Dorsett Properties L L C v. NewRez L L C
Plaintiff: Dorsett Properties, LLC and Dorsett Properties L L C
Defendant: NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and NewRez L L C doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Case Number: 5:2022cv01148
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: S Maurice Hicks
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Note the court's modification to paragraph 4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/24/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
June 23, 2022 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by NewRez L L C, Dorsett Properties L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Stipulated Protective Order)(aty,Christina, Angelina) Modified on 6/23/2022 to add filer (Miletello, A).
June 22, 2022 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by NewRez L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(aty,Christina, Angelina)
June 8, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #15 MOTION to Transfer Case. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Miletello, A)
June 8, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Transfer Case by Dorsett Properties L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Telep, Ryan)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2022 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 6/30/2022. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 7/7/2022. Rule 26 Report due by 7/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/3/2022. (crt,Keller, J)
June 2, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by NewRez L L C.(aty,Christina, Angelina)
May 31, 2022 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by NewRez L L C . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Counsel's Certification Concerning State Court Record)(aty,Christina, Angelina)
May 31, 2022 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. NewRez L L C answer due 5/16/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #1 to #12 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Crick, S)
May 27, 2022 Filing 11 RULE 26(f) Report by NewRez L L C, Dorsett Properties L P. (aty,Christina, Angelina) Modified on 5/27/2022 to add filer (Miletello, A).
May 23, 2022 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/23/2022. (crt,Rider, M)
May 18, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by NewRez L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Citizenship Emails, #2 Exhibit B - Service Return/Additional Pleading)(aty,Christina, Angelina) Modified docket text on 5/19/2022 (Miletello, A).
May 17, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dorsett Properties L L C identifying Corporate Parent Dorsett Properties, LP, Other Affiliate Dorsett Management LLC for Dorsett Properties L L C. (aty,Telep, Ryan)
May 17, 2022 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NewRez L L C with Jury Demand filed by Dorsett Properties L L C.(aty,Telep, Ryan)
May 12, 2022 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by NewRez L L C identifying Corporate Parents Shellpoint Partners L L C, N R M Acquisition L L C, N R M Acquisition I I L L C, New Residential Mortgage L L C, New Residential Investment Corp for NewRez L L C. (aty,Christina, Angelina) Modified docket text on 5/12/2022 (Miletello, A).
May 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER. The parties will be allowed until May 18, 2022 to explore these issues and file an amended complaint, if necessary, and an amended notice of removal. The court will review the record after that date and determine whether there is a basis for the exercise of subject matter jurisdiction. See Memorandum Order for details. Amended Pleadings due by 5/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/3/2022. (crt,Keller, J)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/2/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 2, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/2/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Angelina Christina on behalf of NewRez L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 5/16/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
April 29, 2022 CASE Assigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Miletello, A)
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 636347 (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5086849) filed by NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - LA Secretary of State Doc., #3 Exhibit C - TX Secretary of State Doc, #4 Exhibit D - Dorsett Articles of Organization, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Angelina Christina added to party NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing(pty:dft))(aty,Christina, Angelina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsett Properties L L C v. NewRez L L C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorsett Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorsett Properties L L C
Represented By: Ryan Paul Telep
Represented By: Lee H Ayres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC d/b/a Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Angelina Christina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez L L C doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Angelina Christina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?