Walls et al v. Caddo Parish et al
Plaintiff: Jason E Walls and William Walls
Defendant: Sheriffs Office of Caddo Parish, Ryan Chapman and Stephen W Prator
Case Number: 5:2022cv00579
Filed: March 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Marshall Louis Perkins for Sheriffs Office of Caddo Parish,Marshall Louis Perkins for Ryan Chapman,Marshall Louis Perkins for Stephen W Prator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 4/20/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
April 18, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Caddo Parish Sheriff Steve Prator and Deputy Ryan Chapman filed by Sheriffs Office of Caddo Parish, Ryan Chapman, Stephen W Prator. (aty,Perkins, Marshall)
April 18, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION for Marshall Louis Perkins to Enroll as Counsel by Sheriffs Office of Caddo Parish, Ryan Chapman, Stephen W Prator. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Byrd, Edwin)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply due by 4/18/2022. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 4/8/2022. (crt,Keifer, K)
April 8, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Caddo Parish Sheriff Steve Prator and Deputy Ryan Chapman with consent . Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
April 7, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Caddo Parish Sheriff Steve Prator and Deputy Ryan Chapman with consent by Ryan Chapman, Stephen W Prator. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/7/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Byrd, Edwin)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 4/14/2022. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 4/5/2022. (crt,Keifer, K)
April 4, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re #4 Motion to Dismiss with consent by Jason E Walls. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Kendig, William) Modified on 4/4/2022 to create docket entry relationship and modify docket text. (Crick, S).
April 4, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Clerk's Notice re #9 Notice (Other) copy mailed to US Attorney Generals Office and courtesy copy sent to AUSA Jerry Edwards. (crt,Whitener, M)
April 4, 2022 Motions Transferred regarding #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re #4 Motion to Dismiss with consent . Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Crick, S)
April 1, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Rule 5.1 Notice of Constitutional Challenge to the Judicially Created Exception/Defense of Qualified Immunity to 42 U.S.C. Section 1983 by Jason E Walls (Attachments: #1 Proposed clerks notice)(aty,Kendig, William)
April 1, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Caddo Parish Sheriff Steve Prator and Deputy Ryan Chapman filed by Jason E Walls. (aty,Kendig, William)
April 1, 2022 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Sheriffs Office of Caddo Parish answer due 3/8/2022; Ryan Chapman answer due 3/8/2022; Stephen W Prator answer due 3/8/2022. NO PDF ATTACHED - PDF of service returns attached to #7 Response to Removal Order, attachments #3, #4 and #5. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 31, 2022 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Ryan Chapman, Stephen W Prator . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 State court petition, #3 State court return of service, #4 State court return of service, #5 State court return of service)(aty,Byrd, Edwin)
March 3, 2022 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/3/2022. (crt,Rider, M)
March 3, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Caddo Parish Sheriff Steve Prator and Deputy Ryan Chapman. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth E Foote. (crt,Bunting, M)
March 2, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Caddo Parish Sheriff Steve Prator and Deputy Ryan Chapman by Ryan Chapman, Stephen W Prator. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Byrd, Edwin)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/2/2022. (crt,Keller, J)
March 1, 2022 Filing 2 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/1/2022. (crt,Whitener, M)
March 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 635246 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5014522) filed by Steve Prator, Ryan Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 State court petition)(Attorney Edwin H Byrd, III added to party Ryan Chapman(pty:dft), Attorney Edwin H Byrd, III added to party Steve Prator(pty:dft))(aty,Byrd, Edwin)
March 1, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Whitener, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walls et al v. Caddo Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason E Walls
Represented By: William Fabian Kendig, Jr
Represented By: Jason Blance Nichols
Represented By: John Marshall Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Walls
Represented By: William Fabian Kendig, Jr
Represented By: Jason Blance Nichols
Represented By: John Marshall Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs Office of Caddo Parish
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Represented By: Marshall Louis Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Chapman
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Represented By: Marshall Louis Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W Prator
Represented By: Edwin H Byrd, III
Represented By: Marshall Louis Perkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?