Firefly Digital Inc v. Google Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff: Firefly Digital Inc
Defendant: Google Inc
Counter_claimant: Google Inc
Counter_defendant: Firefly Digital Inc
Case Number: 6:2010cv00133
Filed: January 29, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Lafayette
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Presiding Judge: Tucker L Melancon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2010 29 Featured Case STIPULATE PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/27/10. (crt,Smith, C)
September 23, 2010 28 PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Firefly Digital Inc and Google Inc in response to 27 Minutes of Telephone Conference. (aty,Suire, Blair) Modified on 9/23/2010 to edit text (Smith, C).
September 20, 2010 27 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 9/20/2010 with regard to the 24 Proposed Stipulated Protective. It was agreed that the protective order will be revised and resubmitted. (crt,Smith, C)
September 15, 2010 26 PLAN OF WORK filed by Firefly Digital Inc and Google Inc. Discovery deadline 12/31/2010. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 1/10/2011. Expert Discovery due by 2/21/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2011. Daubert Motions due by 4/12/2011. Motions in Limine due by 9/13/2011. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 9/13/2011. Trial Depositions due by 9/13/2011. Pretrial Order due by 10/3/2011. Real Time glossary due by 11/14/2011. CD-ROM exhibits due 11/14/2011. (crt,Smith, C)
September 15, 2010 25 Featured Case ORDER granting 23 Proposed Plan of Work. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 9/14/10. (crt,Smith, C)
September 14, 2010 24 PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Firefly Digital Inc and Google Inc. (aty,Suire, Blair) Modified on 9/15/2010 to add filer and edit text (Smith, C).
September 13, 2010 23 Joint PROPOSED Plan of Work by Firefly Digital Inc, Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of proposed order, # 2 Proposed Pleading)(aty,Mendez, Andrew)
August 31, 2010 22 Featured Case ORDER denying 21 Motion for Status Conference. The 3/22/2011 trial and 2/16/2011 pretrial conference and all deadlines set by the scheduling order that previously issued herein are UPSET. The trial of this matter is rescheduled to be conducted on 11/21/2011 with a back-up trial date of 11/28/2011. The pretrial conference will be conducted on 10/13/2011 at 2:00 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 14 days of the date of entry of this Order the attorneys for the parties are to submit a motion to accept their joint proposed plan of work, using the Court's usual scheduling order as a guide, as to any matter which require deadlines imposed in order to prepare this case for trial. Signed by Judge Tucker L Melancon on 8/31/2010. (crt,Kennedy, T)
August 17, 2010 Motions Transferred regarding 21 Joint MOTION for Status Conference re 16 Scheduling Order. Motions referred to Tucker L Melancon. (crt,Smith, C)
August 17, 2010 21 Joint MOTION for Status Conference re 16 Scheduling Order, by Firefly Digital Inc, Google Inc. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(aty,Suire, Blair) Modified on 8/17/2010 to edit text (Smith, C).
August 3, 2010 20 Featured Case ORDER granting 19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Nikki K Vo for Google Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/3/10. (crt,Smith, C)
August 2, 2010 19 Ex Parte MOTION for Nikki K. Vo to Appear Pro Hac Vice Admission fee: $ 25, receipt number 0536-1436575 by Google Inc. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: # 1 Text of proposed order, # 2 Exhibits, # 3 Exhibits)(aty,Mendez, Andrew)
June 4, 2010 18 RULE 26(f) Report by Firefly Digital Inc and Google Inc. (crt,Smith, C)
June 4, 2010 17 Featured Case ORDER: Having reviewed the Rule 26(f) Report and determined it to be complete, IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court file it in the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/4/10. (crt,Smith, C)
April 7, 2010 16 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 3/21/2011 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 3 before Judge Tucker L Melancon. Backup Trial date 3/28/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2011 04:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Tucker L Melancon. Initial Disclosure due by 4/28/2010. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 5/12/2010. Rule 26 Report due by 5/26/2010. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 8/20/2010. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 8/20/2010. Discovery due by 9/20/2010. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 9/29/2010. Expert Depositions due by 11/8/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 11/18/2010. Daubert Motions due by 12/28/2010. Motions in Limine due by 1/18/2011. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 1/18/2011. Trial Depositions due by 1/18/2011. Pretrial Order due by 2/7/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Attachments to scheduling order, # 2 Attachments to scheduling order)(crt,Smith, C)
March 31, 2010 15 ANSWER to 11 Counterclaim by Firefly Digital Inc.(aty,Waddell, Robert) Modified on 3/31/2010 to edit text (Smith, C).
March 10, 2010 NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Action taken: Edited text to indicate "Filed in Error", counsel has refiled as document 14 . (crt,Smith, C)
March 10, 2010 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Google Inc. (aty,Braunig, Warren)
March 10, 2010 13 (FILED IN ERROR) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Google Inc. (aty,Braunig, Warren) Modified on 3/11/2010 to indicate "Filed in Error"; refiled as document 14 (Smith, C).
March 10, 2010 12 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement sent to Warren A Braunig on behalf of Google Inc (crt,Smith, C)
March 10, 2010 11 AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand AND, COUNTERCLAIM against Firefly Digital Inc by Google Inc.(aty,Braunig, Warren)
February 25, 2010 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Michael S Kwun, Ashok Ramani, Warren A Braunig for Google Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 2/25/2010. (crt,Alexander, E)
February 25, 2010 9 Featured Case ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Google, Inc. Answer due 3/10/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 02/25/2010. (jud,Hanna, Patrick)
February 24, 2010 RECEIVED Pro Hac Vice fee for Michael S. Kwun; Ashok Ramani; and Warren A. Braunig to appear on behalf of Google Inc in the amount of $75.00, receipt number 64635003694 (crt,Davenport, M)
February 22, 2010 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Michael S. Kwun; Ashok Ramani; and Warren A. Braunig to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee being sent by check via U S mail) by Google Inc. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of good standing, # 2 Certificate of good standing, # 3 Certificate of good standing, # 4 Affidavit, # 5 Affidavit, # 6 Affidavit, # 7 Text of proposed order)(aty,Mendez, Andrew)
February 18, 2010 7 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint with consent by Google Inc. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: # 1 Text of proposed order)(aty,Mendezs, Andrew)
February 9, 2010 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Firefly Digital Inc. Google Inc served on 2/3/2010, answer due 2/24/2010. (aty,Suire, Blair)
February 2, 2010 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google Inc. (crt,Dean, S)
February 2, 2010 4 AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (crt,Dean, S)
February 1, 2010 CASE assigned to Judge Tucker L Melancon and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dean, S)
February 1, 2010 FILING FEE RECEIVED: on behalf of Firefly Digital Inc in the amount of $350.00, receipt number 64635003642. (crt,Haik, K)
February 1, 2010 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Blair B Suire on behalf of Firefly Digital Inc (aty,Suire, Blair)
January 29, 2010 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Firefly Digital Inc. (aty,Waddell, Robert)
January 29, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Google Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee being sent by check via U S mail) filed by Firefly Digital Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil cover sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Summons)(aty,Waddell, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firefly Digital Inc v. Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firefly Digital Inc
Represented By: Blair B Suire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Warren A Braunig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Google Inc
Represented By: Warren A Braunig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Firefly Digital Inc
Represented By: Blair B Suire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?