Davis v. P M G OPCO-Guest House L L C et al
Plaintiff: Linda Davis
Defendant: P M G O P C O - Guest House L L C doing business as Guest House Skilled Nursing & Rehabilitation and Priority Management Group L L C
Case Number: 5:2022cv01447
Filed: May 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth E Foote
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
2 Judge: Kayla D McClusky
3 Judge: Donald E Walter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing by P M G O P C O - Guest House L L C, Priority Management Group L L C (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Objection)(aty,Faircloth, Jimmy)
July 5, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Linda Davis. (crt,Leday, A)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky on 7/5/2022. (crt,Leday, A)
June 30, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand with consent by Linda Davis. Motions referred to Kayla D McClusky. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Proposed pleading)(aty,Whelen, Christopher)
June 27, 2022 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by P M G O P C O - Guest House L L C, Priority Management Group L L C. (aty,Faircloth, Jimmy)
June 10, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by P M G O P C O - Guest House L L C, Priority Management Group L L C re #5 Removal Order (aty,Price, Mary) Modified docket text to more accurately describe document filed on 6/10/2022 (Bunting, M).
June 6, 2022 Filing 13 AMENDED NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #7 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Responses due by 6/27/2022 (crt,Bunting, M)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Suspend Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Disposition of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/6/2022. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Donald E Walter. Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 6/3/2022. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 3, 2022 CASE Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby no longer assigned to the case. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Bunting, M)
June 3, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #7 MOTION to Remand, MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Miletello, A)
June 3, 2022 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. In accordance with Standing Order 1.62, this matter is hereby reassigned. Case reassigned to Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Judge Elizabeth E Foote no longer assigned to case. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. (crt,Reeves, T)
June 3, 2022 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Suspend Responsive Pleading Deadline Pending Disposition of Motion to Remand by P M G O P C O - Guest House L L C, Priority Management Group L L C. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Faircloth, Jimmy) Modified docket text on 6/3/2022 (Miletello, A).
June 3, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Linda Davis. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief)(aty,Whelen, Christopher). Added MOTION for Attorney Fees on 6/3/2022 (Miletello, A).
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Referred to Chief Judge for reassignment. Signed by Judge Elizabeth E Foote on 6/1/2022. (crt,Miletello, A)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/1/2022. (crt,Keller, J)
May 31, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/31/2022. (crt,Crick, S)
May 31, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PMG OPCO-Guest House, L.L.C. d/b/a The Guest House Skilled Nursing and Rehabilitation, Priority Management Group, L.L.C. (Attorney Mary Katherine Price added to party PMG OPCO-Guest House, L.L.C. d/b/a The Guest House Skilled Nursing and Rehabilitation(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Katherine Price added to party Priority Management Group, L.L.C.(pty:dft)). (aty,Price, Mary)
May 31, 2022 Filing 2 CORRECTIVE DOCUMENT entitled Notice of Removal filed by PMG OPCO-Guest House, L.L.C. d/b/a The Guest House Skilled Nursing and Rehabilitation, Priority Management Group, L.L.C. regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, . (aty,Faircloth, Jimmy)
May 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 636,750-A (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5122453) filed by Priority Management Group, L.L.C., PMG OPCO-Guest House, L.L.C. d/b/a The Guest House Skilled Nursing and Rehabilitation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Class Action Petition for Damages and Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit Citation of Service PMG OPCO, #3 Exhibit Service Return Priority Management, #4 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party PMG OPCO-Guest House, L.L.C. d/b/a The Guest House Skilled Nursing and Rehabilitation(pty:dft), Attorney Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr added to party Priority Management Group, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(aty,Faircloth, Jimmy)
May 31, 2022 CASE Assigned to Judge Elizabeth E Foote and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
May 31, 2022 STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. P M G OPCO-Guest House L L C answer due 6/7/2022; Priority Management Group L L C answer due 6/7/2022. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found in Attachments #2 & #3 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. P M G OPCO-Guest House L L C et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Davis
Represented By: Matthew McKay Coman
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Whelen
Represented By: Jordan Michael Jeansonne
Represented By: Stephen Michael Huber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P M G O P C O - Guest House L L C doing business as Guest House Skilled Nursing & Rehabilitation
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Management Group L L C
Represented By: Jimmy R Faircloth, Jr
Represented By: Mary Katherine Price
Represented By: Richard Frederick Norem, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?