White v. Vanovermeer et al
Plaintiff: Marco White
Defendant: Layne Grey Vandovermeer, DD&S Logistics, Inc., Layne Grey Vanovermeer and D D & S Logistics Inc
Case Number: 5:2024cv00067
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jerry Edwards
Referring Judge: Mark L Hornsby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Filing 17 JOINT RULE 26(f) Report by D D & S Logistics Inc, Layne Grey Vanovermeer and Marco White. (aty,Billeaud, Jean) Modified filers on 3/7/2024 (Bunting, M).
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Jean Ann Billeaud for D D & S Logistics Inc,Jean Ann Billeaud for Layne Grey Vanovermeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/29/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 28, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Jean Ann Billeaud to Enroll as Counsel (Trial Counsel) by D D & S Logistics Inc, Layne Grey Vanovermeer. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/28/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Landry, Jaime)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/25/2024 10:30 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 3/11/2024. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 3/18/2024. Rule 26 Report due by 3/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/7/2024. (crt,Enkey, R)
February 7, 2024 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/7/2024. (crt,Rider, M)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enroll as Counsel. Added as counsel Brandon Trey Morris,Justin Carey Dewett,Elizabeth Ann Hancock,Meghan Marie Nolen,Lane Scott Robinson,Austin Taylor Townsend,Eric Matthew Whitehead for Marco White. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/5/2024. (crt,Bunting, M)
February 5, 2024 Filing 11 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Marco White. (aty,Powell, Joshua)
February 2, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for B. Trey Morris, Justin C. Dewett, Elizabeth A. Hancock, Meghan M. Nolen, Austin T. Townsend, Lane S. Robinson, Eric M. Whitehead to Enroll as Counsel by Marco White. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Powell, Joshua)
February 1, 2024 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by D D & S Logistics Inc, Layne Grey Vanovermeer . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Landry, Jaime)
February 1, 2024 Filing 8 DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by D D & S Logistics Inc, Layne Grey Vanovermeer. (aty,Landry, Jaime)
February 1, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by D D & S Logistics Inc identifying Corporate Parent Bessemer Investment Company, Inc. for D D & S Logistics Inc. (aty,Landry, Jaime)
February 1, 2024 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by D D & S Logistics Inc, Layne Grey Vanovermeer.(aty,Landry, Jaime)
January 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/19/2024. (crt,Keifer, K)
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 1/19/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Jaime F Landry, Joshua Lynn Powell on behalf of DD&S Logistics, Inc., Layne Grey Vanovermeer, Marco White. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 2/2/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Jaime F Landry on behalf of DD&S Logistics, Inc.. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/2/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
January 18, 2024 STATE COURT AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition served on D D & S Express Inc on 12/19/23, filed by Marco White. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #4 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S)
January 18, 2024 CASE Assigned to District Judge Jerry Edwards, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 42nd JDC, Desoto Parish, Case Number 84673 (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-5829451) filed by DD&S Logistics, Inc., Layne Grey Vanovermeer. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Attorney Jaime F Landry added to party DD&S Logistics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jaime F Landry added to party Layne Grey Vandovermeer(pty:dft))(aty,Landry, Jaime) Modified on 1/19/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Vanovermeer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco White
Represented By: Joshua Lynn Powell
Represented By: Austin Taylor Townsend
Represented By: Brandon Trey Morris
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Hancock
Represented By: Eric Matthew Whitehead
Represented By: Justin Carey Dewett
Represented By: Lane Scott Robinson
Represented By: Meghan Marie Nolen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layne Grey Vandovermeer
Represented By: Jaime F Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DD&S Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime F Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Layne Grey Vanovermeer
Represented By: Jean Ann Billeaud
Represented By: Jaime F Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D D & S Logistics Inc
Represented By: Jean Ann Billeaud
Represented By: Jaime F Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?