (Alexander, E)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 5/15/2023 at 9:00 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 1 before Judge Terry A Doughty. Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2023. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 10/7/2022. Plaintiffs Witness List due by 11/4/2022. Defendants Witness List due by 11/16/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 11/21/2022. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 12/6/2022. Discovery deadline 12/6/2022. Expert Depositions due by 1/5/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 1/20/2023. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 3/28/2023. Motions in Limine due by 3/24/2023. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 5/5/2023. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 5/5/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
April 29, 2022 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) Report by U S Dept of Labor< Sentinel Armed Services L L C, Sentinel Guard Services L L C, Sentinel Security Group Inc, Sentinel Solutions L L C. (aty,Eakins, Lacee) Modified on 5/3/2022 to add filers (Jones, P).
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER for cases assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty sent to counsel of record. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 4/22/2022. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 4/1/2022. (crt,Crawford, A)
March 25, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sentinel Armed Services L L C, Sentinel Guard Services L L C, Sentinel Security Group Inc, Sentinel Solutions L L C. (aty,Jones, Allison)
March 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #6 Answer to Amended Complaint, sent to Allison Anne Jones on behalf of Sentinel Armed Services L L C, Sentinel Guard Services L L C, Sentinel Security Group Inc, Sentinel Solutions L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 4/1/2022. (crt,Jones, P)
March 17, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Sentinel Armed Services L L C, Sentinel Guard Services L L C, Sentinel Security Group Inc, Sentinel Solutions L L C.(Attorney Allison Anne Jones added to party Sentinel Armed Services L L C, Sentinel Guard Services L L C, Sentinel Security Group Inc, Sentinel Solutions L L C(pty:dft))(aty,Jones, Allison) Modified on 3/18/2022 to edit text (Jones, P).
January 14, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sentinel Armed Services L L C, Sentinel Guard Services L L C, Sentinel Security Group Inc, Sentinel Solutions L L C. (crt,Crick, S)
January 14, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by U S Dept of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint)(aty,Eakins, Lacee)
January 12, 2022 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/12/2022. (crt,Rider, M)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sentinel Armed Services L L C, Sentinel Guard Services L L C, Sentinel Security Group Inc, Sentinel Solutions L L C. (crt,Jones, P)
January 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filed on behalf of USA - Filing Fee not required) filed by U S Dept of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Lacee Caitlyn Eakins added to party U S Dept of Labor(pty:pla))(aty,Eakins, Lacee) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/11/2022) (Jones, P). Modified on 1/11/2022 to edit text (Jones, P).
January 11, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Jones, P)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U S Dept of Labor v. Sentinel Security Group Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U S Dept of Labor
Represented By: Lacee Caitlyn Eakins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Security Group Inc
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Armed Services L L C
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Guard Services L L C
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Solutions L L C
Represented By: Allison Anne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?