Hawkins v. Piazza et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Hawkins
Defendant: Mark Piazza, Rick Coleman, City of Abbeville, Rusty Meaux and Shane Bourque
Case Number: 6:2010cv00152
Filed: February 4, 2010
Court: Louisiana Western District Court
Office: Lafayette Office
County: Vermilion
0 Judge:
Presiding Judge: Rebecca F Doherty
Referring Judge: Patrick J Hanna
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 17, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 34 MOTION for Reconsideration re 32 Memorandum Ruling, 33 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Rusty Meaux, Rick Coleman, Mark Piazza, City of Abbeville, Shane Bourque. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 10/17/2011. (crt,Alexander, E)
July 25, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 36 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 07/25/11. (crt,Yocum, M)
May 9, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM RULING re 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pursuant to FRCP 56 filed by Rusty Meaux, Rick Coleman, Mark Piazza, City of Abbeville, Shane Bourque. Fore the foregoing reasons, defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART, and DEFERRED IN PART. The motion is granted to the extent it seeks dismissal of plaintiff's federal claims; it is denied to the extent it seeks dismissal of plaintiff's state law claims; and it is deferred to the e xtent it seeks attorney's fees and costs. Defendants are to submit a motion supporting their position that they are entitled to attorneys' fees and costs, and the amount for which they claim they are entitled, within thirty days of issuance of this Ruling.. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/09/11. (crt,Guidry, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Piazza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Hawkins
Represented By: David D Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Piazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Abbeville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rusty Meaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Bourque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?