Johnson v. Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center L L C et al
Plaintiff: Diane Johnson
Defendant: Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, L.L.C., Central Management Company, L.L.C., Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center L L C and Central Management Co L L C
Case Number: 5:2022cv01423
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Kayla D McClusky
Referring Judge: Donald E Walter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2022 Filing 16 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Diane Johnson. (crt,Leday, A)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/5/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
June 30, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand with consent by Diane Johnson. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,Whelen, Christopher)
June 24, 2022 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by Central Management Co L L C, Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center L L C. (aty,Faircloth, Jimmy)
June 10, 2022 Filing 12 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Defendants' Notice of Compliance with Removal Order (R. Doc. 5) filed by Central Management Co L L C, Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center L L C regarding #11 Notice (Other) . (aty,Price, Mary)
June 10, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Compliance with Removal Order by Central Management Co L L C, Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center L L C re #5 Removal Order (aty,Price, Mary)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Suspension of Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Disposition of #7 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/6/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Judge Donald E Walter. Judge Elizabeth E Foote no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. (crt,Reeves, T)
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #7 MOTION to Remand . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 6/24/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Diane Johnson. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Whelen, Christopher)
June 3, 2022 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Suspension of Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Disposition of Forthcoming Motion to Remand by Central Management Co L L C, Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center L L C. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Faircloth, Jimmy)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 6/2/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned hereby recuses herself from the above-captioned matter. The case is hereby referred to the Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 6/1/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/31/2022. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 27, 2022 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Central Management Co L L C answer due 6/3/2022; Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center L L C answer due 6/3/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: The PDF image can be found within Attachments #2 and #3 within document #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 27, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Thomas, T)
May 27, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Central Management Company, L.L.C., Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, L.L.C. identifying Corporate Parent Kisatchie Corporation, Other Affiliate Kisatchie Industries, LLC for Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, L.L.C. (Attorney Mary Katherine Price added to party Central Management Company, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Katherine Price added to party Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, L.L.C.(pty:dft)). (aty,Price, Mary)
May 27, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 636,719-B (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5120895) filed by Central Management Company, L.L.C., Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Class Action Petition for Damages and Injunctive Relief, #2 Service of Citation for Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, L.L.C., #3 Service of Citation for Central Management Company, L.L.C., #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Central Management Company, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(aty,Faircloth, Jimmy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Johnson
Represented By: Matthew McKay Coman
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Jordan Michael Jeansonne
Represented By: Stephen Michael Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Management Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roseview Nursing & Rehabilitation Center L L C
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Management Co L L C
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?