Alexander v. Lafayette City Parish Consolidated Government et al
Plaintiff: Albert K Alexander
Defendant: Lafayette City Parish Consolidated Government, Lafayette City Police Dept, Sheriffs Office of Lafayette Parish, City Prosecutors Office of Lafayette, Jim Craft, Randy Hundley, Michael W Neustrom, William T Babin, Guy Lebreton, Norman Malcanaco, Rob Olizero, Michael Marin, John Doe, James Doe, X Y Z Insurance Co and Z Y X Insurance Co
Case Number: 6:2009cv01016
Filed: June 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Louisiana
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Presiding Judge: Mildred E Methvin
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 JUDGMENT ADOPTING 66 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that defendant's 42 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and plaintiff's claims against these defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that plaintiff's 51 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief and 56 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief entitled "Plaintiff Motion for NonMutual Collateral Estoppel" are DENIED. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/11/11. (crt,Guidry, C)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 JUDGMENT ADOPTING 20 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael W Neustrom, 45 Report and Recommendations. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment on Behalf of Defendant Michael W. Neustrom is GRANTED and plaintiff's claims against this defendant are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 01/10/11. (crt,Guidry, C)
December 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 49 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William T Babin. Objections to R&R due by 1/6/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/17/10. (crt,Guidry, C)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William T Babin IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Motion for Summary Judgment by William T.Babin, Individually and as Assistant District Attorney (Rec. Doc. 17) be GRANTED andall of the claims against defendant Babin be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 12/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 12/13/10. Sent copy of R&R to RFD this date.(crt,Jordan, P)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William T Babin re 20 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael W Neustrom. The motions are opposed. IT IS RECOMMENDED that the Motion for Summary Judgment on Behalf of Defedant Michael W. Neustrom. 20 be GRANTED and plaintiff's claims against this defendant be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 12/16/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 11/29/10. (crt,Guidry, C)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REQUIRING RULE 7(a) REPLY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/6/10. (crt,Smith, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander v. Lafayette City Parish Consolidated Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert K Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette City Parish Consolidated Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette City Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriffs Office of Lafayette Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Prosecutors Office of Lafayette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Hundley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W Neustrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William T Babin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Lebreton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Malcanaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Olizero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X Y Z Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z Y X Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?