In Re: Combustion Inc, et al v. A B C Corp, et al
Plaintiff: Mabel McLevi, David R Kelly, Jeff M Pounders, III, Billy J Parker, William Paul Avants, Buel Jordan, David Williams, Emma Brooks, Sandra Windham, Roger W Bennett, Kimberly King, Kenneth R Thomas, Eugene Cormier, Sheila McLin, Kirby Roddy, Laura Prime, James A Perkins, Craig D Blount, George L Arnold, Jr, Robert E Watson, Lura L Mullins, Clifton Muse, Cordie Marie Rhodes, William M Dixon, David A Gunter, Rebecca Ballard, Glenda Gautreaux, Patsy F Perkins, Debbie D Duffy, David Barker, Murray Carpenter, Randolph McLin, Rebecca Johnson, Ellis Warren, Frankie David, Richard France, Sandy King, Eugene McAllister, Ruby McMorris, Harold R Hicks, Sr, Bud White, Myrtle Anderman, Thomas Prine, Mary F Hodges, Carol Smith Lejeune, Perry W Guillory, Norma Sykes Stewart, James E Brooks, Timothy Carrier, Melvin Graham, Jr, John M James, Lisa Arnett, Steven L Pierce, Betty B Sibley, Julie Stafford, James P Maxwell, Paula Michelle Gillespie, Larry Arnold, Mary Lewis, Faye Pitts, Judy NeSmith, Kenny W Johnson, William E Laboyteaux, Cathy Smith, Dorothy Lanier William, James B Muse, Kathy Walker, Gloria Blount, Ethel Boswell, Charles Hood, Maryne Muse, Cercla Plaintiffs, Joan Carpenter, Donald R Mclin, Russell Curtiss, Johnny Pat Jones, Ricky Neal Boone, Drakeford Delatte, Cynthia Elaine Hendrix, William E Perkins, Bobbie D Martin, Allen Thomas, Irene Baggett, Bessie Lein, Wayne King, Barney Lewis, Jr, Eric John Gaspard, Mark Irwin, James S Carpenter, Carolyn Guerin, Sam R Euggino, James Hopkins, Charles R Brister, Geanetta Mason, Alice E Lott, McDermott Inc, Alton Walker, Thomas Brogan, Jr, Tina Marie Baggett, Jeanette M Wunstel, Karen Blount, Rorderl Alden Yawn, All Plaintiffs, James R Purvis, Charles D Darby, Sidney B Netterville, Dorothy R Gunter, W Michael Miller, Mary E Johnson, Frank Cleaver, Tara L Crocker, Louise Avants, Phyllis Walker, Deborah Morris, Wanda M Nettles, Bertha Landry, Elvy Mae Williamson, H & S Packing Co Inc, Jeffrey Rush, Francis M Savignol, George L Martin, Pam Hayes, Johnnie L Edwards, Peggie Lee Martin, Emma Street, Toney A Harris, Claire E Heil, Gary J Foster, Betty Banta, David Clide Tidrick, Jimmy D Martin, Lenora Boutnell, Kenneth Don Lafferty, Sr, Jerry Mason, Robert Ballard, Adeline Truax, Devra H McMorris, Patsy McCrory, Jeffrey D Perkins, Carlotte Laboyteaux Hall, Theresa Craig, Marvin E Benton, Richard A Nettles, Lisa Reeves, Raymond R Purvis, Georgia George Truax, Robyn Kleinpeter, Frank King, Robert D McAllister, Jodie Ann Benton, Richard Foster, J L NeSmith, Sr, Raymond Truax, Christine Viola Street, Frank Ferrara, Jr, Randall E Purvis, William Norwood Hood, Jerry Hisaw, Doni F Wagoner, Brent J Lacombe, Barbara Kay Wilson, Martha D Lachney, Winnie Perkins, Max McLin, Peggy Ann Benton, Lisa Parrino, Associated Grocers Inc, Nancy Collins King, Shirley McLin, Ernestine Cormier, Lule Rae Cressionnie, Julius T Lott, Johnny P Lacombe, Charles E Gillespie, Peggy A Hisaw, William Ellis, Karen Ott, Bradie A Martin, Joe C Dean, Theresa McDonald, J C Jarreaer, Jr, Angela Ross, Milton E Windham, Oze Avants, Barbara Hisaw, Sherri Davis, Elsie Foster, Blanch Perkins, L J Properties Inc, Cheryl Goins, Bobby R Lott, Jr, Robert W Johnson, Darren Blount and Lisa Sibley
Defendant: James & Co Inc, International Business & Mercantile Reassurance Corp, Home Insurance Co, Evanston Insurance Co, Williams Insurance Agency Inc, U S Fire Insurance Co, Insurers of P M A G Products Inc, Underwriters Management Reliance, John Deere Insurance Co, Western Employers Insurance Co, Southern American Insurance Co, Fidelity & Guaranty Insurance Underwriters Inc, Cigna Specialty Insurance Co, Ranger Insurance Co, Gotham Insurance Co, Westbrook Insurance Corp, Centaur Insurance Co, Highland Casualty Co, Lexington Insurance Co, Chicago Insurance Co, Gerling-Konzern, Aetna Casualty Co, Westport Insurance Co, Carolina Casualty Insurance Co, Aetna Casualty Insurance Co, Aetna Casualty & Surety Co, Transport Insurance Co, Travelers Insurance Co, First State Insurance Co, United States Aircraft Insurance Group, Louisiana Companies Insurance, Rhone Poulenc Basic Chemicals Co, Teledyne Industries Inc, Vesta Insurance Corp, Insurers of Prairie Construction Co Inc Central Manufacturing Co Inc, Canal Insurance Co, Safety Mutual Casualty Corp, Auto Owners Insurance Co, Bellefonte Insurance Co, Settling Defendants, Insurers for Sears Roebuck & Co, W B Edgecumbe, Zurich American Insurance Co, Mission Insurance Co, A B C Insurance Co, Dover Insurance Co Ltd, Pacific Employers Insurance Co, Aetna Life & Casualty, Highlands Insurance Co, Southern Scrap, Interstate Fire & Casualty Co, Avondale Shipyards Inc, Frenchys Oil Salvage Inc, Markel Insurance Co, James River II Inc, American Home Insurance Co, Southern Chemical Co, American General Fire & Casualty Co, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, Old Republic Insurance Co, Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Co, Frenchies Oil Salvage Inc, Home Indemnity Co, Insurance Co of Pennsylvania, Buckeye Union Insurance Co, Insurers of Evans Cooperage Inc, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds of London, Royal Insurance Co, Affiliated F M Insurance Co, Insurers of Port Allen Marine Service Inc, Allianz Underwriters Insurance Co, Westport Insurance Corp, United States Fidelity & Guaranty Insurance, Somerset Marine Inc, Stonewall Insurance Co, Atlanta International Insurance Co, Bellafonte Underwriters Insurance Co, Transportation Insurance Co, Seachem Corp Inc, National Union Fire Insurance Co, Tenneco Oil Co, National Indemnity Co, Insurers of Unisys Corp, Certain Insurers, Daniell Battery Manufacturing Co, E & E Waste Oil Service, Illinois Employers Insurance Co, George Engine Co Inc, Insco, Bausch & Lomb Inc, Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Co, Financial Guaranty Insurance Co, Bubba Oustalet Lincoln-Mercury Inc, Insurers of Williams McWilliams Co Inc, Brown & Root U S A Inc, C N A Insurance Co, North Star Reinsurance Corp, Hartford Casualty Insurance Co, American Mutual Liability Insurance Co, Louisiana Insurance Guaranty Association, General Reinsurance Corp, Western Employers Inc Co, Acadiana Shipyard, Constitution State Insurance Co, Transcontinental Insurance Co, Gibraltar Insurance Co, Chris Tharpe, Mutual Marine Insurance Co, Birmingham Fire Insurance Co of Pennsylvania, G E Chemicals Inc, Certain Insureds, North American Chemical Corp, Sermatech International, A I G Aviation Inc, Selective Insurance Co of South Carolina, Midland, Tenneco Inc, Appollo Manufacturing, A B C Corp, Insurers of Nelson & East Ford Co Inc, California Union Insurance Co, G A T X Corp, American Motorists Insurance Co, S C R Investment Co, Petroleum Products Inc, American International Underwriters Insurance Co, Greenwich Insurance Co, National Union Insurance Co, Insurers of Paul Fournet Air Service Inc, Truck Insurance Exchange, Safety Mutual Insurance Co, P & W Industries Inc and National Union Fire Insurance Co of Pittsburgh Pennsylvania
Petitioner: Bobby Randall Springfield, A S Easterly, III, Donna Unkel Grodner and Kevin Patrick Monahan
3Rd Party Defendant: Smittys Auto Care Inc, South Central Bell Telephone Co, Clark C Cenac, Jr, Diamond Motors Inc, Schuylkill Metals, F W Woolworth Co, Baton Rouge Vo-Tech School, Jim Transmission, Blain & Sons Inc, Carey Cenac, Southern Pacific, London Market Companies, Prudhomme Truck & Tank Service, W E Blain & Son Inc, Bill Hood Ford, Bartlette Chemical, Malone Service Co, Jays Car Center, Lubrizol Corp, Polk Chevrolet (Polt Investments), D E F Insurance Co, Mini Motors Inc, Macken Roth Oil Co, Jericho Petroleum, Hollywood Marine, Westbank Container Services Inc, James Noel Flying Service Inc, Port Drum Co Inc, I N A Underwriters Insurance Co, Industrial Coating Specialists Inc, Third-Party Insurance Defendants, Watson Marine Service Inc, Southern Equipment Co, U S Dept of Transportation, Hartford Insurance Group, Laurel Lea Discount Tire, School Board St Martin Parish, Dick Barker Inc, B F Goodrich Inc, Oxirane Chemical/Cargo Service, Appel Tractors Inc, Hertz Corp, Thibodaux Municipal Airport, Mutual Marine Office Inc, Davidson Pumps Inc, Pirelli Armstrong Tire Corp, Cos Mar Co, Petroleum Transport, Paul Fournet Air Service Inc, American Mutual Insurance Co of Boston, Leevac Corp, Sunbeam Dairy Products, American Commercial Barge Line Co, Carrier Insurance Co Ltd, Simple Simon Goodyear Tire, Terrebonne Motors Co Inc, Connie Cenac Hendricks, Illinois Central Railroad, A T I Inc, Patterson Redmond Equipment Inc, Lafayette Motors Co Inc, Channel Shipyard, Westbank Contractor Inc, Apollo Manufacturing Inc, Miller-Terrill Buick Inc, Parish of East Baton Rouge, A B C Insurance Corp, Airdyne Lafayette Inc, Richards Investment Autos Inc, J L Mallett, Sr, Ampro Fertilizer, City of East Baton Rouge, Lloyds of London, Brown & Root Inc, Chotin Transportation, Cavenham Forest Industries Inc, U S Postal Service, General Tire Inc, Boswell Oil Co, Sauder Leasing Systems Inc and Mainstram Shipyards & Supply Inc
Consolidated Plaintiff: Crown Paper Co and James River Paper Co Inc
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Georgia Pacific Corp, Chevron U S A Inc, Mobil Oil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc, Travelers Indemnity Co, Amoco Chemical Co, Uniroyal Chemical Co Inc, Younger Brothers Inc, Bollinger Machine Shop & Shipyard Inc, Iberville Motors, Bender Shipbuilding & Repair Co Inc, T L James & Co Inc, Union Carbide Chemicals & Plastics Co Inc, Port Allen Marine Service Inc, Matlack Inc, Dow Chemical Co, Mobil Oil Corp, Mobil Corp, Louisiana Paving Co Inc, Mobil Exploration & Producing Southeast Inc, Kaiser Aluminum & Chemical and Chevron Chemical Co
Intervenor Plaintiff: State of Louisiana
Claimant: Tammy Salter, Karen V Holmes, David H Smith, Vicki Gunter and Frances Bailey
Cross Defendant: Louisiana Petro Chem Corp and Gulf Insurance Co
Cross Claimant: S S X L C
Case Number: 6:1994md04000
Filed: July 2, 1994
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Richard T Haik
Referring Judge: Pamela A Tynes
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 1994. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 1994 CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Pamela A. Tynes (former employee)
July 1, 1994 Filing 826 MOTION by Port Allen Mar Svc to extend time respond to third-party complaint by McDermott (former employee)
July 1, 1994 Filing 827 MOTION by Simple Simon Inc to substitute attorney Ednayliffe Latchem (former employee)
June 30, 1994 Filing 819 RESPONSE by U S A to minutes [784-1] authorizing briefs in re: non-epidemiological studies (former employee)
June 30, 1994 Filing 820 MOTION by Baton Rouge Truck to extend time file responsive pleadings (former employee)
June 30, 1994 Filing 821 ANSWER by Chevron Chemical Co to amended complaint (former employee)
June 30, 1994 Filing 822 ANSWER by Chevron U S A Inc to amended complaint (former employee)
June 30, 1994 Filing 823 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Bollinger Shipyard against Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G Ins Co, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co, Charter Oak Fire Ins, Fidelity & Guaranty, I N A Und Ins Co, Insurance Co of N Am, Mission Insurance Co, LA Ins Guar Assn, Boston Old Colony Ins Co, Continental Ins Co Seabord Fire & Marine Ins Co (former employee) Modified on 08/11/1994
June 30, 1994 Filing 824 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Cenac Towing against Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G Ins Co, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co, Charter Oak Fire Ins, Fidelity & Guaranty, I N A Und Ins Co, Insurance Co of N Am, Mission Insurance Co, LA Ins Guar Assn, Continental Ins Co & Boston Old Colony Ins Co (former employee) Modified on 08/11/1994
June 30, 1994 Filing 825 ANSWER by Peterbilt of LA to amended third-party complaint: [756-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 799 ANSWER by LA Power & Light Co to amended complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 800 ANSWER by U S A to [477-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 801 ANSWER by U S A to [478-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 802 ANSWER by U S A to [441-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 803 ANSWER by U S A to [480-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 804 ANSWER by U S A to [431-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 805 ANSWER by U S A to [430-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 806 ANSWER by U S A to [482-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 807 ANSWER by U S A to [437-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 808 ANSWER by U S A to [439-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 809 ANSWER by U S A to [438-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 810 ANSWER by U S A to [519-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 811 ANSWER by U S A to [442-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 812 ANSWER by U S A to [468-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 813 ANSWER by U S A to [440-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 814 ANSWER by U S A to [655-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 815 ANSWER by U S A to [426-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 816 ANSWER by U S A to [479-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 817 ANSWER by Avondale Ind Inc to amended complaint (former employee)
June 29, 1994 Filing 818 ANSWER by School Board St Martin Parish to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 28, 1994 Filing 796 MEMORANDUM by Defendants Strg Comm in opposition to [780-1] motion to adopt method of dissemination and form of important notice to file proof of claim (former employee)
June 28, 1994 Filing 798 NOTICE by LA Dept of Health & Human Res of request for notice of trial and of signing of judgment and order (former employee)
June 28, 1994 Filing 797 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION to [760-1] motion to supplement plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion for partial summary judgment on issue of punitive damages w/additional documentation by Pltfs Steering Cte (former employee)
June 27, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER dismissing third-party claims by McDermott Inc ag/Gerald J Patin dba Patin's Conoco Service Station dba Patin's Goodyear & Appliance w/o prejudice (signed by Judge Richard T. Haik Sr.) (former employee)
June 27, 1994 Filing 793 JUDGMENT for U S A [737-1] motion to dismiss all third-party plaintiffs' claims for punitive and/or exemplary damages (signed by Judge Richard T. Haik Sr.) (former employee)
June 27, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 794 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of cross-claim by H Arthur Gammons ag/Ashland Chemical Inc only (signed by Judge Richard T. Haik Sr.) (former employee)
June 27, 1994 Filing 795 MEMORANDUM by Defendants Strg Comm in opposition to [760-1] motion to supplement plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion for partial summary judgment on issue of punitive damages w/additional documentation (former employee)
June 23, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 790 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 9:30 9/3/96; Pretrial Conference for 9:30 6/24/96; Joining of parties, amding of pleadings on 1/16/95; Deadline for filing of all motions 3/29/96; Dft's expert info/rpts due 6/9/95; Discovery due 3/1/96; Pltf's expert info/rpts due 2/3/95; Expert depositions due 2/20/95; Conference to prepare PT stips for 5/20/96 thru 5/22/96; Motions in limine due 5/3/96; Trial depositions (expert & lay) due 7/26/96; Discovery of imp/surv evid due 8/2/96; Bench book due 8/16/96; Witness lists/Exhibit lists due 6/7/96; 3rd party deft expert reports 8/4/95; hrg to address in limine motions 6/24/96; deadline for discovery of requested surveillance/final depo of party in question 8/2/96; trial submissions 8/9/96; ALL ORDERS OF STAY LIFTED (signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela A. Tynes) (former employee)
June 23, 1994 Filing 791 MOTION by U S A to extend time submit information re: authorities barring from evidence informal studies, as distinguished from epidemiological studies (former employee)
June 21, 1994 Filing 789 MOTION by Defendants Strg Comm for reconsideration of ruling allowing plaintiffs to supplement their opposition to Deft Steering Cte's Motion for Partial SJ on Punitive Damages (former employee)
June 20, 1994 Filing 783 MINUTE ENTRY: providing instructions re: transfer to USDC/MDLA, assignment of case numbers etc. (signed by Judge Richard T. Haik Sr.) (former employee)
June 20, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 784 MINUTES OF COURT (M/J TYNES ORDER NO. 9) from meeting: meeting conducted 6/15/94 w/liaison counsel; USA granted through 6/23/94 to submit brief addressing informal non-epidemiological studies w/response briefs due by 7/8/94; defts ordered to advise pltfs in writing identities of 75 alternate pltfs selected for independent medical exam by 7/15/94 - pltfs ordered to advise defts in writing identities of all pltfs examined by Dr. Kilburn by 7/15/94; 6/29/94 hearing date cancelled; September hearing date rescheduled for 9/28/94; pltfs counsel reminded that PSC has obligation to make proof of claim form available to all who request one; proof of claim forms completed by 18 bellwether pltfs be filed by 11/15/94 - as one submission into record; pltfs counsel ordered to file notice identifying depositions taken to date which pltfs intend to use at trial in phase one by 8/15/94, objections to their use shall be filed by 10/15/94; matter re: sealed deposition in New York court discussed and deferred (by Magistrate Judge Pamela A. Tynes)(former employee) Modified on 03/22/1995
June 20, 1994 Filing 785 NOTICE by H Arthur Gammons of volutary dismissal of cross-claim ag/Bausch & Lomb only (former employee)
June 20, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 786 ORDER granting [758-1] motion for leave to file third-party complaint (signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Tynes) (former employee)
June 20, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 787 ORDER granting [751-1] motion for leave to file third-party complaint (signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Tynes) (former employee)
June 20, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ORDER granting [752-1] motion for leave to file third-party complaint (signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Tynes) (former employee)
June 20, 1994 Filing 924 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Acadian Shipyard Inc against Home Insurance Co (note - this pleading allowed to be filed by order filed 6/20/94 (Doc #786). Pleading not filed in by MDLA at that time.) (former employee)
June 17, 1994 Filing 781 SUPPLEMENTAL memorandum by H Arthur Gammons, Patsy H Gammons advising withdrawal of opposition to [765-1] motion for order maintaining objection of lack of capacity to be sued, [765-2] motion to dismiss (former employee)
June 17, 1994 Filing 782 REPLY by C F Industries Inc to response to [452-1] motion for summary judgment based on prescription, [452-2] motion to add additional defendants (former employee)
June 13, 1994 Filing 780 MOTION by Pltfs Steering Cte, Defendants Strg Comm to adopt method of dissemination and form of important notice to file proof of claim (former employee)
June 10, 1994 Filing 779 ANSWER to Complaint by General Motors Corp; jury demand (former employee)
June 8, 1994 Filing 768 ANSWER by M W Kellogg Co to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 8, 1994 Filing 769 ANSWER by M W Kellogg Co to amended third-party complaint: [756-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
June 8, 1994 Filing 770 ANSWER by B A S F Corp to amended complaint (former employee)
June 8, 1994 Filing 771 ANSWER by Ciba-Geigy Corp to amended complaint (former employee)
June 8, 1994 Filing 772 ANSWER by Exxon Corp to amended complaint (former employee)
June 8, 1994 Filing 773 ANSWER by Hoechst Celanese to amended complaint (former employee)
June 8, 1994 Filing 774 ANSWER by Matlack Inc to amended complaint (former employee)
June 8, 1994 Filing 775 ANSWER by Mobil Corp, Mobil Exp & Prod SE to amended complaint (former employee)
June 8, 1994 Filing 776 ANSWER by Monsanto Co to amended complaint (former employee)
June 8, 1994 Filing 777 ANSWER by Reichhold Chem Inc to amended complaint (former employee)
June 8, 1994 Filing 778 ANSWER by Shell Western E & P to amended complaint (former employee)
June 6, 1994 Filing 767 NOTICE by H Arthur Gammons of voluntary dismissal of cross-claim ag/Ashland Chemical Inc only (former employee)
June 6, 1994 MINUTE ENTRY: granting [760-1] motion to supplement plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion for partial summary judgment on issue of punitive damages w/additional documentation (signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela A. Tynes) (former employee)
June 3, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER dismissing all claims by McDermott Inc ag/Dr Pepper/Seven Up w/o prejudice (signed by Judge Richard T. Haik Sr.) (former employee)
June 3, 1994 Filing 765 MOTION by First Nitrogen Corp for order maintaining objection of lack of capacity to be sued , or in alternative, to dismiss (former employee)
June 3, 1994 Filing 766 SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION by C F Industries Inc to [452-1] motion for summary judgment based on prescription, [452-2] motion to add additional defendants (former employee)
June 2, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ORDER effective 7/1/94 this matter is transferred to USDC/WDLA (signed by Judge Richard T. Haik Sr.) (former employee)
June 2, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 762 ORDER granting [753-1] motion for leave to file third-party complaint (signed by Judge Richard T. Haik Sr.) (former employee)
June 2, 1994 Filing 763 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Evans Cooperage Co against Continental Ins Co, First State Ins Co, Mission Insurance Co, Midland Insurance Co, American Home Ins Co, National Union Fire, Lexington Ins Co, International Ins Co, Western Preferred, American Gen Ins Co, First Horizon Ins Co, Lloyds Insurance Co (former employee)
May 31, 1994 Filing 756 FIRST AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by McDermott Inc adding Parelli Armstrong Tire Corp, Baton Rouge Truck Center Inc, Bengal Chem Inc, Bridgestone/Firestone Inc, Cameco Industries Inc, Davison Transport Inc, Delta Concrete Prod Co Inc, General Aviation Corp, Hertz Corp, Lafourche Sugars Corp, LeBoeuf's Transmission Ctr Inc, Leevac Corp, LA Aircraft Inc, Lubrizol Corp, Mainstram Syipyards and Supply Inc, Naylor Industries Inc, Peterbilt of LA, Port Allen Marine Svc Inc, Richard's Investment Autos Inc, Scott Paper Co and F W Woolworth Co, amends [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
May 31, 1994 Filing 757 MINUTES OF COURT from hearing: hearing conducted by Judge Haik and M/J Tynes on 5/24/94 in Baton Rouge; mtg w/liaison counsel immediate following the hearing; court briefed on [737-1] motion to dismiss third-party claims for punitive damages - motion GRANTED, liaison counsel for USA to submit appropriate judgment to court by 6/8/94; oral argument entertained on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by the "generator" defendants - motion taken under advisement; court announced designation of various plaintiff categories; discussion re: bellwether plaintiffs, proof of claim forms; defendant's Motion to Approve Medical Testing Protocol for Independent Medical Exams is under advisement; Defendants' Steering Cte Motion for Stay and Reconsideration of plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery was GRANTED ...; upon adjournment by Court, liaison counsel met w/judges re: trial plan; 5/31/94 telephone conference cancelled; Court advised a final proposed Case Mgmt Order would be faxed to all liaison counsel on 6/3/94 and a conference for discussion of same scheduled to commence 6/15/94 at 2:00pm in Lafayette, LA (Magistrate Judge Pamela A. Tynes) (former employee) Modified on 08/16/1994
May 31, 1994 Filing 758 MOTION by Acadian Shipyard Inc for leave to file third-party complaint (former employee)
May 31, 1994 Filing 759 NOTICE by McDermott Inc of voluntary dismissal of third-party complaint ag/Patin's Conoco Station dba Patin's Goodyear & Appliance only (former employee)
May 31, 1994 Filing 760 MOTION by Pltfs Steering Cte to supplement plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion for partial summary judgment on issue of punitive damages w/additional documentation (former employee)
May 27, 1994 Filing 751 MOTION by Bollinger Shipyard for leave to file third-party complaint (former employee)
May 27, 1994 Filing 752 MOTION by Cenac Towing Co Inc for leave to file third-party complaint (former employee)
May 27, 1994 Filing 753 MOTION by Evans Cooperage Co for leave to file third-party complaint (former employee)
May 27, 1994 Filing 754 NOTICE by H Arthur Gammons of dismissal of cross-claim ag/Bausch & Lomb onlyi (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
May 27, 1994 Filing 755 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Bender Shipbuilding against American Mutual Liab, American Mutual Bos, Alabama Ins Guaranty, Arkwright Boston Mfr, American Home Assur, Fidelity & Cas of NY, U N I Storebrand Ins, Storebrand Ins K, Vesta Lloyds Ins Co, A B C Ins Corp, D E F Insurance Co, G H I Insurance Co (former employee)
May 26, 1994 Filing 749 MOTION by Pltfs Steering Cte to adopt rulings of state court rendered in open court on 4/6/93 (former employee)
May 26, 1994 Filing 750 STIPULATION by Pltfs Steering Cte, MS Chem Corp, First MS Corp that plaintiffs do not allege any individual acts or omissions w/regard to First MS Corp and MS Chem Corp related to Combustion Inc site and alleged liability is based solely on their interest in Trial Chemical (former employee)
May 19, 1994 Filing 744 MEMORANDUM by Pltfs Steering Cte in opposition to defendant's proposed medical testing protocol for independent medical exams X-FOLDER (former employee) Modified on 08/05/1994
May 19, 1994 Filing 745 SUPPLEMENTAL memorandum by Defendants Strg Comm in support of independent medical exams and related testing (former employee)
May 19, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 746 MINUTES OF COURT (M/J TYNES ORDER NO. 8) from conference: conference held by Judge Haik and M/J Tynes; Judge Haik emphasized importance of minizing expenses of litigation...; various topics (by Magistrate Judge Pamela A. Tynes) (former employee) Modified on 03/22/1995
May 19, 1994 Filing 747 MEMORANDUM by Pltfs Steering Cte in opposition to [739-1] motion for partial summary judgment as to punitive damages claim contained in cross-claim of Arthur Gammons X-FOLDER (former employee)
May 17, 1994 TRANSCRIPT filed for date of 4/28/94 X-FOLDER (former employee)
May 16, 1994 Filing 741 BRIEF ON TRIAL PLAN by Defendants Strg Comm (former employee)
May 16, 1994 Filing 742 ANSWER by Boyce Machinery Corp to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
May 16, 1994 Filing 743 BRIEF ON TRIAL PLAN by Pltfs Steering Cte (former employee)
May 16, 1994 Filing 748 MOTION by McDermott Inc, Dr Pepper to dismiss third-party claims by McDermott ag/Dr Pepper/Seven-up Corp (former employee)
May 12, 1994 Filing 740 ANSWER by Bill Hood Ford to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
May 9, 1994 Filing 737 MOTION by U S A to dismiss third-party claims (former employee)
May 9, 1994 Filing 738 BRIEF ON TRIAL PLAN ISSUED by B A S F Corp, Ciba-Geigy Corp, Exxon Corp, Hoechst Celanese, Matlack Inc, Mobil Oil Corp, Mobil Corp, Mobil Exp & Prod SE, Monsanto Co, Reichhold Chem Inc, Shell Western E & P (former employee)
May 9, 1994 Filing 739 MOTION by Defendants Strg Comm for partial summary judgment as to punitive damages claim contained in cross-claim of Arthur Gammons (6:94cv4017) X-FOLDER (former employee) Modified on 08/05/1994
May 2, 1994 Filing 736 MOTION by Defts Steering Comm to approve medical testing protocol for independent medical examinations with Proposed Order referred to chambers (former employee)
April 28, 1994 Filing 735 RESPONSE by Defendants Strg Comm to order to show cause re: class certification (former employee)
April 28, 1994 Filing 736 RESPONSE by U S A to order to show re: class certification (former employee)
April 26, 1994 Filing 733 MEMORANDUM by Pltfs Steering Cte in opposition to [704-1] motion for summary judgment based on prescription (former employee)
April 26, 1994 Filing 734 RESPONSE by Pltfs Steering Cte order to show cause re: class certification X-FOLDER (former employee) Modified on 08/05/1994
April 25, 1994 Filing 732 MOTION by Chromalloy American for summary judgment based on prescription (former employee)
April 21, 1994 Filing 731 MOTION by Lafayette Airport for summary judgment on third-party claim of McDermott (former employee)
April 20, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 728 MINUTES OF COURT (M/J TYNES ORDER NO. 3) from conference: Kenneth Sills replaces Theodore Edwards as liaison counsel for State and political subdivisions; Steven Levine replaced Leonard Kilgore as liaison counsel for third-part defendants various topics discussed relating to status reports, discovery, service of process, proof of claim etc. (by Magistrate Judge Pamela A. Tynes) (former employee) Modified on 03/22/1995
April 20, 1994 Filing 729 MOTION by C F Industries Inc to strike portions of [708-1] opposition memorandum concerning unsworn statement of Howard Catt and affidavit of Charles McCants (former employee)
April 20, 1994 Filing 730 MOTION by First Nitrogen Corp to dismiss for lack of capacity to be sued (former employee)
April 19, 1994 Filing 726 OBJECTION by U S A to [717-1] report and recommendations (former employee)
April 19, 1994 Filing 727 OBJECTION by Pltfs Steering Cte to [717-1] report and recommendations (former employee)
April 18, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 725 M/J TYNES ORDER NO. 1 assigning responsibilities of liaison counsel (signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela A. Tynes) (former employee) Modified on 03/22/1995
April 15, 1994 Filing 724 ANSWER by Cenac Towing Co Inc to cross-claim by Patsy Gammons (no cross-claim by Patsy Gammons found in record) (former employee)
April 15, 1994 TRANSCRIPT filed for date of 4/14/94 (X-FOLDER) (former employee)
April 8, 1994 Filing 723 ANSWER by Cenac Towing Co Inc to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
April 7, 1994 Filing 719 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc in opposition to [644-1] motion to dismiss third-party claim by McDermott Inc (former employee)
April 7, 1994 Filing 721 MEMORANDUM by American Natural in support of Motion to Dismiss by American Natural (note: there is no such motion in record) (former employee)
April 7, 1994 Filing 722 ANSWER by McDermott Inc to [623-1] counter claim (former employee)
April 7, 1994 Filing 720 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc in opposition to [608-1] motion for summary judgment as to third-party claim of McDermott Inc (former employee)
April 6, 1994 Filing 718 MINUTE ENTRY: discussing issue of remand; appointing liaison counsel as follows - Calvin Fayard of plaintiffs, Michael Chernekoff for third-party plaintiffs on Federal Tort Claim actions, Henry Miller for USA, Michael Parker for non-Louisiana defendants, Glenn Edwards for political subdivisions, Tom McNamara for named defendants, Leonard Kilgore for third-party defendants no otherwise represented; Roger Stetter suggested as alternate liaison counsel for third-party defendants not otherwise represented; liaison counsel will meet 4/15/94 at 10:00am in Lafayette, LA for assignment of duties and discussion re: discovery and case mgmt plan (signed by Judge Richard T. Haik Sr.) (former employee) Modified on 08/16/1994
April 5, 1994 Filing 717 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Pamela A. Tynes re - [447-1] motion to remand, [446-1] motion to remand, [429-1] motion to remand - recommending against remand of this action (former employee)
March 31, 1994 Filing 715 ANSWER by Dr Pepper to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 31, 1994 Filing 716 MOTION by Dr Pepper for summary judgment on third-party claim of McDermott Inc (former employee) Modified on 08/05/1994
March 30, 1994 Filing 714 MOTION by Southern Steamship for summary judgment (6:94cv4018) (former employee)
March 25, 1994 Filing 704 MOTION by Acadian Shipyard Inc for summary judgment based on prescription (former employee)
March 25, 1994 Filing 705 ANSWER by P & W Industries Inc to amended complaint (former employee)
March 25, 1994 Filing 706 ANSWER by Amoco Chemical Co, Dow Chemical Co, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co, Ingalls Shipbuilding to [418-1] claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 25, 1994 Filing 707 ANSWER by Borden Chemical Co to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 25, 1994 Filing 708 MEMORANDUM by Pltfs Steering Cte in opposition to [452-1] motion for summary judgment based on prescription (former employee)
March 25, 1994 Filing 709 MEMORANDUM by Pltfs Steering Cte in opposition to [578-1] motion for summary judgment as to prescription (former employee)
March 25, 1994 Filing 710 MEMORANDUM by Pltfs Steering Cte in opposition to [583-1] motion for summary judgment on grounds of prescription (former employee)
March 25, 1994 Filing 711 RESPONSE/STATEMENT OF NO OPPOSITION by Pltfs Steering Cte to [582-1] motion to dismiss on grounds it was a dissolved corporation or that it lacks capacity to be sued (former employee) Modified on 08/05/1994
March 25, 1994 Filing 712 MEMORANDUM by Pltfs Steering Cte in opposition to [392-1] motion to dismiss based on insufficiency of service of process and lack of personal jurisdiction (former employee)
March 25, 1994 Filing 713 RESPONSE/STATEMENT OF NO OPPOSITION by Pltfs Steering Cte to [579-1] motion for summary judgment (former employee)
March 22, 1994 TRANSCRIPT filed for date of 3/3/94 (X-FOLDER) (former employee)
March 22, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 703 ORDER dismissing third-party claim by McDermott Inc ag/Paktank Inc-Westwego Terminal only (signed by Judge Richard T. Haik Sr.) (former employee)
March 18, 1994 Filing 696 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc in opposition to [591-1] motion for more definite statement (former employee)
March 18, 1994 Filing 697 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc in opposition to [594-1] motion for more definite statement (former employee)
March 18, 1994 Filing 698 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc in opposition to [592-1] motion for more definite statement (former employee)
March 18, 1994 Filing 699 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc in opposition to [593-1] motion for more definite statement (former employee)
March 18, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 700 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of third-party claims by McDermott Inc against Allied Chemical Corp, Amer Comm Barge Line Co, Boswell Oil Co, Chotin Trans, Chotin Barges Inc, Chotin Ofshr Corp, Flagstaff Corp, Hollywood Mar (Alamo Barges), Natl Mar Svcs Inc, Thomas Barge Lines Ltd, LA Avionics Inc, Hancock County, Amer Bridge Co, Davidson Pumps Inc, Raymond Intl, Jericho Petro, Pepper Ind, So Chem Ind Inc, So Chem Svc Inc, Westbank Container Svcs Inc, Westbank Contr Inc, Dale Polk & Son Co, W E Blain & Son Inc, Pioneer Chlor-Alkali Co Inc only w/o prejudice (signed by Judge Richard T. Haik Sr.) (former employee)
March 18, 1994 Filing 701 ANSWER by Union Tank Car Co to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 18, 1994 Filing 702 ANSWER by Rubicon Ind Inc to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 15, 1994 Filing 690 ANSWER by Ryder Truck Rental to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 15, 1994 Filing 691 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc in opposition to [602-1] motion for summary judgment as to third-party claim of McDermott Inc (former employee)
March 15, 1994 Filing 692 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc in opposition to [590-1] motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and lack of capacity to be sued (former employee)
March 15, 1994 Filing 693 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc in opposition to [509-1] motion to dismiss third-party claim of McDermott (former employee)
March 15, 1994 Filing 694 ANSWER by L S U Baton Rouge to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 15, 1994 Filing 695 SUPPLEMENTAL memorandum by U S A in support of [429-1] motion to remand (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 636 ANSWER to Complaint by Unisys Corp (6:94cv4019) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 637 ANSWER by E W Saybolt & Co Inc to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 638 ANSWER by Doran's Foreign Car to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 639 ANSWER to Complaint by Cataphote Inc (6:94cv4018) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 640 ANSWER by Grant Chemical to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 641 ANSWER by Cos Mar Co to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 642 ANSWER to Complaint by Ferro Corp (6:94cv4019) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 643 ANSWER to Complaint by G E Chemicals Inc (6:94cv4019) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 644 MOTION by K-Way Equipment Co to dismiss third-party claim by McDermott Inc (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 645 ANSWER by Sears Roebuck & Co to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 646 ANSWER by Western Auto Supply to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 647 ANSWER by Jefferson Service to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 648 ANSWER by Airdyne Laf Inc to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 649 ANSWER by B F Goodrich Inc to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 650 ANSWER by Brown & Root Inc to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 651 ANSWER by Bellsouth Telecomm to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 652 ANSWER by Point Landing Fuel to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 653 ANSWER by Southern Pacific to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 654 ANSWER by School Board Parish of East Baton Rouge to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 655 ANSWER by Matlack Inc to amended complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 656 ANSWER by Exxon Corp to amended complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 657 ANSWER by Hoechst Celanese to amended complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 658 ANSWER by Canal Refining to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 659 ANSWER by IL Central R R to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 660 ANSWER by Montgomery Ward & Co to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 661 ANSWER by Formosa Plastics to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 662 ANSWER by Southern Scrap Mat to amended complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 663 ANSWER by K-Mart Corp to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 664 ANSWER to Complaint by Magnetek Inc; jury demand (6:94cv4019) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 665 ANSWER to Complaint by Desoto Inc; jury demand (6:94cv4018) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 666 ANSWER by Boswell Oil Co to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 667 ANSWER by Frank G Sullivan Jr to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 668 ANSWER by Laidlaw Env Svc Rec to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 669 ANSWER by Southern Scrap Mat to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 670 ANSWER by McDermott Inc to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee) Modified on 08/05/1994
March 14, 1994 Filing 671 ANSWER by Union Carbide Chem to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 672 ANSWER by Kaiser Alum & Chem to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 673 CROSSCLAIM by Uniroyal Chem Co Inc against H Arthur Gammons (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 674 ANSWER by Georgia Pacific Corp to [418-1] cross claim (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 675 ANSWER by Texaco Inc to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 676 ANSWER by Stauffer Chemical to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 677 ANSWER by MS Power Co to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 678 ANSWER by Amerada Hess Corp to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 679 ANSWER by Browning-Ferris Chem to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 680 ANSWER by Ashland Oil Inc to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 681 ANSWER by Chevron U S A Inc to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 682 ANSWER by Avondale Ind Inc to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee) Modified on 08/05/1994
March 14, 1994 Filing 683 ANSWER by B A S F Corp to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee) Modified on 08/05/1994
March 14, 1994 Filing 684 ANSWER by Ciba-Geigy Corp to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 685 ANSWER by Exxon Corp to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 686 ANSWER by Hoechst Celanese to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 687 ANSWER by Mobil Oil Corp to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 688 ANSWER by Monsanto Co to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 14, 1994 Filing 689 ANSWER by Reichhold Chem Inc to [418-1] cross claim; jury demand (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 622 ANSWER by Port Drum Co Inc to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 623 ANSWER by McNair Transport to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 624 ANSWER by Paul Fournet Air Svc to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 625 ANSWER by Lafayette Airport to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 626 MOTION by LA Dept of Education to dismiss tort contribution claims (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 627 MOTION by L S U Baton Rouge to dismiss tort contribution claims (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 628 MOTION by LA Dept of Public Safety & Corr to dismiss tort contribution claims (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 629 MOTION by LA Dept of Transportation & Dev to dismiss tort contribution claims (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 630 ANSWER by LA Dept of Education to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 631 ANSWER by LA Dept of Transportation & Dev to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 632 MOTION by LA Dept of Education for summary judgment as to third-party claim of McDermott Inc (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 633 MOTION by L S U Baton Rouge for summary judgment as to third-party claim of McDermott Inc (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 634 MOTION by LA Dept of Transportation & Dev for summary judgment as to third-party claim of McDermott Inc (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 635 MOTION by LA Dept of Public Safety & Corr for summary judgment as to third-party claim of McDermott Inc (former employee)
March 11, 1994 Filing 623 COUNTERCLAIM by McNair Transport against McDermott Inc (former employee)
March 10, 1994 Filing 610 ANSWER by Associated Grocers to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 10, 1994 Filing 611 ANSWER by General Tire Inc to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 10, 1994 Filing 612 ANSWER by Ampro Fertilizer to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 10, 1994 Filing 613 ANSWER by Southern Equip Co to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 10, 1994 Filing 614 ANSWER by Goudchaux Car Care to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 10, 1994 Filing 615 MOTION by McDermott Inc to dismiss third-party claim ag/Paktank Inc-Westwego Terminal (former employee)
March 10, 1994 Filing 616 NOTICE by McDermott Inc of Voluntary Dismissal as to numerous third-party defendants (former employee)
March 10, 1994 Filing 617 NOTES OF INFORMATION by McDermott Inc re: Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation and Liability Act (former employee)
March 10, 1994 Filing 618 NOTES OF EVIDENCE by McDermott re: issue of personal jurisdiction (former employee)
March 10, 1994 Filing 619 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc of law re: class certification (former employee)
March 10, 1994 Filing 620 MEMORANDUM by Defendants Strg Comm of law re: prescription and class certification (former employee)
March 10, 1994 Filing 621 MEMORANDUM by Pltfs Steering Cte in support of [429-1] motion to remand (former employee)
March 9, 1994 Filing 609 ANSWER by Prairie Const Co to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 8, 1994 Filing 608 MOTION by Lafourche Sugar Co for summary judgment as to third-party claim of McDermott Inc (former employee) Modified on 08/29/1994
March 7, 1994 Filing 606 ANSWER by New Orleans Aviation Board incorrectly named as LA Dept of Transportation and Development individually and/or acting through the Kenner Airport and/or Moisant Intl Airport and/or General Aviation to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 7, 1994 Filing 607 ANSWER by St Gabriel Ind Enter to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 3, 1994 Filing 605 BENCH MEMORANDUM/RESPONSE by Defendants Strg Comm to [429-1] motion to remand (former employee)
March 2, 1994 Filing 603 ANSWER by Diamond Motors Inc to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 2, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER dismissing Broadmoor Construction Co (Broadmoor Inc) (signed by Judge Richard T. Haik Sr.) (former employee)
March 1, 1994 Filing 600 MEMORANDUM by Pltfs Steering Cte in opposition to [579-1] motion for summary judgment (former employee)
March 1, 1994 Filing 601 ANSWER by Brouilette's Lift to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
March 1, 1994 Filing 602 MOTION by Bender Shipbuilding for summary judgment as to third-party claim of McDermott Inc (former employee)
February 28, 1994 Filing 591 MOTION by LA Dept of Education for more definite statement (former employee)
February 28, 1994 Filing 592 MOTION by LA Dept of Public Safety & Corr for more definite statement (former employee)
February 28, 1994 Filing 593 MOTION by L S U Baton Rouge for more definite statement (former employee)
February 28, 1994 Filing 594 MOTION by LA Dept of Transportation & Dev for more definite statement (former employee)
February 28, 1994 Filing 595 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc in opposition to [581-1] motion for summary judgment as to third-party claim of McDermott Inc (former employee) Modified on 08/04/1994
February 28, 1994 Filing 596 MEMORANDUM by H Arthur Gammons, Patsy H Gammons in opposition to [583-1] motion for summary judgment on grounds of prescription (former employee) Modified on 08/04/1994
February 28, 1994 Filing 597 MEMORANDUM by H Arthur Gammons, Patsy H Gammons in opposition to [578-1] motion for summary judgment as to prescription (former employee) Modified on 08/04/1994
February 28, 1994 Filing 598 MEMORANDUM by First Nitrogen Corp in opposition to [582-1] motion to dismiss on grounds it was a dissolved corporation or that it lacks capacity to be sued (former employee)
February 28, 1994 Filing 599 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc in opposition to [580-1] motion for summary judgment as to third-party claim of McDermott Inc (former employee)
February 25, 1994 Filing 590 MOTION by City/Parish Commission of East Baton Rouge to dismiss for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted and lack of capacity to be sued (former employee)
February 24, 1994 Filing 587 ANSWER by Bollinger Shipyard to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
February 24, 1994 Filing 588 ANSWER by Lafourche Sugar Co to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
February 24, 1994 Filing 589 ANSWER by Audubon Ford, Harris Chevrolet to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
February 23, 1994 Filing 585 AMENDED ANSWER by Laurel Lea Discount to third party complaint : amending [497-1] third-party answer (former employee)
February 23, 1994 Filing 586 ANSWER by Thibodaux Mun Airpt to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
February 22, 1994 Filing 584 MEMORANDUM by Pltfs Steering Cte in opposition to [452-1] motion for summary judgment based on prescription, [452-2] motion to add additional defendants, [578-1] motion for summary judgment as to prescription, [578-2] motion to add additional defendants, [583-1] motion for summary judgment on grounds of prescription (former employee)
February 15, 1994 Filing 582 MOTION by First Nitrogen Corp to dismiss on grounds it was a dissolved corporation or that it lacks capacity to be sued (former employee)
February 15, 1994 Filing 583 MOTION by Matlack Inc for summary judgment on grounds of prescription (former employee)
February 14, 1994 Filing 579 MOTION by Guzzetta Oil Co for summary judgment (former employee)
February 14, 1994 Filing 580 MOTION by Burlington North RR for summary judgment as to third-party claim of McDermott Inc (former employee)
February 14, 1994 Filing 581 MOTION by Polk Chevrolet for summary judgment as to third-party claim of McDermott Inc (former employee)
February 11, 1994 Filing 578 MOTION by Cenac Towing Co Inc for summary judgment as to prescription , and, alternatively to add additional defendants (former employee)
February 10, 1994 Filing 577 MOTION by Oil Mop Inc for summary judgment as to third-party claim of McDermott (former employee)
February 7, 1994 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER granting [571-1] notice of dismissal (signed by Judge Richard T. Haik Sr.) (former employee)
February 4, 1994 Filing 575 NOTICE by P & W Industries Inc of re: Plan of Reorganization (former employee)
February 3, 1994 Filing 574 ANSWER by Appel Tractors Inc to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
February 2, 1994 Filing 573 ANSWER by Emery Equip Sale to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee) Modified on 08/04/1994
January 27, 1994 Filing 572 ANSWER by Sullair Corp to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
January 14, 1994 Filing 571 NOTICE by McDermott Inc of voluntary dismissal of Shoreline Supply (Shoreline Equip Co), Hydraulic Repair Svc Inc, Channel Shipyard of NO Inc, Hercules Inc, Gretna Machine & Iron Works Inc, Energy Corp of America, Lubrizol Corp, Bartless Chem, C L E C O, Algiers Iron Works, Petro-Product Services Inc, Talen's Landing Inc, Oxirane Chem/Cango Service, and Cavenham Forest Ind only (former employee)
January 10, 1994 Filing 570 NOTICE by McDermott Inc of voluntary dismissal of Broadmoor Construction Co (Broadmoor Inc) (former employee)
January 3, 1994 Filing 569 ANSWER by Southern Chem Ind to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
December 30, 1993 Filing 568 STATEMENT by Livingston Parish School Board of case (former employee)
December 20, 1993 Filing 567 ANSWER by Lafayette Motors Inc to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
December 9, 1993 Filing 566 NOTICE by Bagwell Coatings Inc of Automatic Bankruptcy Stay (6:94cv4015) (former employee)
December 3, 1993 Filing 565 ANSWER by Malone Service Co to [428-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
December 1, 1993 Filing 564 MOTION by Defendants Strg Comm to partially lift stay of discovery (former employee)
December 1, 1993 FROM THIS POINT FORWARD ALL DOCUMENTS RELATE TO ALL CASES UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTED IN DOCKET ENTRY (former employee)
November 30, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 563 ORDER assigning Magistrate Judge Pamela A Tynes to this matter (former employee)
November 22, 1993 Filing 562 MOTION by Burlington North RR for summary judgment on third-party complaint by McDermott (6:94cv4020) (former employee)
November 19, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 561 ORDER governing practice & procedur (signed by Judge Richard T. Haik Sr.) (former employee)
October 27, 1993 Filing 560 ANSWER by Sline Ind Painters to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
October 19, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER denying [554-1] motion for reconsideration of [543-1] order (All) (former employee)
October 8, 1993 Filing 558 MEMORANDUM by Allworth Inc in opposition to [554-1] motion for reconsideration of [543-1] order (All) (former employee)
September 29, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 555 ORDER assigning matter to Judge Richard T Haik, Sr (former employee)
September 29, 1993 Filing 556 ANSWER to Complaint by Bender Shipbuilding (6:94cv4020) (former employee)
September 29, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 557 ORDER by MDL Panel recognizing Judge Haik (former employee)
September 29, 1993 Filing 1233 NOTICE OF REFUSAL to Attorneys Beaulieu & Compagno returning FRCP 26(a)(1) Disclosure pursuant to instructions of Court relating to non-filing of discovery materials (former employee)
September 28, 1993 Filing 554 MOTION by McDermott Inc for reconsideration of [543-1] order (All) (former employee)
September 27, 1993 Filing 553 STATEMENT by Aluminum Co of America of case (All) (former employee)
September 22, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER of transfer by MDL Panel (former employee)
September 20, 1993 Filing 551 STATEMENT by Dirt Inc, Lamar Allen Harrison & Dubose Waste Oil of case (All) (former employee)
September 18, 1993 Filing 550 STATEMENT by Bender Shipbuilding & Repair Co of case (All) (former employee)
September 17, 1993 Filing 546 STATEMENT by Onan Corp of case (former employee)
September 17, 1993 Filing 547 ANSWER to Complaint by Aluminum Co of Amer (All) (former employee)
September 17, 1993 Filing 548 STATEMENT by Teledyne Continental Motors of case (All) (former employee)
September 17, 1993 Filing 549 STATEMENT by Burlington Northern R R of case (All) (former employee)
September 15, 1993 Filing 544 STATEMENT by McDermott Inc of case (former employee)
September 15, 1993 Filing 545 STATEMENT by Allworth Inc of case (former employee)
September 14, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 543 ORDER granting [516-1] motion for summary judgment on third-party complaint by McDermott (All) (former employee)
September 8, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER by Judge Polozola recusing himself from this matter (former employee)
August 25, 1993 Filing 541 REPLY by McDermott Inc to response to [516-1] motion for summary judgment on third-party complaint by McDermott (All) (former employee)
August 18, 1993 Filing 540 SUPPLEMENTAL memorandum by American Cyanamid in opposition to [429-1] motion to remand (All) (former employee)
August 13, 1993 Filing 538 SUPPLEMENTAL memorandum by McDermott Inc in opposition to [429-1] motion to remand (All) (former employee)
August 13, 1993 Filing 539 REPLY by Allworth Inc to response to [516-1] motion for summary judgment on third-party complaint by McDermott (All) (former employee)
August 11, 1993 Filing 536 MEMORANDUM by Defts Steering Cte in opposition to [429-1] motion to remand (All) (former employee)
August 11, 1993 Filing 537 SUPPLEMENTAL memorandum by Amoco Chemical Co, Dow Chemical Co, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co in opposition to [429-1] motion to remand (All) (former employee)
July 29, 1993 Filing 534 NOTICE by Levingston Shipbuilding Co of Suggestion of Bankruptcy (not found as party in this matter) (former employee)
July 29, 1993 Filing 535 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc in opposition to [516-1] motion for summary judgment on third-party complaint by McDermott (All) (former employee)
July 27, 1993 Filing 533 ANSWER by Ralston Purina Co to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
July 23, 1993 Filing 532 ANSWER to Complaint by Onan Corp (6:94cv4020) (former employee)
July 21, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER dismissing action as to Richard v Acadiana Shipyards (6:94cv4007) (former employee)
July 19, 1993 Filing 530 SUPPLEMENTAL memorandum by McDermott Inc in support of [429-1] motion to remand (All) (former employee)
July 15, 1993 Filing 529 LETTER by Thompson Environmental Mgmt Inc to Clerk regarding bankruptcy of Oil Mop Inc and Apache Marine. Copy to MDL Panel. (former employee)
July 9, 1993 Filing 527 NOTICE by McDermott Inc of dismissal as to Seven-Up, RC Bottling Co of LA only (former employee)
July 9, 1993 Filing 528 NOTICE by McDermott Inc of voluntary dismissal of Central Environmental Inc only (former employee) Modified on 08/16/1994
July 8, 1993 Filing 525 ANSWER by Hollywood Marine to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee) Modified on 08/04/1994
July 8, 1993 Filing 526 ANSWER by A K Durnin Chrysler to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
July 6, 1993 Filing 522 ANSWER by Shoreline Supply to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
July 6, 1993 Filing 523 ANSWER by Oil Mop Inc to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee) Modified on 08/04/1994
July 6, 1993 Filing 524 ANSWER to Complaint by Howard Ind Inc (6:94cv4018) (former employee) Modified on 08/04/1994
July 1, 1993 Filing 519 ANSWER by Reichhold Chem Inc to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
July 1, 1993 Filing 520 ANSWER by Channel Shipyard to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
July 1, 1993 Filing 521 ANSWER by Prudhomme Truck to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
June 30, 1993 Filing 517 NOTICE by P & W Industries Inc of Automatic Bankruptcy Stay (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
June 30, 1993 Filing 518 ANSWER to Complaint by Burlington North RR (6:94cv4020) (former employee)
June 29, 1993 Filing 512 ANSWER by C L E C O to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
June 29, 1993 Filing 514 ANSWER to Complaint by Bubba Oustalet Linc (All) (Note: this pleading signed by Atty William Lee Guice, MS Bar #5059, no address or phone #; pleading titled answer to complaint of McDermott, however this party not named in third-party complaint by McDermott) (former employee)
June 29, 1993 Filing 515 ANSWER to Complaint by Allworth Inc (note pleading titled answer to third-party complaint of McDermott, but Allworth Inc not named in that claim (All) (former employee)
June 29, 1993 Filing 516 MOTION by Allworth Inc for summary judgment on third-party complaint by McDermott (All) (former employee)
June 29, 1993 Filing 513 MOTION w/brief by Tenneco Inc to dismiss first suppl/amend petition pursuant to FRCP 12(b) (former employee)
June 28, 1993 Filing 510 ANSWER by TN Gas Pipeline Co to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
June 28, 1993 Filing 511 RESPONSE by McDermott Inc re: nature of claims, contentions and defenses raised (former employee)
June 25, 1993 Filing 509 MOTION by Ancoa/American Nat to dismiss third-party claim of McDermott (All) (former employee)
June 24, 1993 Filing 507 ANSWER by Chromalloy American to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
June 24, 1993 Filing 508 ANSWER by Petro Chem Maint to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
June 23, 1993 Filing 504 ANSWER by Nelson & East Ford to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
June 23, 1993 Filing 505 ANSWER by Schuylkill Metals to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
June 23, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER of MDL Panel setting hearing on motion to transfer by McDermott Inc (former employee)
June 21, 1993 Filing 500 ANSWER by Henry's Service Ctr to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee) Modified on 08/04/1994
June 21, 1993 Filing 501 ANSWER by General Equipment to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
June 21, 1993 Filing 502 ANSWER by B A S F Corp to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
June 21, 1993 Filing 503 ANSWER by Ciba-Geigy Corp to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
June 18, 1993 Filing 498 MEMORANDUM by U S A in support of [429-1] motion to remand (All) (former employee) Modified on 08/04/1994
June 18, 1993 Filing 499 ANSWER by Simple Simon Inc, Simple Simon Goodyr to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee) Modified on 08/04/1994
June 17, 1993 Filing 497 ANSWER by Laurel Lea Discount to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee) Modified on 08/04/1994
June 16, 1993 Filing 496 ANSWER to Complaint by Southern Steamship (6:94cv4018) (former employee)
June 15, 1993 Filing 492 MEMORANDUM RESPONSE by Pltfs Steering Cte re: nature of claims asserted in class action (All) (former employee)
June 15, 1993 Filing 493 MEMORANDUM by C F Industries Inc in opposition to [429-1] motion to remand (All) (former employee)
June 15, 1993 Filing 494 RESPONSE by Defts Steering Cte to [429-1] motion to remand (All) (former employee)
June 15, 1993 Filing 495 RESPONSE by Gulf States Util Co, Ethyl Corp, Amoco Chemical Co, Dow Chemical Co to [429-1] motion to remand (All) (former employee)
June 11, 1993 Filing 490 ANSWER by Inc Williams McWilliams to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
June 11, 1993 Filing 491 ANSWER by Pak Tank Corp to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
June 10, 1993 Filing 489 ANSWER by Quality Equip & Rent to [428-1] third-party complaint; jury demand (All) (former employee)
June 9, 1993 Filing 488 ANSWER by Petro Product Svcs to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
June 8, 1993 Filing 487 ANSWER by Borden Chemical Co to [418-1] cross claim (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
June 7, 1993 Filing 484 MOTION by East Baton Rouge Com to dismiss for failure to state a claim (All) (former employee)
June 7, 1993 Filing 485 ANSWER by Polk Chevrolet to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
June 7, 1993 Filing 486 ANSWER to Complaint by National Tank Co Inc (6:94cv4018) (former employee)
June 2, 1993 Filing 483 ANSWER to Complaint by Ergon Trkg Co Inc (6:94cv4018) (former employee)
June 1, 1993 Filing 477 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Texaco Inc against U S A (All) (former employee)
June 1, 1993 Filing 478 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Stauffer Chemical against U S A (All) (former employee) Modified on 08/04/1994
June 1, 1993 Filing 479 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by MS Power Co against U S A (All) (former employee)
June 1, 1993 Filing 480 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Amerada Hess Corp against U S A (All) (former employee)
June 1, 1993 Filing 481 MEMORANDUM by Inc Williams McWilliams in opposition to [446-1] motion to remand (6:94cv4015) (former employee)
June 1, 1993 Filing 482 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Browning-Ferris Chem against U S (All) (former employee)
May 27, 1993 Filing 475 ANSWER by School Board of Livingston Parish to [428-1] third-party complaint (All) (former employee)
May 27, 1993 Filing 476 ANSWER to Complaint by Teledyne Ind Inc (6:94cv4020) (former employee)
May 26, 1993 Filing 474 ANSWER to Complaint by Mid-State Paving Co (6:94cv4018) (former employee)
May 25, 1993 Filing 468 ANSWER by Laidlaw Env Svc Rec to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
May 25, 1993 Filing 469 ANSWER by Head & Enquist Equip to [428-1] third-party complaint; jury demand (6:94cv4015) (former employee)
May 25, 1993 Filing 470 ANSWER by Petro United Term to [428-1] third-party complaint; jury demand (6:94cv4015) (former employee)
May 25, 1993 Filing 472 ANSWER by Gordon-Sandifer Auto to [428-1] third-party complaint; jury demand (6:94cv4015) (former employee)
May 25, 1993 Filing 473 THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL memorandum by Guzzetta Oil Co in support of [410-1] motion for summary judgment (6:94cv4015) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
May 24, 1993 Filing 467 ANSWER to Complaint by Sermatech Intl (6:94cv4019) (former employee)
May 21, 1993 Filing 460 ANSWER by James River II Inc to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
May 21, 1993 Filing 461 MEMORANDUM by McDermott Inc in opposition to [446-1] motion to remand (6:94cv4015) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
May 21, 1993 Filing 462 MEMORANDUM by American Cyanamid in opposition to [446-1] motion to remand (6:94cv4015) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
May 21, 1993 Filing 463 MEMORANDUM by Defts Steering Cte in opposition to [446-1] motion to remand (6:94cv4015) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
May 21, 1993 Filing 464 MEMORANDUM by Gulf States Util Co in opposition to [446-1] motion to remand (6:94cv4015) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
May 21, 1993 Filing 465 ANSWER by Westinghouse Elec to amended complaint (6:94cv4015) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
May 21, 1993 Filing 466 ANSWER to Complaint by Dirt Inc, Lamar Allen Harrison, Dubose Waste Oil (6:94cv4020) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
May 20, 1993 Filing 454 ANSWER by Amerada Hess Corp to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
May 20, 1993 Filing 455 ANSWER by Browning-Ferris Chem to amended complaint (6:94cv4015) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
May 20, 1993 Filing 456 ANSWER by Stauffer Chemical to amended complaint (6:94cv4015) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
May 20, 1993 Filing 457 ANSWER by Texaco Inc to amended complaint (6:94cv4015) (former employee)
May 20, 1993 Filing 458 ANSWER by MS Power Co to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
May 20, 1993 Filing 459 ANSWER by Ashland Oil Inc to amended complaint (6:94cv4015) (former employee)
May 19, 1993 Filing 452 MOTION by C F Industries Inc for summary judgment based on prescription , and alternative to add additional defendants (All) X-FOLDER (former employee)
May 19, 1993 Filing 453 ANSWER by LA Power & Light Co to [418-1] cross claim (All) (former employee)
May 18, 1993 Filing 449 ANSWER by Cenac Towing to amended complaint (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
May 18, 1993 Filing 450 ANSWER by Acadian Shipyard Inc to amended complaint (6:94cv4017) (former employee)
May 18, 1993 Filing 451 ANSWER to Complaint by Akzo Coatings Inc (6:94cv4018) (former employee) Modified on 08/16/1994
May 15, 1993 Filing 471 ANSWER by Hy-Reach Equip Co to [428-1] third-party complaint; jury demand (6:94cv4015) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
May 13, 1993 Filing 448 ANSWER by Copolymer Rubber, Georgia Pacific Corp, Kaiser Alum & Chem, Transcontinental Gas, Triad Chemical, First MS Corp, MS Chem Corp, Union Carbide, Uniroyal Chem Co Inc to amended complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
May 10, 1993 Filing 447 MOTION by Frankie David, Sharon Alfred David to remand (6:94cv4016) (former employee)
May 7, 1993 Filing 445 ANSWER by Guzzetta Oil Co to amended complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
May 7, 1993 Filing 446 MOTION by Patsy H Gammons to remand (6:94cv4015) (former employee)
May 4, 1993 Filing 444 NOTICE by McDermott Inc of filing of Motions to Transfer w/MDL Panel (6:94cv4018 444-1, 6:94cv4019 444-2, 6:94cv4020 444-3) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
April 30, 1993 Filing 439 ANSWER by Mobil Oil Exp P SE, Mobil Corp, Mobil Oil Corp to amended complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
April 30, 1993 Filing 440 ANSWER by Monsanto Co to amended complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
April 30, 1993 Filing 441 ANSWER by Shell Western E & P to amended complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
April 30, 1993 Filing 442 ANSWER by Dow Chemical Co to amended complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
April 30, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER granting consolidation of cases (6:94cv4001 thru 4017) (Doc #443-1 thru 443-17) (former employee)
April 29, 1993 Filing 432 ANSWER by Evans Cooperage Co to amended complaint (All) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
April 29, 1993 Filing 433 COMPLAINT filed in USDC/SDMS #1:93cv205 (6:94cv4018) (former employee)
April 29, 1993 Filing 434 COMPLAINT filed in USDC/NDFL #93-30139 (6:94cv4019) (former employee)
April 29, 1993 Filing 435 COMPLAINT filed in USDC/SDAL #1:93-397 (6:94cv4020) (former employee)
April 29, 1993 Filing 436 ANSWER by Evans Cooperage Co to amended complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
April 29, 1993 Filing 437 ANSWER by Chevron Chemical Co to amended complaint; jury demand (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
April 29, 1993 Filing 438 ANSWER by Chevron U S A Inc to amended complaint; jury demand (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
April 28, 1993 Filing 429 MOTION w/brief by Pltfs Steering Cte to remand (All - Doc 429-1 thru 429-15) (former employee)
April 28, 1993 Filing 430 ANSWER by Avondale Ind Inc to amended complaint (6:94cv4001)) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
April 28, 1993 Filing 431 ANSWER by Amoco Chemical Co, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co to amended complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
April 20, 1993 Filing 428 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by McDermott Inc against East Baton Rouge City Parish Commission, et al (All - Doc #428-1 thru 428-17) (former employee)
April 16, 1993 Filing 427 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by McDermott Inc : amends [424-1] answer; jury demand (All - Doc #427-1 thru 427-17) (former employee) Modified on 08/03/1994
April 15, 1993 Filing 426 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by McDermott Inc against U S A (All - Doc #426-1 thru 426-17) (former employee)
April 13, 1993 Filing 424 ANSWER to Complaint; jury demand w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by McDermott Inc against American Cyanamid (All - Doc #424-1 thru 424-17) (former employee) Modified on 08/02/1994
April 13, 1993 Filing 425 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Cyanamid (All - Docs #425-1 thru 425-17) (former employee)
March 29, 1993 Filing 422 ANSWER to Complaint by Dubose Oil Prod Inc, United Fuel Oil Inc, Dubose Waste Oil Svc, and N & E Technical Svc Inc and Petroleum Recovery Svc Inc which are not found as defts (6:94cv4016) (former employee)
March 29, 1993 Filing 423 ANSWER by Dubose Oil Prod Inc, Earl G Dubose, Dubose Waste Oil Svc and Dubose Trucking Co Inc, N & E Technical Svcs Inc & Petroleum Recovery Svc Inc not found as defts to [418-1] cross claim (former employee)
March 25, 1993 Filing 421 ANSWER by Frenchys Oil Salvage to [418-1] cross claim (former employee)
March 15, 1993 Filing 420 SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL memorandum by Guzzetta Oil Co in support of [410-1] motion for summary judgment (All) (former employee)
March 8, 1993 Filing 417 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT to MASTER PETITION by Pltfs Steering Cte , amending [1-1] complaint, [2-1] complaint, [3-1] complaint, [13-1] complaint, [21-1] complaint, [55-1] complaint, [56-1] complaint, [57-1] complaint, [85-1] complaint, [94-1] complaint, [100-1] complaint, [118-1] complaint, [129-1] complaint, [362-1] complaint, [415-1] complaint substituting C F Industries in place of First Nitrogen Corp, adding Tennessee Gas Pipeline Co and Chevron Chemical Co as defendants (former employee) Modified on 08/02/1994
March 8, 1993 Filing 418 ANSWER by H Arthur Gammons to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
March 8, 1993 Filing 419 COMPLAINT filed in 21JDC/#68,348-B 6:94cv4017 (former employee)
March 4, 1993 Filing 416 SUPPLEMENTAL memorandum by Pltfs Steering Cte in opposition to [410-1] motion for summary judgment (All) (former employee)
February 16, 1993 Filing 415 COMPLAINT filed; jury demand in 21JDC/#68,067-B (6:94cv4016) (former employee)
January 25, 1993 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER granting plaintiff's motion for dismissal of Daniell Battery Mfg Co Inc, George Engine Co Inc, A C Smiley Jr, Bausch & Comb Inc, Plantation Pipe Line Co, Paul M Davidson/Davidson Transport Inc, Ashland Chemical Inc, Chemfax Inc, Apex Oil Co, S C R Investment Co and G A T X Corp (All) (former employee)
January 15, 1993 Filing 413 SUPPLEMENTAL memorandum by Guzzetta Oil Co in support of [410-1] motion for summary judgment (All) (former employee)
January 14, 1993 Filing 412 NOTICE by P & W Industries Inc of automatic stay (All) (former employee)
November 24, 1992 Filing 411 MOTION by Dale Polk & Son Inc for summary judgment (All) (former employee)
November 11, 1992 Filing 410 MOTION by Guzzetta Oil Co for summary judgment (All) (former employee)
April 24, 1992 Filing 408 ANSWER by Mackenzie Chem LA to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
April 24, 1992 Filing 409 ANSWER to amended complaint by A C Smiley (All) (former employee) Modified on 08/01/1994
April 20, 1992 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER dismissing all third-party demands brought by third-party plaintiffs, and the cross-claim brought by third-party defendant U S Fidelity & Guaranty Co (All) (former employee) Modified on 09/02/1994
April 20, 1992 Filing 407 LETTER 3rd JDC, Salt Lake County, Utah advising liquidation proceedings against Southern American Insurance Co - no party by that name at this point (former employee)
April 1, 1992 Filing 405 JUDGMENT OF APPEALS COURT Re: certification of class (former employee)
March 19, 1992 Filing 404 MOTION by Delta Commodities to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
March 17, 1992 Filing 403 MOTION by Laidlaw Env Svc Rec to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
February 20, 1992 Filing 402 ANSWER by Younger Brothers Inc to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
February 19, 1992 Filing 401 MOTION by Chromalloy American to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
February 18, 1992 Filing 400 MOTION by First MS Corp, MS Chem Corp to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions, no cause of action, vagueness and ambiguity (All) (former employee)
February 17, 1992 Filing 399 MOTION by Borden Chemical Co to dismiss bsed on prematurity and vagueness and lis pendens (All) (former employee)
February 14, 1992 Filing 397 MOTION by Ashland Oil Inc to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
February 14, 1992 Filing 398 MOTION by Ralston Purina Co to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
February 11, 1992 Filing 396 MOTION by Cenac Towing Co Inc to dismiss based on no cause/right of action, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
February 10, 1992 Filing 395 ANSWER by Meason Operating Co to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
February 7, 1992 Filing 393 MOTION by Chevron U S A Inc to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
February 7, 1992 Filing 394 MOTION by James River II Inc to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
February 6, 1992 Filing 391 ANSWER to Complaint by P M A G Products Inc (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
February 6, 1992 Filing 392 MOTION by Tenneco Inc to dismiss based on insufficiency of service of process and lack of personal jurisdiction (All) (former employee)
February 5, 1992 Filing 390 MOTION by Copolymer Rubber, Georgia Pacific Corp, Kaiser Alum & Chem, Transcontinental Gas, Uniroyal Chem Co Inc, Union Carbide Chem to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) referred to (former employee)
February 3, 1992 Filing 384 MOTION by Bausch & Lomb Inc to dismiss on basis of prematurity, improper cumulation of actions, and vagueness (All) (former employee)
February 3, 1992 Filing 385 MOTION by MS Power & Light to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
February 3, 1992 Filing 386 MOTION by Browning-Ferris Chem to dismiss based on prematurity, imporper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
February 3, 1992 Filing 387 MOTION by Rhone Poulenc Basic formerly Stauffer Chemical Co to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee) Modified on 08/01/1994
February 3, 1992 Filing 388 MOTION by Ethyl Corp, Ingalls Shipbuilding to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
February 3, 1992 Filing 389 MOTION by Amerada Hess Corp to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
January 28, 1992 Filing 383 MOTION by B A S F Corp, Ciba-Geigy Corp, Exxon Corp, Hoechst Celanese, Mobil Exp & Prod SE, Monsanto Co, Reichhold Chem Inc, Shell Western E & P to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
January 27, 1992 Filing 382 MOTION by First Nitrogen Corp to dismiss on basis of prematurity, lack of procedural capacity, lack of capacity to be sued and no right of action (All) (former employee)
January 23, 1992 Filing 381 MOTION by Chemfax Inc to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (All) (former employee)
January 21, 1992 Filing 380 MOTION by Evans Cooperage Co to dismiss on basis of prematurity, impropero cumulation of actions and vagueness (All) (former employee)
January 16, 1992 Filing 379 MOTION by Texaco Inc to dismiss on basis of prematurity, improper cumulation of actions, and vagueness (All) (former employee)
January 14, 1992 Filing 376 MOTION by Amoco Oil Co, Avondale Ind Inc, Dow Chemical Co, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co, Ingalls Shipbuilding, Matlack Inc, McDermott Inc, Mobil Oil Corp, Southern Scrap Mat, Triad Chemical, Westinghouse Elec to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions, and vagueness (All) (former employee)
January 14, 1992 Filing 377 ANSWER by LA Power & Light Co to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
January 14, 1992 Filing 378 ANSWER by Daniell Battery Mfg to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
January 8, 1992 Filing 375 ANSWER by Cooper Gilder to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
January 2, 1992 Filing 374 ANSWER by Earl G Dubose, Dubose Oil Prod Inc, United Fuel Oil Inc, Dubose Waste Oil (and unnamed defendants N & E Technical Service Inc and Petroleum Recovery Service Inc) to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
January 1, 1992 Filing 373 MOTION by Amoco Oil Co, Avondale Ind Inc, Dow Chemical Co, Gulf States Util Co, Matlack Inc, McDermott Inc, Mobil Oil Corp, Southern Scrap Mat, Triad Chemical, Westinghouse Elec to dismiss based on prematurity, improper cumulation of actions, and vagueness (All) (former employee)
December 20, 1991 Filing 372 MOTION by Pltfs Steering Cte to strike portions of [370-1] answer (All) (former employee)
December 18, 1991 Filing 371 ANSWER to Complaint by Frenchies Oil Salv (All) (former employee)
December 12, 1991 Filing 370 ANSWER by Guzzetta Oil Co to amended complaint (All) (former employee)
November 14, 1991 Filing 368 MOTION by Evans Cooperage Co to dismiss , or to stay (6:94cv4015) (former employee)
November 12, 1991 Filing 369 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Pltfs Steering Cte , amending [1-1] complaint, [2-1] complaint, [3-1] complaint, [13-1] complaint, [21-1] complaint, [55-1] complaint, [56-1] complaint, [57-1] complaint, [85-1] complaint, [94-1] complaint, [100-1] complaint, [118-1] complaint, [129-1] complaint, [362-1] complaint (All) (former employee) Modified on 07/30/1994
November 8, 1991 Filing 367 MOTION by Borden Chemical Co to dismiss , or to stay (6:94cv4015) (former employee) Modified on 07/30/1994
October 16, 1991 Filing 366 ANSWER to Complaint by James River II Inc (6:94cv4015) (former employee)
October 14, 1991 Filing 365 ANSWER to Complaint by Frenchies Oil Salv (6:94cv4015) (former employee)
October 8, 1991 Filing 363 ANSWER to Complaint by LA Power & Light Co (6:94cv4015) (former employee)
October 8, 1991 Filing 364 INTERVENOR'S COMPLAINT by LA Dept of Health & Hospitals against All Plaintiffs and All Defendants in 6:94cv4015 (former employee)
September 17, 1991 Filing 362 COMPLAINT filed in 21JDC/#50,212-B (6:94cv4015) (former employee) Modified on 07/30/1994
May 16, 1991 Filing 361 ANSWER to Complaint by Pacific Molasses Co (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
May 6, 1991 Filing 360 MOTION by Pacific Molasses Co to dismiss for failure to comply w/court orders (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
April 4, 1991 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER certifying class action (all) (former employee)
March 25, 1991 Filing 358 MOTION by Cigna Insurance Co for summary judgment (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
February 11, 1991 Filing 357 ANSWER to Complaint by Hoechst Celanese (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
February 7, 1991 Filing 356 ANSWER to Complaint by Dubose Oil Prod Inc, Earl G Dubose (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
January 29, 1991 Filing 355 MOTION by Dale Polk & Son Inc for summary judgment as to asserting mover is not a "responsible party" as defined by La.R.S. 30:2273 (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
January 22, 1991 Filing 354 MOTION by James River II Inc to dismiss for failure to comply w/court order (6:94cv4010 305-1, 6:94cv4012 305-2, 6:94cv4013 305-3, 6:94cv4014 305-4) (former employee)
January 11, 1991 Filing 352 ANSWER to Complaint by Union Carbide Chem (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
January 11, 1991 Filing 353 ANSWER to Complaint by Kaiser Alum & Chem (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
December 28, 1990 Filing 350 ANSWER by Travelers Ins Co to [264-2] and [242-2] third-party complaints (6:94cv4001, 4006) (former employee)
December 28, 1990 Filing 351 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [264-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
December 19, 1990 Filing 349 ANSWER to Complaint by Westinghouse Elec (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
December 3, 1990 Filing 348 ANSWER by Cigna Insurance Co as successor to I N A Underwriters Insurance Co to [101-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001, 4002) (former employee)
October 18, 1990 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER appointing steering committees (former employee)
October 11, 1990 Filing 346 ANSWER by Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co to [264-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
October 5, 1990 Filing 345 ANSWER to Complaint by Mid-State Paving Co (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
September 28, 1990 Filing 344 ANSWER to Complaint by Guzzetta Oil Co (6:94cv4004 344-1, 6:94cv4005 344-2, 6:94cv4010 344-3, 6:94cv4012 344-4, 6:94cv4013 344-5, 6:94cv4014 344-6) (former employee)
September 27, 1990 Filing 343 ANSWER to Complaint by Ralston Purina Co (6:94cv4002 343-1, 6:94cv4004 343-2, 6:94cv4005 343-3, 6:94cv4006 343-4, 6:94cv4010 343-5, 6:94cv4012 343-6, 6:94cv4013 343-7, 6:94cv4014 343-8) (former employee)
September 6, 1990 Filing 342 ANSWER to Complaint by Cooper Gilder Chem (6:94cv4004 342-1, 6:94cv4005 342-2, 6:94cv4006 342-3, 6:94cv4010 342-4, 6:94cv4012 342-5, 6:94cv4013 342-6) (former employee)
August 29, 1990 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of Forrest T Carr as plaintiff in 6:94cv4006 (former employee)
August 29, 1990 Filing 339 ANSWER to Complaint by Dale Polk & Son Inc (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
August 29, 1990 Filing 340 ANSWER to Complaint by Pacific Molasses Co (6:94cv4004, 4005, 4010, 4012, 4013, 4014) (former employee)
August 29, 1990 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of Russell Curtis as plaintiff in 6:94cv4006 (former employee)
August 7, 1990 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of Livingston Parish Police Jury as defendant in 6:94cv4006 (former employee)
August 1, 1990 Filing 336 ANSWER to Complaint by United Fuel Oil Inc, Dubose Oil Prod Inc (6:94cv4004 336-1-1, 6:94cv4005 336-2, 6:94cv4010 336-3, 6:94cv4012 336-4, 6:94cv4013 336-5, 6:94cv4014 336-6) (former employee)
July 30, 1990 Filing 334 ANSWER by Ranger Insurance Co to [287-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
July 29, 1990 Filing 335 ANSWER to Complaint by Pacific Molasses Co (6:94cv4004, 4005, 4010, 4012, 4013, 4014) (former employee)
July 27, 1990 Filing 333 ANSWER by James E Davidson to third-party complaint (do not find this party named any any third-party complaint) (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
July 26, 1990 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of Livingston Parish Police Jury (6:94cv4004, 4005, 4010, 4012, 4013, 4014) (former employee)
July 23, 1990 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of Livingston Parish Police Jury (6:94cv4003) (former employee)
July 20, 1990 Filing 329 ANSWER to Complaint by Dale Polk & Son Inc; jury demand (6:94cv4004 329-1, 6:94cv4005 329-2, 6:94cv4010 329-3, 6:94cv4012 329-4, 6:94cv4013 329-5, 6:94cv4014 329-6) (former employee) Modified on 08/02/1994
July 19, 1990 Filing 330 ANSWER by LA Ins Guar Assn to [287-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 306 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Mobil Exp & Prod SE : amends [88-1] answer (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 307 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Exxon Corp : amends [38-1] answer (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 308 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Exxon Corp (no original answer found) (6:94cv4005) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 309 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Reichhold Chem Inc : amends [12-1] answer (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 310 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Reichhold Chem Inc (original answer not found) (6:94cv4005) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 311 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Reichhold Chem Inc : amends [89-1] answer (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 312 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Reichhold Chem Inc (no original answer found) (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 313 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Reichhold Chem Inc : amends [123-1] answer (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 314 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Reichhold Chem Inc : amends [133-1] answer (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 315 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Shell Western E & P : amends [44-1] answer (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 316 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Shell Western E & P (no original answer found - but may relate to Doc #269) (6:94cv4005) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 317 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Shell Western E & P (no original answer found but may relate to Doc #269) (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 318 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Shell Western E & P : amends [105-1] answer (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 319 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Shell Western E & P : amends [126-1] answer (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 320 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Shell Western E & P (no original answer found but may relate to Doc #269) (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 321 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Ciba-Geigy Corp : amends [10-1] answer (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 322 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Ciba-Geigy Corp (no original answer found - may relate to Doc #270) (6:94cv4005)(former employee) Modified on 07/29/1994
July 13, 1990 Filing 323 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Ciba-Geigy Corp (no original answer found - may relate to Doc #270) (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 324 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Ciba-Geigy Corp : amends [105-1] answer (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 325 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Ciba-Geigy Corp : amends [124-1] answer (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 326 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Ciba-Geigy Corp : amends [134-1] answer (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 327 SERVICE INFORMATION (all) (former employee)
July 13, 1990 Filing 328 MOTION by Meason Operating Co to dismiss for lack of service of process (6:94cv4004, 4005, 4010, 4012, 4013, 4014) (former employee)
July 12, 1990 Filing 297 ANSWER to Complaint by B A S F Corp (6:94cv4010 297-1, 5:94cv4012 297-2, 6:94cv4013 297-3, 6:94cv4014 297-4) (former employee)
July 12, 1990 Filing 298 ANSWER to Complaint by Exxon Corp (6:94cv4010 298-1, 6:94cv4012 298-2, 6:94cv4013 298-3, 6:94cv4014 298-4) (former employee)
July 12, 1990 Filing 299 ANSWER to Complaint by Monsanto Co (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
July 12, 1990 Filing 300 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Mobil Exp & Prod SE : amends [46-1] answer (6:94cv4004) (former employee) Modified on 07/29/1994
July 12, 1990 Filing 301 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Mobil Exp & Prod SE (6:94cv4005) (former employee)
July 12, 1990 Filing 302 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Mobil Exp & Prod SE : amends [105-1] answer (6:94cv4012) (former employee) Modified on 07/29/1994
July 12, 1990 Filing 303 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Mobil Exp & Prod SE : amends [125-1] answer (6:94CV4013) (former employee) Modified on 07/29/1994
July 12, 1990 Filing 304 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Mobil Exp & Prod SE : amends [135-1] answer (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
July 12, 1990 Filing 305 MOTION by Dow Chemical Co to require plaintiffs to amend petitions (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
July 10, 1990 Filing 294 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by T L James & Co Inc : amends [253-1] answer (6:94cv4004 294-1, 6:94cv4005 294-2, 6:94cv4010 294-3, 6:94cv4012 294-4, 6:94cv4013 294-5, 6:94cv4014 294-6) (former employee) Modified on 07/28/1994
July 10, 1990 Filing 295 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by B A S F Corp : amends [253-1] answer (6:94cv4004 295-1, 6:94cv4005 295-2, 6:94cv4010 295-3) (former employee)
July 10, 1990 Filing 296 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by LA Paving Co Inc : amends [253-1] answer (6:94cv4004 296-1, 6:94cv4005 296-2, 6:94cv4010 296-3, 6:94cv4012 296-4, 6:94cv4013 296-5, 6:94cv4014 296-6) (former employee)
July 9, 1990 Filing 291 ANSWER to Complaint by Plantation Pipe Co (6:94cv4004 291-1, 6:94cv4005 291-2, 6:94cv4010 291-3, 6:94cv4012 291-4, 6:94cv4013 291-5, 6:94cv4014 291-6) (former employee)
July 9, 1990 Filing 292 ANSWER to Complaint by Monsanto Co (6:94cv4004 292-1, 6:94cv4005 292-2, 6:94cv4012 292-3, 6:94cv4013 292-4, 6:94cv4014 292-5) (former employee)
July 9, 1990 Filing 293 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by T L James & Co Inc : amends [253-1] answer (6:94cv4004 293-1, 6:94cv4005 293-2, 6:94cv4010 293-3, 6:94cv4013 293-4) (former employee) Modified on 07/28/1994
July 6, 1990 Filing 288 ANSWER to Complaint by George Engine Co Inc (6:94cv4004 288-1, 6:94cv4005 288-2, 6:94cv4010 288-3, 6:94cv4012 288-4, 6:94cv4013 288-5, 6:94cv4014 288-6) (former employee)
July 6, 1990 Filing 289 ANSWER by U S F & G Ins Co to [287-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
July 6, 1990 Filing 290 ANSWER to Complaint by G S X Recovery Systems Inc f/k/a Hansborough Energy Systems Co, a/k/a Hesco Corp a/k/a Frenchys Oil Hansborough Energy Systems (6:94cv4006 290-1, 6:94cv4010 290-2, 6:94cv4012 290-3, 6:94cv4013 290-4, 6:94cv4014 290-5) (former employee)
July 3, 1990 Filing 287 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by McDermott Inc against Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G Ins Co, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co, LA Ins Guar Assn, Combustion Inc (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
June 26, 1990 Filing 286 MOTION by James River II Inc to dismiss for failure to comply w/court order (former employee)
June 25, 1990 Filing 285 ANSWER to Complaint by Ingalls Shipbuilding (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
June 22, 1990 Filing 283 ANSWER to Complaint by LA Power & Light Co (6:94cv4004 283-1, 6:94cv4005 283-2, 6:94cv4010 283-3, 6:94cv4012 283-5, 6:94cv4013 283-6, 6:94cv4014 283-7) (former employee)
June 22, 1990 Filing 284 ANSWER to Complaint by Ingalls Shipbuilding (6:94CV4012) (former employee)
June 21, 1990 Filing 282 ANSWER to Complaint by Bausch & Lomb Inc (6:94cv4004 282-1, 6:94cv4005 282-2, 6:94cv4010 282-3, 6:94cv4012 282-4, 6:94cv4013 282-5, 6:94cv4014 282-6) (former employee)
June 20, 1990 Filing 276 ANSWER to Complaint by Bausch & Lomb Inc (6:94cv4004 276-1, 6:94cv4005 276-2, 6:94cv4014 276-3) (former employee) Modified on 07/27/1994
June 20, 1990 Filing 277 ANSWER to Complaint by LA Power & Light Co (6:94cv4004 277-1, 6:94cv4005 277-2, 6:94cv4014 277-3) (former employee) Modified on 07/27/1994
June 20, 1990 Filing 278 ANSWER to Complaint by Ingalls Shipbuilding (6:94cv4004 278-1, 6:94cv4005 278-2, 6:94cv4010 278-3, 6:94cv4023 278-4, 6:94cv4013 278-5, 6:94cv4014 278-6) (former employee) Modified on 07/27/1994
June 20, 1990 Filing 279 ANSWER to Complaint by Kaiser Alum & Chem (6:94cv4010 279-1, 6:94cv4012 279-2, 6:94cv4013 279-3, 6:94cv4014 279-4) (former employee)
June 20, 1990 Filing 280 ANSWER to Complaint by Transcontinental Gas (6:94cv4010 280-1, 6:94cv4012 280-2, 6:94cv4013 280-3, 6:94cv4014 280-4) (former employee)
June 20, 1990 Filing 281 ANSWER to Complaint by Uniroyal Chem Co Inc (6:94cv4010 281-1, 6:94cv4012 281-2, 6:94cv4013 281-3, 6:94cv40140 281-4) (former employee)
June 11, 1990 Filing 275 ANSWER by Ranger Insurance Co to [264-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
June 7, 1990 Filing 274 ANSWER by I N A Und Ins Co to [101-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001, 4002) (former employee)
May 30, 1990 Filing 273 JUDGMENT OF STATE COURT OF APPEAL Re: [194-1] appeal; trial court's dismissal of all actions against U S defendants on the basis that it lacked subject matter jurisdiction to adjudicate the claims is AFFIRMED (former employee)
May 24, 1990 Filing 268 ANSWER to Complaint by Ingalls Shipbuilding (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
May 24, 1990 Filing 269 ANSWER to Complaint by B A S F Corp (269-1), Exxon Corp (269-2), Monsanto Co (269-3), Mobil Oil Exp P SE (269-4), Plantation Pipe Co (269-5), Shell Western E & P (269-6), T L James & Co Inc (269-7) (6:94cv4001) (former employee) Modified on 07/29/1994
May 24, 1990 Filing 270 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Ciba-Geigy Corp : amends [10-1] answer (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
May 24, 1990 Filing 271 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by LA Paving Co Inc : amends [11-1] answer (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
May 24, 1990 Filing 272 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Reichhold Chem Inc : amends [12-1] answer (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
May 15, 1990 Filing 265 MOTION by Exxon Corp, Monsanto Co, Plantation Pipe Co, B A S F Corp, Shell Western E & P, Mobil Exp & Prod SE to dismiss (6:94cv4001 thru 4014) (former employee)
May 15, 1990 Filing 266 ANSWER by U S F & G Ins Co to [242-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
May 15, 1990 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER dismissing defendant, Livingston Parish Police Jury (6:94cv4002) (former employee)
May 2, 1990 Filing 263 ANSWER to Complaint by Acadian Shipyard Inc (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
May 2, 1990 Filing 264 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by McDermott Inc against Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G Ins Co, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co, LA Ins Guar Assn, Combustion Inc (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
April 30, 1990 Filing 261 ANSWER to Complaint by Apex Co (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
April 30, 1990 Filing 262 ANSWER to Complaint by Westinghouse Elec (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
April 27, 1990 Filing 260 ANSWER by LA Ins Guar Assn to [242-2] third-party complaint; jury demand (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
April 25, 1990 Filing 258 ANSWER to Complaint by Westinghouse Elec (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
April 25, 1990 Filing 259 ANSWER to Complaint by Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Chem (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
April 24, 1990 Filing 256 MOTION by Dow Chemical Co for order directing plaintiffs to amend petition (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
April 24, 1990 Filing 257 ANSWER to Complaint by Chemfax (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
April 23, 1990 Filing 255 ANSWER to Complaint by Cooper Gilder Chem (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
April 20, 1990 Filing 254 ANSWER to Complaint by Evans Cooperage Co (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
April 16, 1990 Filing 253 ANSWER to Complaint by T L James & Co Inc (253-1), LA Paving (253-2), Mobil Expl & Prod S E (253-3), Exxon Corp (253-4), B A S F Corp (253-5), Reichhold Chem Inc (253-6), Shell Western E & P (253-7), Monsanto Co (253-8), Ciba-Geigy (253-9), Plantation Pipe Co (253-10) (6:94cv4001 thru 4014) (former employee) Modified on 07/28/1994
April 11, 1990 Filing 251 ANSWER to Complaint by LA Power & Light Co (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
April 11, 1990 Filing 252 ANSWER to Complaint by Guzzetta Oil Co (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
April 9, 1990 Filing 246 ANSWER by Cigna Insurance Co (as successor to INA Underwriters Ins Co) to [16-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004) (former employee)
April 9, 1990 Filing 247 ANSWER by Cigna Insurance Co (as successor to I N A Underwirters Ins Co) to [15-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004) (former employee)
April 9, 1990 Filing 248 ANSWER by Cigna Insurance Co (as successor to I N A Underwriters Ins Co) to [22-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001, 4002) (former employee)
April 9, 1990 Filing 249 ANSWER by Cigna Insurance Co (as successor to I N A Underwriters Ins Co) to [30-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
April 9, 1990 Filing 250 ANSWER by Cigna Insurance Co (as successor to I N A Underwriters Ins Co) to [43-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
April 5, 1990 Filing 245 ANSWER to Complaint by Stauffer Chemical (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
April 2, 1990 Filing 244 ANSWER to Complaint by Castay Inc (244-1), Dale Polk & Son Inc (244-2) (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
March 22, 1990 Filing 243 ANSWER to Complaint by G S X Recovery Sysems Inc (formerly Hesco Corp) (former employee)
March 21, 1990 Filing 242 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by McDermott Inc against Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G, Home Indemnity Co, Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co, LA Ins Guar Assn, Combustion Inc (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
March 19, 1990 Filing 239 MOTION by Dow Chemical Co for order directing plaintiffs to amend complaints (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
March 19, 1990 Filing 240 ANSWERS to Complaint by Copolymer Rubber (240-1), Georgia Pacific Corp (240-2), Kaiser Alum & Chem (240-3), Transcontinental Gas (240-4), Triad Chemical (240-5), Union Carbide (240-6), Uniroyal Chem Co Inc (240-7) (former employee)
March 19, 1990 Filing 241 ANSWER to Complaint by Southern Scrap Material Co Ltd (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
March 7, 1990 Filing 238 ANSWER to Complaint by Meason Operating Co (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
October 18, 1989 Filing 237 MOTION by Dale Polk & Son Inc for summary judgment in that mover is not liable as a "responsible party" as defined by La.R.S. 30:2273 (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004, 4005) (former employee) Modified on 07/26/1994
October 12, 1989 Filing 229 ANSWER by Ranger Insurance Co to amended third-party complaint: [18-2] third-party complaint, [159-2] third-party complaint, [161-1] third-party complaint, [162-1] third-party complaint, [163-1] third-party complaint, [164-1] third-party complaint, [165-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004, 4006, 4007, 4008, 4009, 4010, 4011, 4012, 4013, 4014) (former employee)
October 12, 1989 Filing 228 ANSWER by Ranger Insurance Co to [18-2] third-party complaint, [159-2] third-party complaint, [161-1] third-party complaint, [162-1] third-party complaint, [163-1] third-party complaint, [164-1] third-party complaint, [165-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004, 4005, 4006, 4008, 4009, 4010, 4011, 4012, 4013, 4014) (former employee)
October 12, 1989 Filing 230 ANSWER to [15-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004) (former employee)
October 12, 1989 Filing 231 ANSWER by Ranger Insurance Co to [16-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004) (former employee)
October 12, 1989 Filing 232 ANSWER by Ranger Insurance Co, Ranger Insurance Co, Ranger Insurance Co to [91-2] third-party complaint, [67-2] third-party complaint, [64-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004, 4009, 4010) (former employee)
October 12, 1989 Filing 233 ANSWER by Ranger Insurance Co, Ranger Insurance Co to [63-2] third-party complaint, [89-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4008, 4009, 4010) (former employee)
October 12, 1989 Filing 234 ANSWER by Ranger Insurance Co to [66-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4008, 4009) (former employee)
October 12, 1989 Filing 235 ANSWER by Ranger Insurance Co, Ranger Insurance Co, Ranger Insurance Co to [65-2] third-party complaint, [68-2] third-party complaint, [88-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4008, 4009, 4010) (former employee)
October 12, 1989 Filing 236 ANSWER by Ranger Insurance Co to [90-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
September 11, 1989 Filing 221 ANSWER by LA Ins Guar Assn to [167-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4005) (former employee)
September 11, 1989 Filing 222 ANSWER by LA Ins Guar Assn to [159-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4006 222-1; 6:94cv4011 222-2) (former employee)
September 11, 1989 Filing 223 ANSWER by LA Ins Guar Assn to [161-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4008 223-1; 6:94cv4009 223-2) (former employee)
September 11, 1989 Filing 224 ANSWER by LA Ins Guar Assn to [162-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
September 11, 1989 Filing 225 ANSWER by LA Ins Guar Assn to [163-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
September 11, 1989 Filing 226 ANSWER by LA Ins Guar Assn to [164-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
September 11, 1989 Filing 227 ANSWER by LA Ins Guar Assn to [165-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
September 7, 1989 Filing 219 ANSWER by Travelers Indemnity Co (incorrectly sued as Travelers Ins Co) to [18-2] third-party complaint as amended (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004) (former employee) Modified on 07/25/1994
August 11, 1989 Filing 220 ANSWER by LA Ins Guar Assn to [18-2] third-party complaint as amended (6:94cv4001 220-1; 6:94cv2002 220-2; 6:94cv2003 220-3; 6:94cv2004 220-4) (former employee)
July 19, 1989 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of Mississippi Power & Light Co (6:94cv4002) (former employee)
July 11, 1989 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of Mississippi Power & Light Co (6:94cv4008) (former employee)
July 5, 1989 Filing 216 MEMORANDUM by Georgia Pacific Corp in opposition to [202-1] motion for summary judgment ag/third-party complaint of Georgia-Pacific Corp (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4005, 4003, 4004) (former employee)
June 27, 1989 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of Mississippi Power & Light Co (6:94cv4003) (former employee)
May 1, 1989 Filing 213 ANSWER by Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co to [18-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
May 1, 1989 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of Mississippi Power & Light Co (6:94cv4005) (former employee)
April 28, 1989 Filing 205 ANSWER by Home Insurance Co, Home Indem Ins to [18-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4002 205-1; 6:94cv4003 205-2; 6:94cv4004 205-3) (former employee) Modified on 08/11/1994
April 28, 1989 Filing 206 ANSWER by Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co to [167-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4005) (former employee)
April 28, 1989 Filing 207 ANSWER by Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co to [159-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4006 207-1; 6:94cv4011 207-2) (former employee)
April 28, 1989 Filing 208 ANSWER by Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co to [161-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4008 208-1; 6:94cv4009 208-2) (former employee)
April 28, 1989 Filing 209 ANSWER by Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co to [162-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
April 28, 1989 Filing 210 ANSWER by Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co to [163-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
April 28, 1989 Filing 211 ANSWER by Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co to [164-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
April 28, 1989 Filing 212 ANSWER by Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co to [165-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
April 25, 1989 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of Mississippi Power & Light Co (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
April 10, 1989 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER dismissing third-party claims of Cenac Towing Co ag/Ernest J Yancey and Larke Watkins Yancey (there is no third-party demand by Cenac Towing Co ag/these parties in record) (former employee)
April 7, 1989 Filing 202 MOTION by I N A Und Ins Co, Insurance Co of N Am for summary judgment ag/third-party complaint of Georgia-Pacific Corp (6:94cv4001 202-1; 6:94cv4002 202-2; 6:94cv4004 202-3; 6:94cv4005 202-4) (former employee) Modified on 07/25/1994
February 22, 1989 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of Mississippi Power & Light Co (6:94cv4001, 4006, 4009) (former employee)
February 7, 1989 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER of remand to 21JDC (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004, 4005, 4006, 4008, 4009, 4010, 4011, 4012, 4013) (former employee)
February 3, 1989 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER of consolidation (6:94cv4004, 4005, 4006, 4008, 4009, 4012, 4014) (former employee)
January 26, 1989 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting voluntary dismissal of Mississippi Power & Light Co (6:94cv4004 198-1; 6:94cv4005 198-2; 6:94cv4010 198-3; 6:94cv4012 198-4; 6:94cv4013 198-5; 6:94cv4014 198-6) (former employee)
January 4, 1989 Filing 195 ANSWER by U S F & G to amended third-party complaint: [167-1] third-party complaint (former employee)
January 4, 1989 Filing 196 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Reichhold Chem Inc against U S A (6:94cv4006 196-1; 6:94cv4011 196-2) (former employee)
January 4, 1989 Filing 197 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by LA Paving Co Inc, T L James & Co Inc against U S A (6:94cv4011) (former employee)
December 28, 1988 Filing 194 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Chem, Copolymer Rubber, Georgia Pacific Corp, Triad Chemical, Kaiser Alum & Chem, Transcontinental Gas, Union Carbide, Uniroyal Chem Co Inc, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co, Borden Chemical Co, Amoco Chemical Co, Reichhold Chem Inc, T L James & Co Inc, LA Paving Co Inc, Southern Scrap Mat, Stauffer Chemical, Evans Cooperage Co from [153-1] judgment order. (former employee)
December 22, 1988 Filing 187 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to second/amend to [167-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4005) (former employee)
December 22, 1988 Filing 188 ANSWER by U S F & G to second suppl/amend to [18-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001 188-1; 6:94cv4002 188-2; 6:94cv4003 188-3) (former employee) Modified on 07/22/1994
December 22, 1988 Filing 189 ANSWER by U S F & G to [162-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
December 22, 1988 Filing 190 ANSWER by U S F & G to [159-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4011) (former employee)
December 22, 1988 Filing 191 ANSWER by U S F & G to [163-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
December 22, 1988 Filing 192 ANSWER by U S F & G to [165-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
December 22, 1988 Filing 193 ANSWER by U S F & G to amended third-party complaint: [18-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 173 ANSWER by U S F & G to [159-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 174 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to first suppl/amend to [18-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 175 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to second suppl/amend to [18-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001 175-1; 6:94cv4002 175-2; 6:94cv4003 175-3) (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 176 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [159-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4006 176-1; 6:94cv4011 176-2) (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 177 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [161-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4008) (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 178 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [162-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 179 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [163-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 180 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [164-1] third-party complaint (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 181 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co referring to Third-Party Complaint by Ciba-Geigy Corp of which there is none filed in 6:94cv4010 (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 182 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [91-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 183 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [90-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 184 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [88-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 185 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [89-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
December 21, 1988 Filing 186 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Borden Chemical Co, Gulf States Util Co, Ethyl Corp, Amoco Chemical Co against U S A (6:94cv4006 186-1; 6:94cv4011 186-2) (former employee)
December 5, 1988 Filing 172 MOTION by Evans Cooperage Co for appeal from order rescinding leave to file third-party demands ag/USA (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
November 30, 1988 Filing 171 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Stonewall Ins Co, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co, U S F & G, Combustion Inc, LA Ins Guar Assn (6:94cv4001 (171-1; 6:94cv4002 171-2; 6:94cv4003 171-3; 6:94cv4004 171-4; 6:94cv4005 171-5; 6:94cv4006 171-6; 6:94cv4008 171-7; 6:94cv4008 171-7; 6:94cv4010 171-8; 6:94cv4011 171-9; 6:94cv4012 171-10; 6:94cv4013 171-11) (former employee)
November 28, 1988 Filing 170 MOTION by Stauffer Chemical for appeal from judgment dismissing third-party demands ag/USA (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
November 18, 1988 Filing 169 MOTION by Southern Scrap Mat for appeal from judgment denying leave to assert third-party demands ag/USA (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
November 11, 1988 Filing 168 MOTION by Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Chem, Copolymer Rubber, Georgia Pacific Corp, Triad Chemical, Kaiser Alum & Chem, Transcontinental Gas, Union Carbide, Uniroyal Chem Co Inc, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co, Borden Chemical Co, Amoco Chemical Co, Reichhold Chem Inc, T L James & Co Inc, LA Paving Co Inc for appeal from judgment dismissing third-party claims (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004, 4005, 4007, 4008, 4009, 4010, 4012, 4013, 4014) (former employee)
October 31, 1988 Filing 159 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Avondale Ind Inc against Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G, Home Indemnity Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co (6:94cv4006 159-1, 6:94cv4011 159-2) (former employee)
October 31, 1988 Filing 160 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale Ind Inc: amends [18-1] answer (6:94cv4004) (former employee) Modified on 07/21/1994
October 31, 1988 Filing 161 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale Ind Inc: amends [117-1] answer (6:94cv4008 161-1; 6:94cv4009 161-2) (former employee) Modified on 07/21/1994
October 31, 1988 Filing 162 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale Ind Inc : amends [87-1] answer (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
October 31, 1988 Filing 163 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale Ind Inc : amends [103-1] answer (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
October 31, 1988 Filing 164 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale Ind Inc : amends [121-1] answer (6:94cv4013) (former employee) Modified on 07/26/1994
October 31, 1988 Filing 165 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale Ind Inc : amends [131-1] answer (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
October 31, 1988 Filing 166 SECOND AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Avondale Ind Inc adding LA Ins Guar Assn: amends [18-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001 166-1; 6:94cv4002 166-2; 6:94cv4003 166-3) (former employee)
October 31, 1988 Filing 167 THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Avondale Ind Inc against Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co, LA Ins Guar Assn, Combustion Inc (6:94cv4005) - note: this pleading titled "Second Suppl/Amend Third-Party Petition", but I find no 3PC filed by Avondale in 6:94cv4005 previously in this matter) (former employee)
October 11, 1988 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying [157-1] motion for new trial (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004, 4005, 4008, 4009, 4010, 4012, 4013, 4014) (former employee)
September 16, 1988 Filing 157 MOTION by Copolymer Rubber, Georgia Pacific Corp, Triad Chemical, Kaiser Alum & Chem, Transcontinental Gas, Union Carbide, Uniroyal Chem Co Inc, T L James & Co Inc, LA Paving Co Inc, Reichhold Chem Inc, Gulf States Util Co, Borden Chemical Co, Ethyl Corp, Amoco Chemical Co for new trial (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004, 4005, 4008, 4009, 4010, 4012, 4013, 4014) (former employee)
September 8, 1988 Filing 150 MEMORANDUM by Borden Chemical Co, Gulf States Util Co, Ethyl Corp, Amoco Oil Co in opposition to [139-1] motion to show cause why all third party demands against USA should not be dismissed (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
September 8, 1988 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM by T L James & Co Inc, LA Paving Co Inc in opposition to [139-1] motion to show cause why all third party demands against USA should not be dismissed (former employee)
September 8, 1988 Filing 153 JUDGMENT granting [145-1] [140-1] [139-1] motion to show cause why all third party demands against USA should not be dismissed; all third party demands ag/USA dismissed (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004, 4005, 4006, 4008, 4009, 4010, 4011, 4012, 4013, 4014) (former employee) Modified on 07/21/1994
September 8, 1988 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER consolidating actions for purpose of ruling on Motions for Rule to Show Cause why third-party demands ag/USA should not be dismissed (6:94cv4001, 4002, 4003, 4004, 4005, 4006, 4008, 4009, 4010, 4011, 4012, 4013, 4014) (former employee)
September 8, 1988 Filing 154 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Reichhold Chem Inc : amends [12-1] answer, [63-1] answer, [89-1] answer, [107-1] answer, [123-1] answer, [133-1] answer (6:94cv4001 154-1, 6:94cv4002 154-2, 6:94cv4003 154-3, 6:94cv4004 154-4, 6:94cv4008 154-5, 6:94cv4009 154-6, 6:94cv4010 154-7, 6:94cv4012 154-8, 6:94cv4013 154-9, 6:94cv4014 154-10) (former employee)
September 8, 1988 Filing 155 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by T L James & Co Inc, LA Paving Co Inc: amends [11-1] answer, [91-1] answer, [106-1] answer, [122-1] answer, [132-1] answer (6:94cv4002 155-1, 6:93cv4004 155-2, 6:94cv4004 155-3; 6:94cv4005 155-4; 6:94cv4010 155-5; 6:94cv4012 155-6; 6:94cv4013 155-7; 6:94cv4014 155-8) (former employee)
September 8, 1988 Filing 156 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by LA Paving Co Inc: amends [67-1] answer, [64-1] answer (6:94cv4008 156-1, 6:94cv4009 156-2) (former employee) Modified on 07/21/1994
September 7, 1988 Filing 144 MEMORANDUM by Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Chem in opposition to [139-1] motion to show cause why all third party demands against USA should not be dismissed (former employee)
September 7, 1988 Filing 145 MOTION by All Plaintiffs to show cause why all third-party demands against USA should not be dismissed (6:94cv4003) (former employee)
September 7, 1988 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM by Copolymer Rubber, Georgia Pacific Corp, Kaiser Alum & Chem, Transcontinental Gas, Union Carbide, Uniroyal Chem Co Inc in opposition to [139-1] motion to show cause why all third party demands against USA should not be dismissed (6:94cv4005 146-1, 6:94cv4003, 146-2, 6:94cv4013 146-3, 6:94cv40014 146-4, 6:94cv4004 146-5) (former employee)
September 7, 1988 Filing 147 MEMORANDUM by Georgia Pacific Corp in opposition to [139-1] motion to show cause why all third party demands against USA should not be dismissed (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
September 7, 1988 Filing 148 MEMORANDUM by Copolymer Rubber, Georgia Pacific Corp in opposition to [139-1] motion to show cause why all third party demands against USA should not be dismissed (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
September 7, 1988 Filing 149 MEMORANDUM by Copolymer Rubber, Georgia Pacific Corp in opposition to [139-1] motion to show cause why all third party demands against USA should not be dismissed (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
September 6, 1988 Filing 143 MEMORANDUM by All Plaintiffs in support of [139-1] motion to show cause why all third party demands against USA not be dismissed (former employee)
September 2, 1988 Filing 142 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by T L James & Co Inc, LA Paving Co Inc: amends [11-1] answer (former employee)
August 31, 1988 Filing 141 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Borden Chemical Co, Gulf States Util Co, Ethyl Corp, Amoco Chemical Co: amends [14-1] answer (former employee)
August 26, 1988 Filing 140 JOINDER IN MOTION by All Plaintiffs to show cause why all third-party demands against USA should not be dismissed (6:94cv4004 140-1, 6:94cv4005 140-2, 6:94cv4010 140-3, 6:94cv4012 140-4, 6:94cv4013 140-5, 6:94cv4014 140-6, 6:94cv4008 140-7, 6:94cv4011 140-8)) (former employee) Modified on 07/21/1994
August 23, 1988 Filing 139 MOTION by All Plaintiffs in 6:94cv4001 to show cause why all third party demands against USA should not be dismissed (former employee)
August 12, 1988 Filing 138 JUDGMENT remanding matters to state court (6:94cv4001, 6:94cv4002, 6:94cv4003, 6:94cv4004, 6:94cv4005, 6:94cv4008, 6:94cv4009, 6:94cv4010, 6:94cv4012, 6:94cv4013, 6:94cv4014) (former employee)
July 25, 1988 Filing 137 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Copolymer Rubber, Georgia Pacific Corp against U S A (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
July 14, 1988 Filing 136 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Borden Chemical Co against U S A (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
July 12, 1988 Filing 132 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by LA Paving Co Inc, T L James & Co Inc against U S A (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
July 12, 1988 Filing 133 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Reichhold Chem Inc against U S A (6:94cv4014) (former employee) Modified on 07/21/1994
July 12, 1988 Filing 134 ANSWER to Complaint by Ciba-Geigy Corp (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
July 12, 1988 Filing 135 ANSWER to Complaint by Mobil Oil Exp P SE (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
July 8, 1988 Filing 131 ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale Ind Inc (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
July 5, 1988 Filing 130 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Avondale Ind Inc, Amoco Chemical Co, Borden Chemical Co, Ciba-Geigy Corp, Copolymer Rubber, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co, Reichhold Chem Inc, Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Ind, Georgia Pacific Corp, T L James & Co Inc, LA Paving Co Inc, Mobil Oil Exp P SE, Shell Western E & P (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
June 30, 1988 Filing 128 ANSWER to Complaint by Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Chem (6:94cv4013) (former employee) Modified on 07/21/1994
June 27, 1988 Filing 129 COMPLAINT filed in 21JDC/#55,994-A (6:94cv4014) (former employee)
June 20, 1988 Filing 127 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Copolymer Rubber, Georgia Pacific Corp against U S A (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
June 17, 1988 Filing 122 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by LA Paving Co Inc, T L James & Co Inc against U S A (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
June 17, 1988 Filing 123 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Reichhold Chem Inc against U S A (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
June 17, 1988 Filing 124 ANSWER to Complaint by Ciba-Geigy Corp (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
June 17, 1988 Filing 125 ANSWER to Complaint by Mobil Oil Exp P SE (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
June 17, 1988 Filing 126 ANSWER to Complaint by Shell Western E & P (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
June 9, 1988 Filing 121 ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale Ind Inc (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
June 8, 1988 Filing 120 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Borden Chemical Co, Gulf States Util Co, Ethyl Corp, Amoco Co against U S A (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
June 3, 1988 Filing 119 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amoco Chemical Co, Borden Chemical Co, Ciba-Geigy Corp, Copolymer Rubber, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co, Reichhold Chem Inc, Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Chem, Georgia Pacific Corp, T L James & Co Inc, LA Paving Co Inc, Mobil Oil Exp P SE, Shell Western E P (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
May 27, 1988 Filing 118 COMPLAINT filed in 21JDC/#55,773-B (6:94cv4013) (former employee)
May 25, 1988 Filing 116 AMENDED ANSWER by Fidelity & Guaranty to [43-1] third party complaint (former employee)
May 25, 1988 Filing 117 ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale Ind Inc (incorrectly named as Avondale Shipyards Inc) (6:94cv4008 117-1, 6:94cv4009 117-2) (former employee) Modified on 07/21/1994
May 18, 1988 Filing 112 ANSWER by Fidelity & Guaranty to [15-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001 112-1, 6:94cv4002 112-2, 6:94cv4003 112-3, 6:94cv4004 112-4) (former employee) Modified on 07/20/1994
May 18, 1988 Filing 113 ANSWER by Fidelity & Guaranty to [16-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001 113-1, 6:94cv4002 113-2, 6:94cv4003 113-3, 6:94cv4004 113-4) (former employee) Modified on 07/20/1994
May 18, 1988 Filing 114 ANSWER by Fidelity & Guaranty to [30-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
May 18, 1988 Filing 115 ANSWER by Fidelity & Guaranty to [43-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
May 9, 1988 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER - suit dismissed for failure to comply w/Court's order and local rules (6:94cv4007) (former employee)
April 13, 1988 Filing 110 ANSWER to Complaint by Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Chem (6:94cv4012) (former employee) Modified on 07/20/1994
March 31, 1988 Filing 109 ANSWER to Complaint by Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Chem (6:94cv4008 109-1, 6:94cv4009 109-2) (former employee)
March 24, 1988 Filing 108 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Copolymer Rubber, Georgia Pacific Corp against U S A (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
March 10, 1988 Filing 105 ANSWERS to Complaint by Ciba-Geigy Corp, Mobil Oil Exp P SE, Shell Western E & P (6:94cv4012 105-1 thru 105-3) (former employee)
March 10, 1988 Filing 106 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by LA Paving Co Inc, T L James & Co Inc against U S A (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
March 10, 1988 Filing 107 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Reichhold Chem Inc against U S A (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
March 9, 1988 Filing 104 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Borden Chemical Co, Gulf States Util Co, Ethyl Corp, Amoco Co against U S A (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
March 8, 1988 Filing 103 ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale Ind Inc (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
March 4, 1988 Filing 102 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amoco Oil Co, Borden Chemical Co, Ciba-Geigy Corp, Copolymer Rubber, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co, Georgia Pacific Corp, Reichhold Chem Inc, Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Ind, Georgia Pacific Corp, T L James & Co Inc, LA Paving Co Inc, Mobil Oil Exp P SE, Shell Western E & P (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
February 18, 1988 Filing 101 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Cenac Towing Co Inc: amends [27-1] answer (6:94cv4001 101-1, 6:94cv4002 101-2) (former employee) Modified on 07/27/1994
January 29, 1988 Filing 100 COMPLAINT filed in 21JDC/#54,854-F (6:94cv4012) (former employee)
January 19, 1988 Filing 95 ANSWER by U S F & G to [90-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
January 19, 1988 Filing 96 ANSWER by U S F & G to [89-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
January 19, 1988 Filing 97 ANSWER by U S F & G to [91-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
January 19, 1988 Filing 98 ANSWER by U S F & G to third-party complaint by Ciba-Geigy Corp (6:94cv4010 - there is no complaint filed by Ciba-Geigy in 6:94cv4010 at this point) (former employee)
January 19, 1988 Filing 99 ANSWER by U S F & G to [88-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
January 8, 1988 Filing 94 COMPLAINT filed in 21JDC/#54,684-C (6:94cv4011) (former employee)
December 23, 1987 Filing 93 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Georgia Pacific Corp against U S A (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
December 22, 1987 Filing 92 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Borden Chemical Co, Gulf States Util Co, Ethyl Corp, Amoco Chemical Co against U S A (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
December 14, 1987 Filing 88 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Mobil Oil Exp P SE against Mission Insurance Co, Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
December 14, 1987 Filing 89 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Reichhold Chem Inc against U S A, Mission Insurance Co, Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
December 14, 1987 Filing 90 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Shell Western E & P against Mission Insurance Co, Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G, Home Indemnity Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
December 14, 1987 Filing 91 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by LA Paving Co Inc, T L James & Co Inc against U S A, Mission Insurance Co, Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
December 11, 1987 Filing 87 ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale Ind Inc (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
December 7, 1987 Filing 86 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Avondale Ind Inc, Amoco Chemical Co, Borden Chemical Co, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co, Ciba-Geigy Corp, Hansborough Energy, Reichhold Chem Inc, Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Ind, Georgia Pacific Corp, T L James & Co Inc, LA Paving Co Inc, Mobil Oil Exp P SE, Shell Western E & P (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
November 23, 1987 Filing 85 COMPLAINT filed in 21JDC/#54,407-C (6:94cv4010) (former employee)
November 16, 1987 Filing 80 ANSWER by U S F & G to [18-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001 80-1, 6:94cv4002 80-2, 6:94cv4003 80-3, 6:94cv4004 80-4) (former employee)
November 16, 1987 Filing 81 ANSWER by U S F & G to [16-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001 81-1, 6:94cv4002 81-2, 6:94cv4003 81-3, 6:94cv4004 81-4) (former employee)
November 16, 1987 Filing 82 ANSWER by U S F & G to [16-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4002 82-1, 6:94cv4003 82-2, 6:94cv4004 82-3) (former employee)
November 16, 1987 Filing 83 ANSWER by U S F & G to [43-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
November 16, 1987 Filing 84 ANSWER by U S F & G to [30-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
October 23, 1987 Filing 79 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [65-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4008) (former employee)
October 12, 1987 Filing 78 AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Reichhold Chem Inc: amends [63-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001 78-1, 6:94cv4002 78-2, 6:94cv4003 78-3, 6:94cv4004 78-4) (former employee)
October 9, 1987 Filing 74 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [64-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4009) (former employee)
October 9, 1987 Filing 75 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [63-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4009) (former employee)
October 9, 1987 Filing 76 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [68-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4009) (former employee)
October 9, 1987 Filing 77 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [66-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4009) (former employee)
September 17, 1987 Filing 70 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [18-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001 70-1, 6:94cv4002 70-2, 6:94cv4003 70-3) (former employee)
September 17, 1987 Filing 71 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [30-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
September 17, 1987 Filing 72 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [43-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
September 17, 1987 Filing 73 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [18-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
September 9, 1987 Filing 69 ANSWER by LA Insurance Guaranty Assoc to unidentified third-party complaint (this party not named at this point in any pleadings received in USDC/WDLA - signed by Richard Creed, Jr., P O Box 3177, BR, LA 70821) (6:94cv4001 69-1, 6:94cv4002 69-2, 6:94cv4003 69-3, 6:94cv4004 69-4) (former employee)
September 8, 1987 Filing 67 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by LA Paving Co Inc against U S A, Mission Insurance Co, Stonewall Co, U S F & G, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Ranger Insurance Co (6:94cv4008) (former employee) Modified on 07/21/1994
September 8, 1987 Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Mobil Oil Exp P SE against Mission Insurance Co, Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co (6:94cv4009) (former employee)
September 2, 1987 Filing 63 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Reichhold Chem Inc against U S A, Mission Insurance Co, Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co (6:94cv4008 63-1, 6:94cv4009 63-2) (former employee)
September 2, 1987 Filing 64 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by LA Paving Co Inc against U S A, Mission Insurance Co, Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co (6:94cv4009) (former employee)
September 2, 1987 Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Mobil Exp & Prod SE against U S A, Mission Insurance Co, Stonewall Ins Co, U S F & G, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co (6:94cv4008) (former employee) Modified on 07/18/1994
September 2, 1987 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Ciba-Geigy Corp against U S A, Mission Insurance Co, Stonewall Ins U S F & G, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, Travelers Ins Co, Ranger Insurance Co (6:94cv4008 66-1, 6:94cv4009 66-2) (former employee)
August 31, 1987 Filing 62 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Borden Chemical Co, Gulf States Util Co, Ethyl Corp, Amoco Chemical Co against U S A (6:94cv4008 62-1, 6:94cv4009 62-2) (former employee) Modified on 07/18/1994
August 14, 1987 Filing 61 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amoco Chemical Co, Borden Chemical Co, Ciba-Geigy Corp, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co, Reichhold Chem Inc, Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Ind, LA Paving Co Inc, Mobil Oil Corp (6:94cv4008 61-1, 6:94cv4009 (61-2) (former employee)
August 6, 1987 Filing 60 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amoco Chemical Co, Borden Chemical Co, Ciba-Geigy Corp, Copolymer Rubber, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co, Reichhold Chem Inc, Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Ind, LA Paving Co Inc, Mobil Oil Corp, Georgia Pacific Corp (6:94cv4007) (former employee)
August 5, 1987 Filing 59 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale Ind Inc: amends [18-1] answer (6:94cv4001 59-1, 6:94cv4002 59-2, 6:94cv4004 59-3) (former employee)
August 4, 1987 Filing 58 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Avondale Ind Inc: amends [18-1] answer (6:94cv4003) (former employee)
July 20, 1987 Filing 57 COMPLAINT filed in 21JDC/#53,340-C (6:94cv4009) (former employee)
July 15, 1987 Filing 56 COMPLAINT filed in 21JDC/#53,298-F (6:94cv4008) (former employee)
July 8, 1987 Filing 55 COMPLAINT filed; jury demand in 21JDC/#53,244-B (6:94cv4007) (former employee)
June 15, 1987 Filing 54 ANSWER to Complaint by Police Jury of Livingston Parish (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
May 12, 1987 Filing 53 ANSWER by LA Petro Chem Corp to [37-1] cross claim (6:94cv4001 53-1, 6:94cv4002 53-2) (former employee) Modified on 07/18/1994
May 11, 1987 Filing 52 ANSWER to Complaint by MS Power & Light (6:94cv4001 52-1, 6:94cv4002 52-2, 6:94cv4003 52-3, 6:94cv4004 52-4) (former employee) Modified on 07/18/1994
April 28, 1987 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint by Guzzetta Oil Co; jury demand (6:94cv4001 51-1, 6:94cv4002 51-2) (former employee) Modified on 07/18/1994
April 23, 1987 Filing 50 ANSWER by Dale Polk & Son Inc to complaint (6:94cv4001 50-1, 6:94cv4002 50-2) (former employee) Modified on 07/15/1994
April 13, 1987 Filing 49 ANSWER by Chevron Chemical Co to [37-1] cross claim (former employee)
March 31, 1987 Filing 48 ANSWER by Hoechst Celanese (formerly known as American Hoechst Corp) to [37-1] cross claim (6:94cv4001 48-1, 6:94cv4002 48-2) (former employee) Modified on 07/15/1994
March 11, 1987 Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint by Evans Cooperage Co (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
March 5, 1987 Filing 46 ANSWER to Complaint by Mobil Oil Exp P SE (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
February 27, 1987 Filing 45 ANSWER to Complaint by Crown Zellerbach (6:94cv4004) (former employee) Modified on 07/15/1994
February 25, 1987 Filing 44 ANSWER to Complaint by Shell Western E & P (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
February 20, 1987 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint by B A S F Corp (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
February 20, 1987 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Uniroyal Chem Co Inc, Union Carbide Chem against U S A, Travelers Ins Co, Charter Oak Fire Ins, Travelers Indemnity, Ranger Insurance Co, Stonewall Ins Co, Mission Insurance Co, U S F & G, Fidelity & Guaranty, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, I N A Underwriters, Insurance Co of N Am (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
February 18, 1987 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint by Stauffer Chemical (6:94cv4001) (former employee) Modified on 07/15/1994
February 18, 1987 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint by McDermott Inc (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
February 17, 1987 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint by Exxon Corp (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
February 17, 1987 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint by LA Power & Light Co (6:94cv4004) (former employee) Modified on 07/15/1994
February 12, 1987 Filing 37 CROSSCLAIM by James E Davidson against American Hoescht, Chemfax, Chevron Chemical Co, Industrial Solvents, LA Petro Chem Corp (6:94cv4001 37-1, 6:94cv4002 37-2) (former employee)
February 11, 1987 Filing 35 ANSWER to Complaint by Evans Cooperage Co (6:94cv4001 35-1, 6:94cv4002 35-2) (former employee)
February 11, 1987 Filing 36 ANSWER to Complaint by Castay Inc (6:94cv4004) (former employee) Modified on 07/15/1994
February 9, 1987 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint by Southern Scrap (6:94cv4002) (former employee)
February 6, 1987 Filing 33 ANSWER to Complaint by Southern Scrap (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
February 5, 1987 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint by Castay Inc (6:94cv4001 31-1, 6:94cv4002 31-2) (former employee)
February 5, 1987 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint by Dow Chemical Co (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
February 3, 1987 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Transcontinental Gas, Kaiser Alum & Chem against U S A, Travelers Ins Co, Charter Oak Fire Ins, Travelers Indemnity, Ranger Insurance Co, Ranger Insurance Co, Stonewall Ins Co, Mission Insurance Co, U S F & G, Fidelity & Guaranty, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, I N A Underwriters, Insurance Co of N Am (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
February 2, 1987 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint by James E Davidson (6:94cv4001 29-1, 6:94cv4002 29-2) (former employee)
January 30, 1987 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by Cenac Towing Co Inc (6:94cv4001 27-1, 6:94cv4002 27-2) (former employee)
January 30, 1987 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint by Acadian Shipyard Inc (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
January 22, 1987 Filing 26 AMENDED THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT by Reichhold Chem Inc against U S A: amends [12-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001 26-1, 6:94cv4002 26-2, 6:94cv4003 26-3, 6:94cv4004 26-4) (former employee)
January 16, 1987 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Chem, Copolymer Rubber, Georgia Pacific Corp, Amoco Oil Co, Borden Chemical Co, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co, Reichhold Chem Inc, LA Paving Co Inc, T L James & Co Inc in support of [8-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001) (former employee)
January 6, 1987 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by Apex Co (6:94cv4001 24-1, 6:94cv4002 24-2) (former employee)
December 30, 1986 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint by LA Power & Light Co (6:94cv4001 23-1, 6:94cv4002 23-2) (former employee)
December 29, 1986 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Triad Chemical against U S A, Travelers Ins Co, Charter Oak Fire Ins, Travelers Indemnity, Ranger Insurance Co, Stonewall Ins Co, Mission Insurance Co, U S F & G, Fidelity & Guaranty, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co, I N A Underwriters, Insurance Co of N Am (6:94cv4001 22-1, 6:94cv4002 22-2) (former employee) Modified on 07/26/1994
December 1, 1986 Filing 21 COMPLAINT filed; jury demand in 21JDC/51,404 (6:94cv4006) (former employee)
November 18, 1986 Filing 19 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [16-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001 19-1, 6:94cv4002 19-2, 6:94cv4003 19-3, 6:94cv4004 19-4) (former employee)
November 18, 1986 Filing 20 ANSWER by Stonewall Ins Co to [15-2] third-party complaint (6:94cv4001 20-1, 6:94cv4002 20-2, 6:94cv4003 20-3, 6:94cv4004 20-4) (former employee)
October 14, 1986 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Avondale Ind (incorrectly referred to and named as Avondale Shipyards Inc) Inc against Mission Insurance Co, Stonewall Ins Co, U S F G, Home Indemnity Co, Home Insurance Co (6:94cv4001 18-1, 6:94cv4002 18-2, 6:94cv4003 18-3, 6:94cv4004 18-4) (former employee) Modified on 07/14/1994
October 6, 1986 Filing 17 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amoco Oil Co, Borden Chemical Co, Ciba-Geigy Corp, Copolymer Rubber, Ethyl Corp, Gulf States Util Co, Reichhold Chem Inc, Hansborough Energy, Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Chem, T L James & Co Inc, LA Paving Co Inc, Georgia Pacific Corp (former employee)
October 1, 1986 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Copolymer Rubber against U S A, Travelers Ins Co, Charter Oak Fire Ins Co, Travelers Indem Co, Ranger Ins Co, Stonewall Ins Co, Mission Ins Co, USF&G, Fidelity & Guaranty Ins Underwriters, Home Indemnity Co, Home Ins Co, INA Underwriters Ins Co, Ins Co of North America (6:94cv4001 16-1, 6:94cv4002 16-2, 6:94cv4003 16-3, 6:94cv4004 16-4) (former employee) Modified on 07/14/1994
September 19, 1986 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Georgia Pacific Corp against U S A, Travelers Ins Co, Charter Oak Fire Ins Co, Travelers Indemnity Co, Ranger Ins Co, Stonewall Ins Co, Mission Ins Co, US Fid & Guar Co, Fidelity & Guar Ins Underwriters, Home Indemnity Co, Home Ins Co, INA Underwriters Ins Co, Ins co of North America (6:94cv4001 15-1, 6:94cv4002 15-2, 6:94cv4003 15-3, 6:94cv4004 15-4) (former employee) Modified on 07/14/1994
September 11, 1986 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Ciba-Geigy Corp (6:94cv4001 10-1, 6:94cv4002 10-2, 6:94cv4003 10-3, 6:94cv4004 10-4) (former employee)
September 11, 1986 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaintw/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Reichhold Chem Inc against U S A (6:94cv4001 12-1, 6:94cv4002, 12-2, 6:94cv4003 12-3, 6:94cv4004 12-4) (former employee)
September 11, 1986 Filing 13 COMPLAINT filed in 21JDC/50,761 (6:94cv4005) (former employee)
September 11, 1986 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Borden Chemical Co, Gulf States Utilities Co, Ethyl Corp, Amoco Oil Co against U S A (6:94cv4001 14-1, 6:94cv4002 14-2, 6:94cv4003 14-3, 6:94cv4004 14-4) (former employee) Modified on 07/21/1994
September 11, 1986 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by T L James & Co Inc, LA Paving Co Inc against U S A (6:94cv4001 11-1, 6:94cv4002 11-2, 6:94cv4003 11-3, 6:94cv4004 11-4) (former employee)
September 8, 1986 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Hansborough Energy, Hesco Corp (6:94cv4001 9-1, 6:94cv4002 9-2, 6:94cv4003 9-3, 6:94cv4004 9-4) (former employee)
August 22, 1986 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint w/ 3RD-PTY COMPLAINT by Browning-Ferris Inc, Browning-Ferris Chem against U S A (6:94cv4002 8-1, 6:94cv4003 8-2, 6:94cv4004 8-3) (former employee) Modified on 07/14/1994
August 15, 1986 Filing 4 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Avondale Shipyards, et al (6:94CV4001) (former employee) Modified on 07/14/1994
August 15, 1986 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Avondale Shipyards, et al (6:94cv4002) (former employee)
August 15, 1986 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Avondale Shipyards, et al (6:94cv4003) (former employee)
August 15, 1986 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Avondale Shipyards, et al (6:94cv4004) (former employee)
July 25, 1986 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed in 21JDC/50,311 (6:94cv4003) (former employee)
July 21, 1986 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed in 21JDC/50,260 (6:94cv4002) (former employee) Modified on 07/14/1994
July 5, 1986 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed; jury demand in 21JDC/50212-A (6:94cv4001) (former employee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Combustion Inc, et al v. A B C Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mabel McLevi
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David R Kelly
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff M Pounders, III
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy J Parker
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Paul Avants
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buel Jordan
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Williams
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Brooks
Represented By: Denise A Vinet
Represented By: Raymond Charles Vinet, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Windham
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger W Bennett
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly King
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R Thomas
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Cormier
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila McLin
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Roddy
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Prime
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A Perkins
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig D Blount
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George L Arnold, Jr
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Watson
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lura L Mullins
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Muse
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cordie Marie Rhodes
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M Dixon
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A Gunter
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Ballard
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenda Gautreaux
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy F Perkins
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie D Duffy
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Barker
Represented By: Calvin C Fayard, Jr
Represented By: R Glenn Cater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Carpenter
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph McLin
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Johnson
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellis Warren
Represented By: Denise A Vinet
Represented By: Raymond Charles Vinet, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie David
Represented By: Robert Henry Schmolke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard France
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy King
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene McAllister
Represented By: Denise A Vinet
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Raymond Charles Vinet, Sr
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby McMorris
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold R Hicks, Sr
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bud White
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrtle Anderman
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Prine
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary F Hodges
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Smith Lejeune
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry W Guillory
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norma Sykes Stewart
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E Brooks
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Carrier
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Graham, Jr
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M James
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Arnett
Represented By: Denise A Vinet
Represented By: Raymond Charles Vinet, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven L Pierce
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty B Sibley
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Stafford
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James P Maxwell
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Michelle Gillespie
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Arnold
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lewis
Represented By: Raymond Charles Vinet, Sr
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye Pitts
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy NeSmith
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny W Johnson
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E Laboyteaux
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Smith
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Lanier William
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B Muse
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Walker
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Blount
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Boswell
Represented By: Jeffrey P Leblanc
Represented By: John Baird King
Represented By: Richard P Reina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hood
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryne Muse
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cercla Plaintiffs
Represented By: Thomas M McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Carpenter
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald R Mclin
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Curtiss
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Pat Jones
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Neal Boone
Represented By: Denise A Vinet
Represented By: Raymond Charles Vinet, Sr
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drakeford Delatte
Represented By: William P Rutledge
Represented By: Bob Forrest Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Elaine Hendrix
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E Perkins
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie D Martin
Represented By: Hobart O Pardue, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Un